Camacho v. Pompeo
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00140

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 7, 2020 at 10:56 AM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alexis Camacho, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jaime M Diez +1 956 544 3565 +1 956 550 0006 jaimemdiez@aol.com
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Final
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Appear
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Objections
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Witness List
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Proposed Conclusions of Law
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Witness List
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Order for Initial Conference - FORMCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/25/2018, Entered: 8/25/2018 SEALED Exhibits
                                                        Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2018, Entered: 8/25/2018 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20741719) filed by Alexis CAMACHO.(Diez, Jaime)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?