In re: Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc. Securities Litigation

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-08983
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2022 at 7:15 PM EDT (2.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Dror Gronich, Plaintiff

Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley Frank Portnoy +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 LPortnoy@glancylaw.com
No Logo Earl Holtzman, Plaintiff

Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob Alexander Goldberg +1 215 600 2817 jgoldberg@rosenlegal.com
v.
No Logo C. Taylor Pickett, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Bielema, Jr. +1 404 572 4504 +1 404 572 6999 john.bielema@bclplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Shaw Goldman +1 202 508 6311 heather.goldman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Rieder +1 212 541 2057 +1 212 541 4630 erieder@bryancave.com
No Logo Daniel J. Booth, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Bielema, Jr. +1 404 572 4504 +1 404 572 6999 john.bielema@bclplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Shaw Goldman +1 202 508 6311 heather.goldman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Rieder +1 212 541 2057 +1 212 541 4630 erieder@bryancave.com
No Logo Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Royale Investments Inc

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Bielema, Jr. +1 404 572 4504 +1 404 572 6999 john.bielema@bclplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Shaw Goldman +1 202 508 6311 heather.goldman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Rieder +1 212 541 2057 +1 212 541 4630 erieder@bryancave.com

Represented by Gwin Steinmetz & Baird

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Lawrence Haney +1 502 618 5700 +1 502 618 5701 dhaney@gsblegal.com
, , , , , , , , , Michael F. Sutton +1 502 681 5700 +1 502 681 5701 msutton@gsblegal.com
, , , , , , , , , Sarah E. Tilley +1 502 618 5700 +1 502 618 5701 stilley@gsblegal.com
No Logo Robert O. Stephenson, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Bielema, Jr. +1 404 572 4504 +1 404 572 6999 john.bielema@bclplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Shaw Goldman +1 202 508 6311 heather.goldman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Rieder +1 212 541 2057 +1 212 541 4630 erieder@bryancave.com
Other Parties
No Logo Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Movant

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Cynthia Peterson, Movant

Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Glenn Fausz, Movant

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard William Gonnello +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 rgonnello@faruqilaw.com

Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Hong Jun, Movant

Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Patricia Zaborowski, Movant

Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Simona Vacchieri, Movant

Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo The Hannah Rosa Trust, Movant

Represented by Brower Piven, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David A.P. Brower +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 501 0300 brower@browerpiven.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Kuznicki +1 212 501 9000 +1 212 501 0300 kuznicki@browerpiven.com
No Logo Royce Setzer, Lead Plaintiff

Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob Alexander Goldberg +1 215 600 2817 jgoldberg@rosenlegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 philkim@rosenlegal.com
No Logo Steve Klein, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J Alexander Hood +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 ahood@pomlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (143) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/15/2022, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/15/2022, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/6/2022, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/2/2022, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/22/2022, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/19/2022, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/15/2022, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/15/2022, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/15/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/6/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/5/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/15/2022, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/10/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/25/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/30/2022, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/30/2022, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/24/2022, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/16/2022, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/16/2022, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/16/2022, Entered: None Certify Class
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/9/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/4/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/9/2022, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/7/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/4/2022, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/31/2022, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/18/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/18/2022, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/14/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/14/2022, Entered: None Proposed Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/12/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/6/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/16/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/15/2021, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/14/2021, Entered: None Proposed Case Management Plan
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/29/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/22/2021, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/18/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/9/2021, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/28/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/28/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/8/2021, Entered: None Proposed Case Management Plan
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/7/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/4/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Costs Taxed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson. (Rieder, Eric)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Earl Holtzman, Royce Setzer. (Goldberg, Jacob)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Eric Rieder in Support re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Form 10-K, # 2 Exhibit 2 5-3-17 Company Release, # 3 Exhibit 3 5-4-17 Investor Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 4 Form 10-Q, # 5 Exhibit 5 7-26-17 Company Release, # 6 Exhibit 6 7-27-17 Investor Call Transcript, # 7 Exhibit 7 Q2-2017-Form-10, # 8 Exhibit 8 10-30-17 Company Release, # 9 Exhibit 9 10-31-17 Investor Call Transcript, # 10 Exhibit 10 Q3-2017-Form-10, # 11 Exhibit 11 2016-10-K)(Rieder, Eric) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson. (Rieder, Eric) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 53 Memorandum) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Eric Rieder In Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 Form 10-K, # 3 Exhibit 2 5-3-17 Company Release, # 4 Exhibit 3 5-4-17 Investor Call Transcript, # 5 Exhibit 4 Form 10-Q, # 6 Exhibit 5 7-26-17 Company Release, # 7 Exhibit 6 7-27-17 Investor Call Transcript, # 8 Exhibit 7 Q2-2017-Form-10, # 9 Exhibit 8 10-30-17 Company Release, # 10 Exhibit 9 10-31-17Investor Call Transcript, # 11 Exhibit 10 Q3-2017-Form-10, # 12 Exhibit 11 2016-10-K, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Rieder, Eric) Modified on 7/25/2018 (db). (Entered: 07/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson.(Rieder, Eric) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Eric Rieder dated July 17, 2018 re: Request For Oral Argument On Motion To Dismiss. Document filed by Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson.(Rieder, Eric) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc.. Document filed by Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc..(Rieder, Eric) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JOHN BIELEMA: granting 47 Motion for John R. Bielema to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/28/2018) (ama) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
MOTION for John R. Bielema to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15261614. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of John R. Bielema, # 2 Certificate Of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bielema, John) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Royce Setzer, Earl Holtzman. Related document: 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Order amending Caption, # 4 Order granting Amending of Complaint)(Goldberg, Jacob) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW THEREFORE, the parties, through their undersigned attorneys and subject to the Court's approval, stipulate and agree to the following: Counsel for the Defendants agree to accept service of an amended complaint on the Defendants' behalf, but each Defendant expressly reserves all rights, defenses, or other objections ( other than insufficient process or insufficient service of process), including, without limitation, objections to consolidation of any other related case(s) with this action; Defendants are not required to respond to the current complaint in this action; Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve an amended complaint by May 25, 2018; Defendants shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by July 17, 2018; If Defendants file a motion to dismiss, Lead Plaintiff shall file his opposition to the motion by August 24, 2018, and Defendants shall file their reply in further support of any motion to dismiss the amended complaint by September 14, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/25/2018., Responses due by 8/24/2018, Replies due by 9/14/2018.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/09/2018) (ama) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: denying (22) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (22) Motion to Appoint ; denying (22) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (41) Motion for Leave to File Document; granting (9) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting (9) Motion to Appoint ; granting (9) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (11) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (12) Motion to Appoint ; denying (12) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (12) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (16) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (16) Motion to Appoint ; denying (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (19) Motion to Appoint ; denying (19) Motion to Approve in case 1:17-cv-08983-NRB; denying (12) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (13) Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying (13) Motion to Appoint ; denying (13) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases ; denying (16) Motion to Appoint ; denying (16) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:17-cv-09024-NRB. For the foregoing reasons, the cases are ordered consolidated as In re Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc.Securities Litigation, No. 17 Civ. 8983 (NRB). Royce Setzer is appointed lead plaintiff, and the Rosen Law Firm is appointed lead counsel. All motions by competing movants are denied. Consistent with the Stipulation and Order dated February 2, 2018 (ECF No. 35), the parties are instructed to submit to the Court an agreed-upon schedule for the filing of an amended complaint and the response thereto. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at docket entries 9, 11, 12, 16, 19, 22, and 41. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/27/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-08983-NRB, 1:17-cv-09024-NRB (ama) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from David A. Rosenfeld dated February 16, 2018 re: 41 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Deem letter brief filed in support of Royce Setzer's Lead Plaintiff Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Phillip Kim dated 02/09/2018. . Document filed by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from David A. Rosenfeld dated 02/12/2018 re: 02/09/2018 letter filed by Royce Setzer's counsel. Document filed by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois.(Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Deem letter brief filed in support of Royce Setzer's Lead Plaintiff Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Phillip Kim dated 02/09/2018. Document filed by Royce Setzer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kim, Phillip) Modified on 4/13/2018 (ldi). (Entered: 02/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Richard W. Gonnello in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 ., 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 . MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Glenn Fausz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 . . Document filed by Glenn Fausz. