Michael Lavigne v. Herbalife, LTD
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-07480-JAK-MRW
District Judge John A. Kronstadt, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 30, 2021 at 3:38 PM DT (6.7 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cody Pyle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M Jones jason@jonesatlaw.com
Space Paul Andrew Levin +1 818 630 7901 +1 818 630 7199 plevin@themrlg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
Space Lara O'Donnell +MiamiF L33 131 2803 lara@markmigdal.com
No Logo Felix Valdez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M Jones jason@jonesatlaw.com
Space Paul Andrew Levin +1 818 630 7901 +1 818 630 7199 plevin@themrlg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
Space Lara O'Donnell +MiamiF L33 131 2803 lara@markmigdal.com
No Logo Izaar Valdez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M Jones jason@jonesatlaw.com
Space Paul Andrew Levin +1 818 630 7901 +1 818 630 7199 plevin@themrlg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
Space Lara O'Donnell +MiamiF L33 131 2803 lara@markmigdal.com
No Logo Jeff Rodgers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M Jones jason@jonesatlaw.com
Space Paul Andrew Levin +1 818 630 7901 +1 818 630 7199 plevin@themrlg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
Space Lara O'Donnell +MiamiF L33 131 2803 lara@markmigdal.com
No Logo Jennifer Lavigne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M Jones jason@jonesatlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
Space Lara O'Donnell +MiamiF L33 131 2803 lara@markmigdal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by themrlg.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Andrew Levin +1 818 630 7901 +1 818 630 7199 plevin@themrlg.com
No Logo Jennifer Ribalta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M Jones jason@jonesatlaw.com
Space Paul Andrew Levin +1 818 630 7901 +1 818 630 7199 plevin@themrlg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
Space Lara O'Donnell +MiamiF L33 131 2803 lara@markmigdal.com
No Logo Michael Lavigne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M Jones jason@jonesatlaw.com
Space Paul Andrew Levin +1 818 630 7901 +1 818 630 7199 plevin@themrlg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
Space Lara O'Donnell +MiamiF L33 131 2803 lara@markmigdal.com
No Logo Patricia Rodgers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M Jones jason@jonesatlaw.com
Space Paul Andrew Levin +1 818 630 7901 +1 818 630 7199 plevin@themrlg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark Migdal & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald John Hayden +1 305 374 0440 don@markmigdal.com
Space Etan Mark +1 305 710 2641 etan@markmigdal.com
Space Lara O'Donnell +MiamiF L33 131 2803 lara@markmigdal.com
v.
No Logo Alcides Mejia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Amber Wick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Amy Hendricks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Arquimedes G. Valencia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Bradley Harris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Carol Rosenau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Christopher Reese, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Claudia Rasch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Cody Morrow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Daniel J. Waldron, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Danielle Edwards, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Debbie Katz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Dennis Dowdell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Disney De La Concepcion, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Emma Sandoval, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Enrique Carillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Fernando Rancel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Garrain S. Jones, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Graeme Edwards, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Guillermo Rasch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
Herbalife International, Inc. Herbalife International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul S Chan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 pchan@birdmarella.com
Space Mark T Drooks +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 mtd@birdmarella.com
Space Gopi K Panchapakesan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 gkp@birdmarella.com
Herbalife International Of America, Inc. Herbalife International Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul S Chan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 pchan@birdmarella.com
Space Mark T Drooks +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 mtd@birdmarella.com
Space Gopi K Panchapakesan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 gkp@birdmarella.com
Herbalife Nutrition Ltd. Herbalife Nutrition Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Herbalife Ltd"

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul S Chan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 pchan@birdmarella.com
Space Mark T Drooks +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 mtd@birdmarella.com
Space Gopi K Panchapakesan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 gkp@birdmarella.com
No Logo Jason Wick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Jennifer Micheli, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Jenny Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Jillian Addy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo John Tartol, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Jorge De La Concepcion, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Kristopher Bickerstaff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Leslie R Stanford, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Lori Baker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Manuel Costa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Mark Matika, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Mark Addy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Mark Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Michael Katz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Miriam Mejia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Paulina Riveros, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Paymi Romero, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Ron Rosenau, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Ryan Baker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Samuel Hendricks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Sandra Gioiosa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Susan Peterson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Thomas P. Gioiosa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
No Logo Gabriel Sandoval, Post Giles Dalby Correctional Facility

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary Foster +1 813 387 0300 +1 813 387 1800 zachary.foster@quarles.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (353) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Reschedule
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Notice of Lodging
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None ERRATA
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Exclude
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Exclude
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Exclude
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Exclude
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Exclude
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Exclude
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Review of Discovery Matter
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order Form (G-120)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Transcript Order Form (G-120)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Sealed Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Sealed Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Status Conference - optional html form
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 278 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 277 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Substitution of Attorney -- GRANTED
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 265 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: 3/24/2020 Generic Text Only EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER PURSUANT TO CONTINUITY OF OPERATIONS PLAN by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Pursuant to the Continuity of Operations ("COOP") Plan for the Central District of California, effective March 23, 2020 through and including May 1, 2020, no hearings in civil cases will go forward except for time-sensitive emergency matters, in which hearings will be conducted telephonically. See Order of the Chief Judge 20-042, available at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Accordingly, all motions, status conferences and Rule 16(b)/26(f) Scheduling Conferences presently calendared between March 23, 2020 and May 1, 2020 are, or upon the completion of the briefing will be, taken under submission with all scheduled hearings taken off calendar. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, all motions will be decided without oral argument; provided, however the Court may order supplemental briefing. All current deadlines for the briefing of motions and the filing of status reports and Rule 16(b)/26(f) Scheduling Conference reports remain in place. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 264 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 Generic Text Only Entry
                                                                                                                                                                    (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO DISREGARD DKT. [263] ORDER by John A. Kronstadt. Counsel are directed to disregard the referenced Order which was issued in the wrong case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                      **DISREGARD** ORDER (jp) Modified on 3/10/2020 (cw).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 262 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Report
