LEE v. N.E.C.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02034

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2019 at 3:39 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT LEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert, Lee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Lee
v.
No Logo I.B.E.W, Defendant
No Logo I.B.E.W., LOCAL UNION #26, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'DONOGHUE & O'DONOGHUE LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer R. Simon +1 202 362 0041 +1 202 237 1200 jsimon@odonoghuelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer R. Simon +1 202 362 0041 +1 202 237 1200 jsimon@odonoghuelaw.com
No Logo J.E. RICHARDS ELECTRICAL, Defendant
No Logo N.E.C.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ford & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anessa Abrams +1 202 719 2029 +1 202 719 2077 aabrams@fordharrison.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Stay
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Fox/Neal Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Rachel Simon on behalf of I.B.E.W., LOCAL UNION #26 (Simon, Jennifer)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE to Party re 1 Notice of Removal. (zmd)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by N.E.C.A.. (Abrams, Anessa)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Notice of Related Case
                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by N.E.C.A.. Case related to Case No. 1:18cv01832. (Abrams, Anessa)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 notice of removal
                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC Superior, case number 2018 CA 005574 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5665833 filed by N.E.C.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-S, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abrams, Anessa)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?