Zirvi v. Flatley
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-07003

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2021 at 3:43 PM ST (4.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maria Kempe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy M. Kolman +1 215 750 3134 +1 215 750 3138 tkolman@kolmanlaw.net
No Logo Matthew Lubin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy M. Kolman +1 215 750 3134 +1 215 750 3138 tkolman@kolmanlaw.net
No Logo Monib Zirvi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy M. Kolman +1 215 750 3134 +1 215 750 3138 tkolman@kolmanlaw.net
v.
No Logo Affymetrix, Defendant
No Logo Applied Biosystems, Defendant
No Logo David R Walt, Defendant
No Logo Illumina, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jay T Flatley, Defendant
No Logo Jian Bing Fan, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Gunderson, Defendant
No Logo Mark Chee, Defendant
No Logo Stephen P.A. Fodor, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (181) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Oral Argument
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Amended Summons Issued
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Affidavit (non-motion)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Affidavit (non-motion)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/27/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David R Walt. (dnh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Applied Biosystems. (dnh) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David R. Walt, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Applied Biosystems d/b/a brand of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David R. Walt, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/8/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Applied Biosystems d/b/a brand of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/8/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David R. Walt, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/8/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Applied Biosystems d/b/a brand of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/8/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen P.A. Fodor. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Chee. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin Gunderson. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jian Bing Fan. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jay T Flatley. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Illumina Inc.. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Affymetrix. (jgo) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Affymetrix d/b/a as part of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jian Bing Fan, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Chee, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Gunderson, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen P.A.Fodor, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David R. Walt, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Illumina Inc., re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jay T. Flatley, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Applied Biosystems d/b/a brand of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Applied Biosystems d/b/a brand of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Affymetrix d/b/a as part of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jian Bing Fan, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Chee, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Gunderson, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen P.A.Fodor, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David R. Walt, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Illumina Inc., re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jay T. Flatley, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Applied Biosystems d/b/a brand of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Affymetriz d/b/a as part of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jian Bing Fan, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Chee, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Gunderson, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen P.A.Fodor, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David R. Walt, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Illumina Inc., re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jay T. Flatley, re: 13 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Affymetrix, Applied Biosystems, Mark Chee, Jian Bing Fan, Jay T Flatley, Stephen P.A. Fodor, Kevin Gunderson, Illumina Inc., David R Walt. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi.(Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kolman, Timothy) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST MOTION for Timothy M.Kolman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Attachments: # 1 cert of service, # 2 declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 certificate of good standing)(Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/3/2018 (jc). Modified on 8/3/2018 (bcu). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jay T. Flatley, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Affymetriz d/b/a as part of Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Gunderson, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Chee, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Illumina Inc., re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David R. Walt, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen P.A.Fodor, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jian Bing Fan, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Applied Biosystems d/b/a Thermo Fisher Scientific, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi. (Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against d/b/a as part of Thermo Fisher Scientific Affymetrix, d/b/a brand of Thermo Fisher Scientific Applied Biosystems, Mark Chee, Jian Bing Fan, Jay T Flatley, Stephen P.A. Fodor, Kevin Gunderson, Illumina Inc., David R Walt. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15405260)Document filed by Maria Kempe, Matthew Lubin, Monib Zirvi.(Kolman, Timothy) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?