                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT REPORT of COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FEBRUARY 26, 2020 ORDER [Dkt. 261] filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Jackson, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 Order on Motion to Certify Class ActionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DKT. [207]); HERBALIFE'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT. [208]) before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The motion hearing is held. The Motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION. Counsel should meet and confer, and file a joint report on or before 3/5/2020, with their respective and/or collective views as to what dates should be adopted for future pre-trial proceedings in this matter following the issuance of the orders on both the Defendant's Motion and Plaintiffs Motion. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order (Dkt. [259]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Stipulation is therefore GRANTED, and the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 58) is amended as follows: Initial Expert Disclosures: 3/13/2020. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 3/27/2020. Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 4/13/2020. Last day to File All Motions (including discovery motions): 3/23/2020. Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation: 4/14/2020. Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement: 4/17/2020. Post Mediation Status Conference: 4/27/2020 at 11:30 AM. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Stipulation to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Order,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines,, Terminate Hearings,, Terminate Deadlines, [258], Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, [248] filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Jackson, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Motion Hearing Dates (Dkt. [257]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Stipulation is therefore GRANTED, and the Scheduling Order (Dkt. [248]) is amended as follows: Hearing on motion to dismiss [207] and motion for class certification [208]: 2/24/2020 at 08:30 AM. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Herbalife's Motion to Dismiss from February 10, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. to February 24, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class [207], NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Complaint)[208], Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, [248] filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Jackson, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant Herbalife re Objection/Opposition (Motion related)[255] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order re Herbalife's Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Jason Jones)(Jackson, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to Declaration of Jason Jones In Support of Plaintiff's Reply In Support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class [207] filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Jackson, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Regarding Class Certification Reply Brief filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Adar, Yaniv)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/30/2020 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. You can send a joint e-mail to the chambers account (MRW_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov) on Monday to let me know where things stand. (See Minute Order for further details) Court Recorder: CS 1/29/2020. (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 252 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 6 re Order, [251], APPLICATION for Leave to file Exhibits 2 and 6 to the Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - Declaration of Jason Jones under seal [235] filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez.(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 235) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Therefore, Plaintiffs' Application to File Documents Under Seal (Dkt. [235]) is GRANTED IN PART. Exhibit 6 to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification shall be filed under seal in accordance with the applicable procedures on or before January 31, 2020. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: 1/23/2020 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jonathan M. Jackson in support of APPLICATION for Leave to file Exhibits 2 and 6 to the Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - Declaration of Jason Jones under seal [235] filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Anna Bogard (Herbalife))(Jackson, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Re Plaintiff Application for Leave to File Under Seal (Dkt. [235]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Application is GRANTED PROVISIONALLY pending receipt of further declaration(s) in support of the Application, which may be filed under seal by reference to this order. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCLOSURE AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES (DKT. [241]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, The Stipulation is therefore GRANTED, and the Scheduling Order (Dkt. [229]) is amended as follows: Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off 1/24/2020. Hearing on motion to dismiss and motion for class certification: 2/10/2020 at 8:30 AM. Initial Expert Disclosures: 2/28/2020. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 3/13/2020. Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 3/30/2020. Last day to File All Motions (including discovery motions): 3/9/2020. Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation: 3/31/2020. Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement: 4/3/2020. Post Mediation Status Conference: 4/13/2020 at 11:30 AM. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court set the matters for hearing on Wednesday, January 29, at 2 p.m. PT. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Amendment (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment to MOTION to Compel Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery[230] filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Adar, Yaniv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. correcting MOTION to Compel Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery[230], Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held[233] (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum Amended Motion, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit B)(Adar, Yaniv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery[230] filed by Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals). (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Declaration of Michael S. Catlett)(Tuffaha, Joedat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION In Opposition To re: MOTION to Compel Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery[230] filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jonathan M. Jackson)(Jackson, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdezto MOTION for Discovery regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues [231], Brief (non-motion non-appeal), [232] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Continue Expert Disclosure and Discovery Cut-Off Dates from Initial Expert Disclosures: 1/31/20 to 2/28/20; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 2/14/20 to 3/13/20 and Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 3/2/20 to 3/30/20 filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Chan, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting [228] Non-Resident Attorney Zchery S Foster APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals), designating Joe H Tuffaha as local counsel. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting [227] Non-Resident Attorney Michael S Catlett APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals), designating Joe H Tuffaha as local counsel. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting [226] Non-Resident Attorney Edward A Salanga APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals), designating Joe H Tuffaha as local counsel. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting [225] Non-Resident Attorney Kevin D Quigley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals), designating Joe H Tuffaha as local counsel. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 236 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 4 and 20 to the Amended Complaint under seal[209] filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2, # (2) Exhibit 6)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020, Terminated: 1/21/2020 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Leave to file Exhibits 2 and 6 to the Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - Declaration of Jason Jones under seal filed by Plaintiffs' Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. Application set for hearing on 2/10/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class [207] filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Jason Jones, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Declaration Jennifer Ribalta)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DOCUMENT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 Brief (non-motion) (non-appeal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF filed by Non-Party Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals). regarding Telephone Conference, [221]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael S. Catlett, # (2) Exhibit A to Catlett Decl., # (3) Exhibit B to Catlett Decl., # (4) Exhibit C to Catlett Decl., # (5) Exhibit D to Catlett Decl.)(Tuffaha, Joedat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jonathan M. Jackson)(Attorney Jonathan Michael Jackson added to party Herbalife International of America Inc(pty:dft))(Jackson, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery filed by Plaintiffs' Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Re Stipulation for Rescheduling of Deadline to File Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification 9Dkt. [223]0 by Judge John A. Kronstadt, theStipulation is GRANTED, and the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 201) is amended asfollows: Reply to motion for class certification: 1/13/2020. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020, Terminated: 1/14/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachery S. Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals) (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25076956) filed by Non-Party Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals). (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Attachment 1 to Proposed Order) (Tuffaha, Joedat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020, Terminated: 1/14/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Catlett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals) (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25076898) filed by Non-Party Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals). (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Attachment 1 to Proposed Order) (Tuffaha, Joedat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020, Terminated: 1/14/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward A. Salanga to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals) (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25076830) filed by Non-Party Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals). (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Attachment 1 to Proposed Order) (Tuffaha, Joedat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020, Terminated: 1/14/2020 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin D. Quigley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals) (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25076652) filed by Non-Party Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals). (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Attachment 1 to Proposed Order) (Tuffaha, Joedat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joedat H Tuffaha counsel for Movant Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals). Adding Joe H. Tuffaha as counsel of record for Non-Party Movants Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy, et al. (44 individuals) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Non-Party Movants Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy, et al. (44 individuals). (Attorney Joedat H Tuffaha added to party Individual Terminated Defendants Mark Addy et al. (44 individuals)(pty:mov))(Tuffaha, Joedat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 Stipulation to Reschedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Reschedule Deadline to File Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 222 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Complaint)[208] filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: 12/30/2019 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. All briefs (not to exceed 15 pages) may be filed by January 8, 2020. Any response (not to exceed 10 pages) may be filed by January 15, 2020. (See Minute Order for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 12/30/2019. (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/26/2019 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: TELEPHONE CALL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Well have a short call on Monday, December 30, at 9:30 a.m. PT. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Complaint)[208] Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 218 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class [207] filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kimberly Cooper, # (2) Declaration of Sacha Mauricio Domingo Donovan, # (3) Declaration of Bob Bogard, # (4) Declaration of Tommy Gioiosa, # (5) Declaration of Jorge de la Concepcion, # (6) Declaration of Gopi K. Panchapakesan, # (7) Request for Judicial Notice, # (8) Evidentiary Objections, # (9) Expert Report of Robert L. Kehr)(Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Re Stipulation re Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date (Dkt. [214]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is GRANTED as follows: (1) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Herbalife's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. [208])) shall be due on 12/23/2019. (2) Herbalife's Reply in support of the Motion shall be due on 1/6/2020. (3) The hearing on the Motion, currently set for 3/9/2020, is advanced to 2/10/2020, at 8:30 AM. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 216 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 20 to the Amended Complaint re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, [213], Amended Complaint/Petition,, [202] filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez.(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 215 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits 4 to the Amended Complaint re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, [213], Amended Complaint/Petition,, [202] filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez.(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Stipulation for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Order Re Revised Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. [209]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Therefore, the Application [209]is GRANTED as follows: The Clerk shall file under seal the Declaration (Dkt. [210]) and its supporting exhibits (Dkts. 210-1, 210-2). No later than December 6, 2019, Plaintiffs shall file under seal, as separate items on the docket, Exhibits 4 and 20 to the First Amended Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 212 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. re Stipulation for Protective Order [211] (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Stipulation for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc.(Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 210 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 4 and 20 to the Amended Complaint under seal[209] filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Unredacted Document EX 4 to the Amended Complaint, # (2) Unredacted Document EX 20 to the Amended Complaint)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 209 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019, Terminated: 12/2/2019 Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 4 and 20 to the Amended Complaint under seal filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 208 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Complaint) filed by Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Motion to Certify Class ActionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. Motion set for hearing on 2/10/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Order on Motion for Order re Discovery MatterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE / ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY RULING held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) settling [205] Motion for Order Court Recorder: XTR 11/25/2019. (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019, Terminated: 11/25/2019 Motion for Order re Discovery Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Re: Informal Discovery Dispute. (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for November 25, 2019 at 9:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiffs moved to compel the production of materials from the defense.(Docket # 178.) The Court (Magistrate Judge Wilner) issued a supplemental order,conducted an extended conference call with the lawyers, and solicited additional briefing that focused on the remaining issues at play in the parties dispute. (Docket # 189-95.) The motion to compel is, therefore, granted with modifications. It is the Courts hope (expressly asserted in a factual vacuum) that these materials can be produced shortly after the upcoming Thanksgiving holidays by December 6 for meaningful use in the class cert. briefing. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 202 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Amended Complaint/Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Herbalife International of America Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery),,,, [1], filed by plaintiff Izaar Valdez, Patricia Rodgers, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11, # (13) Exhibit 12, # (14) Exhibit 13, # (15) Exhibit 14, # (16) Exhibit 15, # (17) Exhibit 16, # (18) Exhibit 17, # (19) Exhibit 18, # (20) Exhibit 19, # (21) Exhibit 20)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER (DKT. 199) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Therefore, the Application is GRANTED IN PART and the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 198) is amended as follows: Last day to amend or add parties: November 12, 2019; Deadline to file motion for class certification: November 25, 2019; Response to motion for class certification: December 20, 2019; Reply to motion for class certification: January 10, 2020; Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: January 24, 2020; Initial Expert Disclosures: January 31, 2020; Hearing on motion for class certification: February 10, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: February 14, 2020; Expert Discovery Cut-Off: March 2, 2020; Last day to file All Motions (including discovery motions): March 9, 2020; Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation: March 31, 2020; Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement: April 3, 2020; Post Mediation Status Conference: April 13, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. (bm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 3/2/2020[199] filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Gopi K. Panchapakesan, # (2) Declaration of Paul S. Chan)(Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019, Terminated: 11/12/2019 Motion to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 3/2/2020 filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Notice, # (3) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Re Stipulation for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines (DKT. [197])/AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt, The Stipulation is therefore GRANTED and the Scheduling Order (Dkt. [177])amended as follows: Deadline to file motion for class certification: 11/8/2019. Response to motion for classcertification: 12/2/2019. Reply to motion for class certification: 12/16/2019. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 11/22/2019. Initial Expert Disclosures: 12/6/2019. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 12/20/2019. Hearing on motion for class certification: 1/13/2020 AT 8:30 am. Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 1/3/2020. Last day to file All Motions (including discovery motions): 1/3/2020. Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation: 1/28/2010. Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement: 2/1/2020. Post Mediation Status Conference: 2/10/2020 at 11:30 AM. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Drooks, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 196 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 Order on Motion to dismiss caseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. 142) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Motion [142] is GRANTED, without prejudice. Leave to amend is warranted, given that this is the first version of the Complaint that has been presented, and under the permissive standards that apply, there is no showing that any amendment would be futile. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than 11/12/2019. Pursuant to the Order of March 18, 2019, the deadline to amend or add parties is also set as 21 days from the issuance of this Order. See Dkt. 168. