CASEY v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02011

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 30, 2018 at 12:43 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LINDA CASEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashcraft and Gerel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Adrien Parfitt +1 703 931 5500 +1 703 820 1656 mparfitt@ashcraftlaw.com
v.
No Logo Imerys Talc America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo JOHNSON & JOHNSON, Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Defendant
No Logo PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Extraction
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                    SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Notice of Related Case
                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LINDA CASEY. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-1510 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5660324) filed by LINDA CASEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, # 3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., # 4 Summons Imerys Talc America, Inc., # 5 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?