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP. MOTION to Appoint Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-08983-NRB, 1:17-cv-09024-NRB . and Notice of Unopposed Motion. Document filed by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-8983; 17-9024 . MOTION to Appoint Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . REPLY TO RESPONSE OF GLENN FAUSZ (DKT. NO. 28). Document filed by Glenn Fausz, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, Patricia Zaborowski. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Howard G. Smith)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Withdrawal re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 .. Document filed by The Hannah Rosa Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration in Support)(Kuznicki, Daniel) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ACCEPT SERVICE AND EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED among the undersigned parties, through their undersigned counsel, subject to the Court's approval, as follows: The undersigned counsel for Defendants is authorized to accept service of the Complaint on behalf of Defendants Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson, and Daniel J. Booth, without prejudice and without waiver of any of Defendants' defenses, objections, or arguments in this matter or any other matters except as to sufficiency of service of process; Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint; and Once a Lead Plaintiff is appointed by the Court, the parties will work out an agreement on a schedule for the filing of an amended complaint and the response thereto, which will be submitted to the Court for approval. ORDER The above stipulation is ORDERED APPROVED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/02/2018) (ama) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 . . Document filed by The Hannah Rosa Trust. (Brower, David) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 ., 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Royce Setzer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Royce Setzer. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-09024-NRB ., 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-8983; 17-9024 . MOTION to Appoint Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 . MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Desilvio v. Lion Biotechnologies Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Press Releases, # 3 Exhibit 3 - In re Muni. Mortg. Order, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Shah v. GenVec Order)(Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 ., 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Royce Setzer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Royce Setzer. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-09024-NRB ., 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-8983; 17-9024 . MOTION to Appoint Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 . MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE 34 Memorandum) - AFFIDAVIT of David A.P. Brower in Support re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 .. Document filed by The Hannah Rosa Trust. (Brower, David) Modified on 2/1/2018 (db). (Entered: 01/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Richard W. Gonnello in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 ., 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 . MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Glenn Fausz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Glenn Fausz in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 ., 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 . MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Glenn Fausz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 ., 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 . MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Glenn Fausz. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Naomi Reice Buchwald, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Rieder on behalf of Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson. (Rieder, Eric) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather Shaw Goldman on behalf of Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson. (Goldman, Heather) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION OF THE OMEGA INVESTOR GROUP FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL re: 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 . MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Glenn Fausz, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, Patricia Zaborowski. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Richard W. Gonnello in Support re: 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-8983; 17-9024 . MOTION to Appoint Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Glenn Fausz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-8983; 17-9024 . MOTION to Appoint Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Glenn Fausz. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-8983; 17-9024 ., MOTION to Appoint Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Glenn Fausz. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 . MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Glenn Fausz, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, Patricia Zaborowski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B - Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 . MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Glenn Fausz, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, Patricia Zaborowski. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-09024 ., MOTION to Appoint Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, and Glenn Fausz to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Approve Counsel . Document filed by Glenn Fausz, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, Patricia Zaborowski. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP. MOTION to Appoint Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-08983-NRB, 1:17-cv-09024-NRB .. Document filed by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A PSLRA Notice, # 2 Exhibit B Certification, # 3 Exhibit C Chart, # 4 Exhibit D Resume, # 5 Exhibit E BPH Lead Plaintiff Order)(Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP. MOTION to Appoint Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-08983-NRB, 1:17-cv-09024-NRB . . Document filed by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP., MOTION to Appoint Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-08983-NRB, 1:17-cv-09024-NRB . Document filed by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Letter re Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from David A. Rosenfeld dated 01/16/18 re: Request for Leave from Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois.(Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
DECLARATION of David A.P. Brower in Support re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 ., 11 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 and to appoint lead plaintiff and lead counsel addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from David A.P. Brower dated 1/16/2018.. Document filed by The Hannah Rosa Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Brower, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 ., 11 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 and to appoint lead plaintiff and lead counsel addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from David A.P. Brower dated 1/16/2018. . Document filed by The Hannah Rosa Trust. (Brower, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Appoint The Hannah Rosa Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 . Document filed by The Hannah Rosa Trust.(Brower, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 17-cv-08983, 17-cv-09024 and to appoint lead plaintiff and lead counsel addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from David A.P. Brower dated 1/16/2018. Document filed by The Hannah Rosa Trust.(Brower, David) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm. MOTION to Appoint Royce Setzer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Royce Setzer. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-09024-NRB . . Document filed by Royce Setzer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm., MOTION to Appoint Royce Setzer to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Royce Setzer., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:17-cv-09024-NRB . Document filed by Royce Setzer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Phillip) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (7 in 1:17-cv-08983-NRB) Letter, filed by Glenn Fausz, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, (10 in 1:17-cv-09024-NRB) Letter, filed by Glenn Fausz, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun. ENDORSEMENT: The motion may be made without a conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/16/2018) (ras) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated 01/15/2018 re: leave from compliance with Your Honor's Individual Practice Rule requiring a pre-motion conference before filing of any motion. Document filed by Patricia Zaborowski, Hong Jun, Cynthia Peterson, Simona Vacchieri, Glenn Fausz.(Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 5 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application Granted. No pre-motion conference is necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/16/2018) (ama) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiff Motion addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Daniel Kuznicki dated January 15, 2018. Document filed by The Hannah Rosa Trust.(Kuznicki, Daniel) (Entered: 01/15/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson. (vf) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Dror Gronich. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Daniel J. Booth, Omega Healthcare Investors, Inc., C. Taylor Pickett, Robert O. Stephenson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14375878)Document filed by Dror Gronich.(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 9 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?