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltdto Supplement(Motion related), [193] (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Gopi K. Panchapakesan)(Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and JOINT STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE[178] Response to Herbalife Supplemental Brief filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and JOINT STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE[178] Supplemental Brief re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sacha Mauricio Domingo Donovan, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Declaration of Gopi K. Panchapakesan, # (4) Exhibit A and B)(Chan, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and JOINT STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE[178] Supplemental filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Etan Mark, Part 1, # (2) Declaration of Etan Mark, Part 2, # (3) Declaration of Etan Mark, Part 3, # (4) Declaration of Jason Jones, # (5) Declaration of Izaar Valdez, # (6) Declaration of Jennifer Ribalta)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Telephone Conference / Briefing Schedule held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court relieves the parties of the joint briefing obligation under Local Rule 37. Each side will submit a brief (NTE 15 pages) by noon on Wednesday, September 18, addressing the categories in dispute. Each side may also file an optional responsive brief (NTE 8 pages) by noon on September 25. (See Minute Order for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 9/11/2019. (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with the parties regarding the status of discovery. The Court sets a further telephonic status conference on September 11, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. Court Recorder: XTR 9/5/2019. (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court tentatively sets the matter for a telephone call on Thursday, September 5, at 10 a.m. (See Minute Order for further details) re: MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and JOINT STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE [178] (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/25/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting [185], [187] Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer C Jones APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez, designating Paul A Levin as local counsel. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019, Terminated: 8/23/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/22/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24306094) filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24306094)[185]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019, Terminated: 8/23/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24306094) filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting [179] [181] Non-Resident Attorney Yaniv Adar APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers and Izaar Valdez, designating Paul A Levin as local counsel. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. Herbalife's Notice of Supplemental Authority re Motion to Dismiss [142] (Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yaniv Adar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24165344)[179]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019, Terminated: 8/21/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yaniv Adar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24172210) filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Counsel informed the clerk that the parties have reached a resolution to the pending discovery dispute. (Docket # 178.) On that basis, the motion is withdrawn. The motion hearing set for August 28, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. is off calendar. (See Minute Order for further details) withdrawing [178] Motion to Compel (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019, Terminated: 8/21/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yaniv Adar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24165344) filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019, Terminated: 7/30/2019 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and JOINT STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. Motion set for hearing on 8/28/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) December 28, 2018 Scheduling Order, # (3) March 18, 2019 Order Amending Deadlines, # (4) July 16, 2019 Order Extending Pretrial Deadlines, # (5) Declaration of Gopi K. Panchapakesan, # (6) Declaration of Bob Bogard, # (7) Declaration of Daria Laudeman)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Re Stipulation for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines [175]/AMENDED Scheduling Order by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Stipulation is GRANTED and the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 147) amended as follows: Deadline to file motion for class certification: 10/25/2019; Response to motion for class certification: 11/15/2019; Non-Expert Discovery cut-off: 11/22/2019. Reply to motion for class certification: 12/2/2019. Initial Expert Disclosures: 12/6/2019. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 12/20/2019. Hearing on motion for class certification: 1/13/2020 at 8:30 AM. Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 1/3/2020. Last day to file All Motions (including discovery motions): 1/3/2020. Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation: 1/28/2020. Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement: 2/1/2020. Post Mediation Status Conference: 2/10/2020 at 11:30 AM. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. If the parties wish to file a motion regarding discovery issues, they are relieved of the joint filing requirement under Local Rule 37. The motion may be filed by July 26, 2019. The opposition may be filed by August 5, 2019. The briefs may not exceed no more than 15 pages. The motion will be heard on August 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (See Minute Order for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 7/15/2019. (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: 7/10/2019 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines to 60 days filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: 7/10/2019 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for July 15, 2019 at 10:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 173 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. re Stipulation for Protective Order [172] (vm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Stipulation for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd.(Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 171 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: 4/2/2019 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that on March 25, 2019, the Court amended its Consolidated Standing Order. Counsel shall refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-kronstadt) to obtain a copy of the Order. The March 25, 2019 version of the Consolidated Standing Order is effective in this action immediately. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting [169] Non-Resident Attorney Jason M Jones APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez, designating Paul Levin as local counsel. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: 3/19/2019, Terminated: 3/26/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason M. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23400277) filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Re Stipulation for Extension of Add/Amend Deadline (DKT. [167]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Stipulation is hereby GRANTED IN PART as follows: The 3/18/2019 deadline to amend or add parties is VACATED. The deadline will be reset upon issuance of a decision regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 142). (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,, [159] filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/11/19, 8:30 AM re Transcript [165] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Joko, Alexander) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/11/19, 8:30 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2019. (Joko, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Herbalife International Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Michelle Hicks at mhicks@birdmarella.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Drooks, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/15/2019 Order on Motion to dismiss caseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFENDANTS' MOTION to Dismiss (DKT. [142]) before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The motion hearing is held. Counsel address the Court. At the conclusion of the hearing the Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION, with a written ruling to be issued. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 162 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT REPORT of Neutral Selection filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 161 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Re Stipulation for Rescheduling of hearing on Motion to Dismiss (DKT. [160]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt 1/28/2019 hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss [142] will be continued to 2/11/2019. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019 Stipulation to Reschedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Reschedule Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [142] filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 1/2/2019 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DATES(DKT. 147) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court has reviewed the parties December 6, 2018 Joint Report and sets the following deadlines: Last day to amend or add parties 3/18/19. Deadline to file joint report regarding agreed upon private neutral 1/22/19. Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 142) 1/28/19 at 8:30 a.m. Deadline to file motion for class certification 8/26/19. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off 9/23/19. Hearing on motion for class certification 10/21/19 at 8:30 a.m. Last day to file all motions 11/4/19. Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation 12/2/19. Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement 12/6/19. Post Mediation Status Conference 12/16/19 at 1:30 p.m. (bp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than December 2, 2019. Status Conference set for December 16, 2019 at 1:30 pm before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice and Request for Plaintiff to Appear by Phone [154]. The following error(s) was/were found: The title of the document does not match the docket text. The document is titled as a request but it is e-filed as a notice. The document is accepted as filed. However, counsel shall adhere to the CM/ECF Procedures when efiling documents. The title of the document and the docket text shall reflect the same. Any future document will be stricken In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Re Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference [154] by Judge John A. Kronstadt that Plaintiffs Request is MOOT. