C. v. D.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-03365

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 25, 2019 at 12:28 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo J.C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitney Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark M. Whitney +1 781 631 4400 mwhitney@whitneylawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark M. Whitney +1 781 631 4400 mwhitney@whitneylawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Granger Management Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo Granger Management LLC, Defendant
No Logo R.D., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332lb
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            OPINION AND ORDER re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; 36 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss; 34 MOTION to Dismiss: For the foregoing reasons, Donovan's motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to plaintiff's claims for n egligent infliction of emotional distress and violation of N.Y. Executive Law § 296(6), and otherwise DENIED. Granger's motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to plaintiff's claim for vicarious liability and otherwise DENIED. Plaintiff may pr oceed on Counts I, II, III, and VII, and on Count VI except with respect to claims for violations of N.Y. Executive Law § 296(6). Granger's motion for oral argument is DENIED as moot. (Doc 29.) The Clerk is directed to terminate the motions. (Docs 28, 29, 34, 36.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/7/2019) (jwh)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Oral Argument
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark McEldowney Whitney on behalf of J.C.. (Whitney, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Whitney, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against R.D., Granger Management Holdings LLC, Granger Management LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14954214)Document filed by J.C..(Whitney, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark McEldowney Whitney. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Case Designated ECF. (sj)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?