Bokaie v. Green Earth Coffee LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-05244

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2019 at 3:10 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brenda Ward, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Peter Block +1 707 251 9871 kb@winelawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Roman Block +1 707 251 9871 rb@winelawyers.com
No Logo Carol Bokaie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Peter Block +1 707 251 9871 kb@winelawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Roman Block +1 707 251 9871 rb@winelawyers.com
No Logo Gurjiwan Uppal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Peter Block +1 707 251 9871 kb@winelawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Roman Block +1 707 251 9871 rb@winelawyers.com
No Logo Marie Uppal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Peter Block +1 707 251 9871 kb@winelawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Roman Block +1 707 251 9871 rb@winelawyers.com
No Logo Neera Bhandari, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Peter Block +1 707 251 9871 kb@winelawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Roman Block +1 707 251 9871 rb@winelawyers.com
No Logo Patrick Ward, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Peter Block +1 707 251 9871 kb@winelawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Roman Block +1 707 251 9871 rb@winelawyers.com
No Logo Sandeep Bhandari, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Peter Block +1 707 251 9871 kb@winelawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Roman Block +1 707 251 9871 rb@winelawyers.com
No Logo Stefan Bokaie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by winelawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Peter Block +1 707 251 9871 kb@winelawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Roman Block +1 707 251 9871 rb@winelawyers.com
No Logo Surinder Uppal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Peter Block +1 707 251 9871 kb@winelawyers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Roman Block +1 707 251 9871 rb@winelawyers.com
v.
No Logo Carlos Zambrano, Defendant
No Logo Exchange Bank, Defendant
No Logo Flying Rooster, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Green Earth Coffee LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Leave to File a Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (12(b)(6)) filed by Marie Uppal, Stefan Bokaie, Brenda Ward, Patrick Ward, Surinder Uppal, Carol Bokaie, Neera Bhandari, Sandeep Bhandari, Gurjiwan Uppal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Neera Bhandari, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Stefan Bokaie, Gurjiwan Uppal, Marie Uppal, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Patrick Ward. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to defendant Exchange Bank by Neera Bhandari, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Stefan Bokaie, Gurjiwan Uppal, Marie Uppal, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Patrick Ward (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Ward, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Neera Bhandari, Stefan Bokaie, Marie Uppal, Gurjiwan Uppal. Green Earth Coffee LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/13/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Ward, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Neera Bhandari, Stefan Bokaie, Marie Uppal, Gurjiwan Uppal. Carlos Zambrano served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/13/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Neera Bhandari, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Stefan Bokaie, Gurjiwan Uppal, Marie Uppal, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Patrick Ward.. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Ward, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Neera Bhandari, Stefan Bokaie, Marie Uppal, Gurjiwan Uppal. Exchange Bank served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/3/2018) Modified on 9/5/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/03/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Summons issued
                                                                      Summons Issued as to Exchange Bank, Flying Rooster, LLC, Green Earth Coffee LLC, Carlos Zambrano. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                        Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                                            Proposed Summons. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against Green Earth Coffee LLC, Carlos Zambrano, Flying Rooster, LLC, Exchange Bank (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12630382). Filed by Stefan Bokaie. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Block, Roman) (Filed on 8/27/2018) Modified on 8/28/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?