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION (DKT. [147]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on December 17, 2018 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE and Request for Plaintiffs' Counsel to Appear at Case Management Conference by Telephone filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 weeks, filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 152 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [142] filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. (Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 151 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [142] filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: First REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Applications [132], for the following reasons: The Request does not comply with L.R. 11-3.8. The caption of all pleadings filed in this case shall match the caption listed on the docket. The Request is stricken. In light of the Applications being refiled at Dkt. 139, 140, this Request does not need to be refiled. The Court accepts Dkt. 139 and 140 as filed timely. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt granting [130], [140] Non-Resident Attorney Etan Mark APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, designating Paul Levin as local counsel. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ON APPLICATION NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting [128], [139] Non-Resident Attorney Donald J Hayden APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez, designating Paul Levin as local counsel. (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt that the Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM. Joint Rule due by 12/7/2018. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 145 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DKT. [64][68][70]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action was transferred to this District on August 28, 2018. Dkt. [108]. The case has been assigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. Dkt. [141]. Any pending motion filed prior to August 28, 2018 is MOOT. Dkt. [64][68][70]. The parties shall refile the motion consistent with the Local Rules of this District and this Court's Standing Order. Defendants Motion to Dismiss, filed on September 28, 2018, shall remain. Dkt. [142]. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 144 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: LA CV18-07480 JAK (MRWx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials DDP on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. [141] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd, (Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 142 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018, Terminated: 10/22/2019 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Roxane Romans, # (2) Request for Judicial Notice, # (3) Exhibit Part 1, # (4) Exhibit Part 2) (Panchapakesan, Gopi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07480 FMO(PLAx). (rn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018, Terminated: 10/9/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Etan Mark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/4/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22361459) filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018, Terminated: 10/9/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Donald J. Hayden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/4/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22361336) filed by plaintiff Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Attorney Paul Andrew Levin added to party Jennifer Ribalta(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Andrew Levin added to party Jeff Rodgers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Andrew Levin added to party Patricia Rodgers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Andrew Levin added to party Izaar Valdez(pty:pla)) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018, Terminated: 10/9/2018 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***THIS DOCUMENT IS HEREBY STRICKEN PER ORDER [150]*** First REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Applications filed by plaintiff Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul) Modified on 10/9/2018 (jp).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Etan Mark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22361459)[130]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018, Terminated: 10/9/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Etan Mark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22361459) filed by plaintiff Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald J. Hayden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22361115)[128]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Please select Application. The selected description should be the same as the name/title of form when efiling the document. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018, Terminated: 10/9/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donald J. Hayden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22361115) filed by plaintiff Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez. (Attorney Paul Andrew Levin added to party Jennifer Lavigne(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Andrew Levin added to party Michael Lavigne(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Andrew Levin added to party Cody Pyle(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Andrew Levin added to party Felix Valdez(pty:pla)) (Levin, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Zachary Scott Foster on behalf of Defendants Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Brian A Howie on behalf of Defendants Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Edward A Salanga on behalf of Defendants Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Kevin D Quigley on behalf of Defendants Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Michael S Catlett on behalf of Defendants Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick, Plaintiff Cody Pyle. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Steven Douglas Knox on behalf of Defendants Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick, Plaintiffs Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. I am not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. Related Case(s): 2:13-cv-02488-BRO-RZ (Drooks, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Erin E Bohannon on behalf of Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Steve I Silverman on behalf of Defendants Herbalife International Inc, Herbalife International of America Inc, Herbalife Ltd. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Todd Alan Levine on behalf of Defendants. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven Douglas Knox. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Catlett. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kevin D. Quigley. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward A. Salanga. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian A. Howie. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Zachary Scott Foster. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Erin E. Bohannon. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Todd Alan Levine. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steve I. Silverman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lara O'Donnell. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason M. Jones. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Etan Mark. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Donald J. Hayden. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Notice of Receipt of Case Transferred in - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:17-cv-23429-MGC, from U.S. District Court Southern District of Florida (Miami). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:18-cv-07480-DDP (MRWx). (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Florida Southern
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [62] Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part [63] Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/23/2018. See attached document for full details. (chd)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 ORDER - event converted from ICMSCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting [104] Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/20/2018. (chd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018, Terminated: 8/20/2018 Motion - event converted from ICMS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom at the Hearing Scheduled for August 22, 2018 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 8/31/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order on All Parties' Joint Request for Leave to Use Computer Equipment at Hearing)(Bohannon, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting [102] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 8/8/2018. (chd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018, Terminated: 8/8/2018 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time/Pretrial Deadlines by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 8/20/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan) Modified Text on 8/7/2018 (ls). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 101 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER Setting Hearing on [62] Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and [63] Defendant's Motion to Change Venue. Motion Hearing will occur on August 22, 2018 at 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Parties should be prepared to discuss both motions and especially prepared to discuss the following issues:1) Whether an agent/principal relationship exists between Herbalife and the Individual Defendants.2) Which, if any, claims are barred by the Bostick Settlement.3) Which, if any, claims are covered by the arbitration provision included in certain Plaintiffs' Distributor Agreements. 4) Which, if any, claims are covered by the forum selection provision included in certain Plaintiffs' Distributor Agreements. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/23/2018. (chd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 MISCELLANEOUS - event converted from ICMS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Reply)(Levine, Todd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Replies due by 5/21/2018. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to R&RCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting [95] Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). The deadline for responding to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Complaint (ECF Nos. 68, 70) is hereby extended until 20 days after Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration is resolved. