Clevenger v. Johnson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-02150

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2019 at 6:40 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ashley B. Clevenger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CAIR - Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thania Diaz Clevenger +1 813 514 1414 tclevenger@cair.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAIR Florida, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tark Richard Aouadi +1 407 490 0407 taouadi@cair.com
v.
No Logo Jeh Charles Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Mary Anne Cranford Rhodes, Defendant
Citation Americans with Disabilities Act
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Party
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Set Aside
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Clerks default
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Clerks default
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Clerks default
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Extend Time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Case Reassigned to Judge William F. Jung. New case number: 8:18-cv-2150-T-02TGW. Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell no longer assigned to the case. (JNB) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Interested persons order by Ashley B. Clevenger. (Clevenger, Thania)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ashley B. Clevenger. Related case(s): No (Clevenger, Thania)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER to Strike RE: 4 Motion to extend time filed by Ashley B. Clevenger. Plaintiff's Emergency Notice of Unavailability and Motion to Extend Deadlines (Doc. 4) is hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/11/2018. (BGS)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Thania Diaz Clevenger on behalf of Ashley B. Clevenger (Clevenger, Thania)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 6 ***EMERGENCY MOTION/NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Ashley B. Clevenger. (Schuttauf, Erich) Modified on 9/10/2018 (CTR). Modified on 9/11/2018 (CTR).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Interested persons orderCourt Filing
                                                                          INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/12/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/29/2018. (BGS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Related case order and track 2 noticeCourt Filing
                                                                            RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/12/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/29/2018. (BGS)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against Jeh Charles Johnson, Mary Anne Cranford Rhodes (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA052749) filed by Ashley B. Clevenger. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CTR).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?