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/14/2018. (ecz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerks Notice to Filer re [95] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re [70] Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS [1] Complaint,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6), [68] MOT. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018, Terminated: 5/14/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [70] Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS [1] Complaint,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6), [68] MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice [1] Complaint,,,, by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 5/24/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan) Modified Relief on 5/11/2018 (ls). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Order on Motion to Stay CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STAY AND PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF PRETRIAL DEADLINES granting in part and denying in part [65] Motion to Stay( Joinder of Parties due by 6/8/2018.); granting in part and denying in part [65] Motion for Protective Order; granting [92] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/16/2018. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: 4/9/2018, Terminated: 4/16/2018 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 4/23/2018 (Mark, Etan)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: 3/14/2018 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz. Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party HERBALIFE, LTD(pty:dft). (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: 2/22/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting [85] Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration in Excess of Twenty Pages. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/22/2018. (ecz)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to R&RCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting [87] Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to file Defendants' Reply in further support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration. Reply due on or before March 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/21/2018. (ecz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines Per DE#88 Replies due by 3/14/2018. (cqs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines Per DE#88 Replies due by 3/14/2018. (cqs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018, Terminated: 2/21/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Todd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Replies due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13)(Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: 2/9/2018, Terminated: 2/22/2018 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration in Excess of Twenty Pages by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Roxane Romans Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Silvia Ramirez Declaration) (Foster, Zachary) Modified on 1/19/2018 (rms1). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Striking [82] Notice (Other),,,, filed by Jason Wick, Mark Addy, Ron Rosenau, Paulina Riveros, Leslie R Stanford, Daniel J. Waldron, Ryan Baker, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, Disney De La Concepcion, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Dennis Dowdell, Carol Rosenau, Michael Katz, Christopher Reese, Mark Matika, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Jorge De La Concepcion, Jennifer Micheli, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Fernando Rancel, Gabriel Sandoval, Graeme Edwards, Garrain S. Jones, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Susan Peterson, Cody Morrow, Emma Sandoval, Sandra Gioiosa, Guillermo Rasch, Debbie Katz, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Paymi Romero, Claudia Rasch, Danielle Edwards, Jenny Davis, Enrique Carillo, Jillian Addy, Manuel Costa, John Tartol, Lori Baker, Amy Hendricks, Mark Davis, Amber Wick, Samuel Hendricks by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STRICKEN NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration Filing Supplemental Declarations in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit) (Foster, Zachary) Modified on 1/19/2018 (rms1). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Striking [79] Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, Mark Addy, HERBALIFE, LTD, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC (Defendants' Notice of Striking ECF NO. 79 As a Duplicative Filing) by Mark Addy, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD (Levine, Todd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [65] Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, andDefendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Joint Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay) filed by Mark Addy, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. (Levine, Todd)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STRICKEN REPLY to Response to Motion re [65] Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, andDefendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Joint Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay) filed by Mark Addy, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. (Levine, Todd) Modified on 1/17/2018 (rms1). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/8/2018 NOTICE - event converted from ICMS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re [76] Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,. Document Replaced Due to Error; The original document contained a scrivener's error with regard to the style of the case reflected on the Order of Referral to Mediation. The correct document has been attached to this notice. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *ORDER ON MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/5/2018. (mso) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: ( Jury Trial set for 9/3/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 8/28/2019 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2018., Expert Discovery due by 3/1/2019., Fact Discovery due by 11/2/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 4/9/2018., Final proposed jury instructions and verdict form Deadline 8/23/2019., In Limine Motions due by 7/19/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2018., Daubert and Markman Motions due by 6/7/2019., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/19/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/5/2018. (tm) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Main Document 76 replaced on 1/8/2018) (tm). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: 1/3/2018 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting [74] Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay and for Protective Order. Reply due on or before January 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/3/2018. (ecz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reset Deadlines Per DE#75. Replies due by 1/15/2018. (cqs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018, Terminated: 1/3/2018 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay and for Protective Order re [65] Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, andDefendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 1/16/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Todd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Deadlines Per DE#73. See Order For additional deadlines. Responses due by 2/12/2018 (cqs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 12/30/2017, Entered: 12/30/2017 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting [71] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Also pending are [68] [70] Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, [62] Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, and [63] Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue tothe Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A).As per the parties' request, Plaintiffs will respond to the pending motions on or before the following dates: [62] Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration - February 12, 2018. [63] Joint Motion to Transfer Venue - February 12, 2018. [68] Individual Defendants' Motions to Dismiss - February 20, 2018. [70] Herbalife's Motion to Dismiss - February 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/29/2017. (ecz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [65] Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, andDefendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Replies due by 1/4/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Mark, Etan)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017, Terminated: 12/30/2017 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to file responses to Defendants Motions to Dismiss [D.E. 68 and 70], Defendants Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration [D.E. 62] and Defendants Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Central District Of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) [D.E. 63] by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 1/11/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 70 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017, Terminated: 10/8/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS [1] Complaint,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Responses due by 1/5/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on Herbalife's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Bohannon, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD identifying Other Affiliate Credit Suisse AG, Other Affiliate Nomura Holdings, Inc. for HERBALIFE, LTD (Bohannon, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017, Terminated: 10/8/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice [1] Complaint,,,, by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 1/5/2018 (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick re [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A), [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration Defendants' Second Request to Take Judicial Notice (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Original Class Action Complaint filed 4-8-13 in Bostick v. Herbalife Int'l of America, Inc.) (Bohannon, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick re [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) of Filing Corrected Exhibit 3 to Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S. C. 1404(A) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 3 to Joint Motion to Transfer Venue) (Bohannon, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 4/16/2018 Motion to Stay Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's MOTION to Stay re [62] MOTION to Compel Arbitration , [63] Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) Discovery, Pretrial Disclosures, and Other Deadlines and ( Responses due by 12/28/2017), Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order Pending Ruling on Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Their Alternative Motions to Transfer Venue and to Dismiss With Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Joint Motion to Stay Discovery, # (2) Exhibit B to Joint Motion to Stay Discovery, # (3) Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Stay Discovery)(Bohannon, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 10/8/2018 Motion to transfer case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to file separate motions to dismiss by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Todd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 8/23/2018 motion to change venue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to The Central District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 12/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 to Motion to Transfer Venue, # (2) Exhibit 2 to Motion to Transfer Venue, # (3) Exhibit 3 to Motion to Transfer Venue, # (4) Proposed Order on Motion to Transfer Venue)(Bohannon, Erin) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017, Terminated: 8/23/2018 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 12/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Arquimedes G. Valencia, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick Joint Request to Take Judicial Notice. Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jillian Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Mark Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Lori Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Ryan Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Kristopher Bickerstaff(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Enrique Carillo(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Manuel Costa(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jenny Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Mark Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Disney De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jorge De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Dennis Dowdell(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Danielle Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Graeme Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Sandra Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Thomas P. Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Bradley Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Amy Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Samuel Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Garrain S. Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Debbie Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Michael Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Mark Matika(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Alcides Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Miriam Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jennifer Micheli(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Cody Morrow(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Susan Peterson(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Fernando Rancel(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Claudia Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Guillermo Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Christopher Reese(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Paulina Riveros(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Paymi Romero(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Carol Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Ron Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Emma Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Gabriel Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Leslie R Stanford(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party John Tartol(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Arquimedes G. Valencia(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Daniel J. Waldron(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Amber Wick(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party Jason Wick(pty:dft). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E) (Levine, Todd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin D. Quigley on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward A. Salanga on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian A. Howie on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Catlett on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Douglas Knox on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia. Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Arquimedes G. Valencia(pty:dft). (Knox, Steven) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Scott Foster on behalf of Arquimedes G. Valencia. Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Arquimedes G. Valencia(pty:dft). (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Attachment B, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Joint Scheduling Order)(Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerks Notice to Filer re [52] Notice (Other),,, [51] Notice (Other),,, [49] Notice (Other),,,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick of Appearance of Kevin D. Quigley (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick of Appearance of Michael S. Catlett (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick of Appearance of Brian A. Howie (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick of Appearance of Edward A. Salanga (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting [44] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kevin D. Quiqley; granting [45] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael S. Catlett; granting [46] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Brian A. Howie; and granting [47] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Edward A. Salanga. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/15/2017. (jdo) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017, Terminated: 11/15/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Edward A. Salanga. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10189042 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 11/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017, Terminated: 11/15/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian A. Howie. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10189039 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 11/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017, Terminated: 11/15/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael S. Catlett. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10189038 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 11/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017, Terminated: 11/15/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin D. Quiqley. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10189034 by Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Responses due by 11/28/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Foster, Zachary)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Douglas Knox on behalf of Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jillian Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Mark Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Lori Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Ryan Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Kristopher Bickerstaff(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Enrique Carillo(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Manuel Costa(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jenny Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Mark Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Disney De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jorge De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Dennis Dowdell(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Danielle Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Graeme Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Sandra Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Thomas P. Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Bradley Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Amy Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Samuel Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Garrain S. Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Debbie Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Michael Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Mark Matika(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Alcides Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Miriam Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jennifer Micheli(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Cody Morrow(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Susan Peterson(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Fernando Rancel(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Claudia Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Guillermo Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Christopher Reese(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Paulina Riveros(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Paymi Romero(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Carol Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Ron Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Emma Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Gabriel Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Leslie R Stanford(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party John Tartol(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Daniel J. Waldron(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Amber Wick(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Douglas Knox added to party Jason Wick(pty:dft). (Knox, Steven) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Scott Foster on behalf of Jillian Addy, Mark Addy, Lori Baker, Ryan Baker, Kristopher Bickerstaff, Enrique Carillo, Manuel Costa, Jenny Davis, Mark Davis, Disney De La Concepcion, Jorge De La Concepcion, Dennis Dowdell, Danielle Edwards, Graeme Edwards, Sandra Gioiosa, Thomas P. Gioiosa, Bradley Harris, Amy Hendricks, Samuel Hendricks, Garrain S. Jones, Debbie Katz, Michael Katz, Mark Matika, Alcides Mejia, Miriam Mejia, Jennifer Micheli, Cody Morrow, Susan Peterson, Fernando Rancel, Claudia Rasch, Guillermo Rasch, Christopher Reese, Paulina Riveros, Paymi Romero, Carol Rosenau, Ron Rosenau, Emma Sandoval, Gabriel Sandoval, Leslie R Stanford, John Tartol, Daniel J. Waldron, Amber Wick, Jason Wick. Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jillian Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Mark Addy(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Lori Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Ryan Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Kristopher Bickerstaff(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Enrique Carillo(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Manuel Costa(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jenny Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Mark Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Disney De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jorge De La Concepcion(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Dennis Dowdell(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Danielle Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Graeme Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Sandra Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Thomas P. Gioiosa(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Bradley Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Amy Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Samuel Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Garrain S. Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Debbie Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Michael Katz(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Mark Matika(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Alcides Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Miriam Mejia(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jennifer Micheli(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Cody Morrow(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Susan Peterson(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Fernando Rancel(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Claudia Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Guillermo Rasch(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Christopher Reese(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Paulina Riveros(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Paymi Romero(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Carol Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Ron Rosenau(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Emma Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Gabriel Sandoval(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Leslie R Stanford(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party John Tartol(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Daniel J. Waldron(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Amber Wick(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Scott Foster added to party Jason Wick(pty:dft). (Foster, Zachary) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: All Defendants as per DE [41]. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to R&RCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting [30] Joint Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint. Responses due on or before December 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/2/2017. (ecz)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting [38] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and permitting Jason Jones to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiffs, JEFF RODGERS, PATRICIA RODGERS, MICHAEL LAVIGNE, JENNIFER LAVIGNE, CODY PYLE, JENNIFER RIBALTA, IZAAR VALDEZ, FELIX VALDEZ, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, for all purposes relating to this case and directing the Clerk to provide notice of electronic filings to Jason Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/25/2017. (jf00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting [36] and [37] Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice and permitting Paul S. Chan and Gopi K. Panchapakesan to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendants, HERBALIFE, LTD., HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC., and HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC., for all purposes in this case and directing the Clerk to provide notice of electronic filings to Paul S. Chan and Gopi K. Panchapakesan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/25/2017. (jf00)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017, Terminated: 10/25/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason Jones. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10138810 by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez. Responses due by 11/8/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017, Terminated: 10/25/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gopi K. Panchapakesan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10137661 by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Responses due by 11/8/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Steve) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017, Terminated: 10/25/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul S. Chan. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10137596 by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Attorney Steve I. Silverman added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Steve I. Silverman added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Steve I. Silverman added to party HERBALIFE, LTD(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/8/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Steve) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting [34] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mark T. Drooks may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Defendants, HERBALIFE, LTD., HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC., and HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Mark T. Drooks at mdrooks@birdmarella.com and Lisa Lambrix at llambrix@birdmarella.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/24/2017. (jf00)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017, Terminated: 10/24/2017 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark T. Drooks. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10134876 by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Levine added to party HERBALIFE, LTD(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/7/2017 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Todd) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Court Practice re Joint Motions Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/23/2017. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/23/2017. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: 10/23/2017 case referred to magistrate judgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/23/2017. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017, Terminated: 11/2/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to R&R
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to [1] Complaint,,,, by HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC, HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC, HERBALIFE, LTD. Attorney Erin E Bohannon added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL OF AMERICA, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Erin E Bohannon added to party HERBALIFE INTERNATIONAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Erin E Bohannon added to party HERBALIFE, LTD(pty:dft). (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Bohannon, Erin)[Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Carol Rosenau served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Ron Rosenau served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Guillermo Rasch served on 10/2/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Claudia Rasch served on 10/2/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Miriam Mejia served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Alcides Mejia served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Jenny Davis served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Mark Davis served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Sandra Gioiosa served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Thomas P. Gioiosa served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Daniel J. Waldron served on 10/5/2017, answer due 10/26/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Leslie R Stanford served on 9/27/2017, answer due 10/18/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Michael Katz served on 9/26/2017, answer due 10/17/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Debbie Katz served on 9/26/2017, answer due 10/17/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Emma Sandoval served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Gabriel Sandoval served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Garrain S. Jones served on 10/2/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Mark Matika served on 9/28/2017, answer due 10/19/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Jillian Addy served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Mark Addy served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Samuel Hendricks served on 10/4/2017, answer due 10/25/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Amy Hendricks served on 10/5/2017, answer due 10/26/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Disney De La Concepcion served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. Jorge De La Concepcion served on 10/3/2017, answer due 10/24/2017. (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Amended Notice of Filing Summons by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Attachments: # (1) Summon(s)) (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Cody Pyle, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers, Patricia Rodgers, Felix Valdez, Izaar Valdez (Attachments: # (1) Summon(s), # (2) Summon(s), # (3) Summon(s), # (4) Summon(s), # (5) Summon(s), # (6) Summon(s), # (7) Summon(s), # (8) Summon(s), # (9) Summon(s), # (10) Summon(s), # (11) Summon(s), # (12) Summon(s), # (13) Summon(s), # (14) Summon(s), # (15) Summon(s), # (16) Summon(s), # (17) Summon(s), # (18) Summon(s), # (19) Summon(s), # (20) Summon(s), # (21) Summon(s), # (22) Summon(s), # (23) Summon(s), # (24) Summon(s), # (25) Summon(s), # (26) Summon(s), # (27) Summon(s), # (28) Summon(s), # (29) Summon(s), # (30) Summon(s), # (31) Summon(s), # (32) Summon(s), # (33) Summon(s), # (34) Summon(s), # (35) Summon(s), # (36) Summon(s), # (37) Summon(s), # (38) Summon(s), # (39) Summon(s), # (40) Summon(s), # (41) Summon(s), # (42) Summon(s), # (43) Summon(s), # (44) Summon(s), # (45) Summon(s), # (46) Summon(s), # (47) Summon(s), # (48) Summon(s)) (Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Complaint - (Discovery)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10037428, filed by Izaar Valdez, Jennifer Lavigne, Michael Lavigne, Patricia Rodgers, Cody Pyle, Felix Valdez, Jennifer Ribalta, Jeff Rodgers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Civil Cover Sheet)(Mark, Etan) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/27/2018.]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 3,801 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?