Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-05680

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2019 at 12:45 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ada Victoria Anon +1 212 836 8000 Ada.Anon@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus Aaron Asner +1 212 836 8000 +1 212 836 8689 marcus.asner@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alice Clare Campbell Huling +1 212 836 8311 alice.huling@kayescholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RYAN Z. WATTS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Drew Mr. Harker +1 202 942 5022 +1 202 942 5999 drew.harker@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc- DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie Y. Flaxman +1 202 973 4800 carrie.flaxman@ppfa.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Muniz +1 202 973 4997 +1 202 296 3480 richard.muniz@ppfa.org
v.
Azar, II, Alex Michael Azar, II, Alex Michael, Defendant
Officially listed as "Alex Michael Azar, II"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Health and Human Services"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo Valerie Huber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo Twenty Members of Congress, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Boris Bershteyn, PHV +1 212 735 3000 +1 212 735 2000 boris.bershteyn@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Micah Festa Fergenson +21273 530 00x2258 +1 212 735 2000 micah.fergenson@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalie Margaret Gabrenya +1 312 407 0676 +1 312 827 9431 natalie.gabrenya@skadden.com
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of cross-appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Judgment-Clerk
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: terminating 32 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 45 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is granted as to the 2018 Tier 1 FOA because the evaluative tools that applicants for Tier 1 grants must "replicat[e]" are not "programs" and have not "been proven effective through rigorous evaluation," as required by the statute. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied as to the 2018 Tier 2 FOA. Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied, and their cross-motion for summary judgment is denied asto the 2018 Tier 1 FOA and granted as to the 2018 Tier 2 FOA. Defendants are permanently enjoined from using the 2018 Tier 1 FOA as the basis for awarding or disbursing TPP Program funds. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 32 and 45 and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/30/2018) (ama)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
              LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Benjamin H. Torrance dated August 16, 2018 re: available dates. Document filed by Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss .CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in opposition to plaintiff's motion 32 . Document filed by Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
                  DECLARATION of Leslie M. Kantor, PhD, MPH re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss .CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Permanent Injunction . MOTION for Summary Judgment . (DECLARATION OF LESLIE M. KANTOR, PhD, MPH). Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
                    DECLARATION of Marcus A. Asner re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss .CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Permanent Injunction . MOTION for Summary Judgment . (DECLARATION OF MARCUS A. ASNER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY OR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT). Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Reply - non motion
                      REPLY re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss .CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment ., 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Permanent Injunction . MOTION for Summary Judgment . (PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY OR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT). Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss .CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Benjamin H. Torrance dated August 2, 2018 re: summarizing government's opposition to plaintiff's motion and government's motion. Document filed by Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                            NOTICE of Filing of Administrative Record and Index re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss .CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                              DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance in Support re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss .CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C part 1, # 4 Exhibit C part 2, # 5 Exhibit D part 1, # 6 Exhibit D part 2)(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                MOTION to Dismiss ., CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 40 Motion for Micah Fergenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/1/2018) (rro) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                    ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 41 Motion for Natalie Gabrenya to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/1/2018) (rro) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                      ORDER terminating 38 Letter Motion for Conference. The motion to file an amici curiae brief is granted without the necessity of a pre-motion conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/1/2018) (rro) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                        MOTION for Natalie Gabrenya to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15395155. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Twenty Members of Congress. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Natalie Gabrenya, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing Issued by Clerk, Supreme Court of the State of Illinois, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gabrenya, Natalie) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                          MOTION for Micah Fergenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15394872. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Twenty Members of Congress. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Micah Fergenson, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing Issued by Clerk, Appellate Division, Third Judicial Department, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fergenson, Micah) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                            DECLARATION of Margaret Barnette in Support re: 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Permanent Injunction . MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None ConferenceCourt Filing
                                              LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Unopposed Motion to Submit Brief of Amici Curiae addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Boris Bershteyn dated July 27, 2018. Document filed by Twenty Members of Congress. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Bershteyn, Boris) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                DECLARATION of Drew A. Harker in Support re: 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Permanent Injunction . MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-9, # 2 Exhibits 10-15, # 3 Exhibits 16-18, # 4 Exhibits 19-21)(Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Permanent Injunction . MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                    RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                      DECLARATION of Benjamin Link in Support re: 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Permanent Injunction . MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 39 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Margaret Barnette in Support re: 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . MOTION for Permanent Injunction . MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc. (Asner, Marcus) Modified on 8/2/2018 (db). (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Permanent Injunction
                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ., MOTION for Permanent Injunction ., MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc..(Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None letterCourt Filing
                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Marcus A. Asner dated July 24, 2018 re: summary of Motion for Preliminary or Permanent Injunction and Summary Judgment. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc..(Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PHO HAC VICE: granting 27 Motion for Drew Harker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/23/2018) (ama) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alice Clare Campbell Huling on behalf of Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Huling, Alice) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ada Victoria Anon on behalf of Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Anon, Ada) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    MOTION for Drew Harker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15344597. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Drew Harker in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Harker, Drew) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER: terminating 25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting 25 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Due to The Court's schedule the requested submission dates cannot be accommodated. Separately, the page limits requested are modified as noted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/18/2018) (ama) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Benjamin H. Torrance dated July 18, 2018., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Benjamin H. Torrance dated July 18, 2018. Document filed by Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER: In response to the parties' joint request by telephone call that the Court issue a decision in this case no later than September 5, 2018, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff's Motion(s) July 24, 2018; Defendants' Opposition and Cross-Motion(s) August 2, 2018; Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition August 9, 2018; Defendants' Reply August 16, 2018. Two courtesy copies of each brief shall be delivered directly to Chambers no later than 5:00 p.m. on each of the above due dates. (Motions due by 7/24/2018. Cross Motions due by 8/2/2018. Responses due by 8/9/2018. Replies due by 8/16/2018.) (Signed by Judge Naomi R. Buchwald on 7/17/2018) (jwh) Modified on 7/17/2018 (jwh). (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Henry Torrance on behalf of Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 21 Motion for Carrie Y. Flaxman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/09/2018) (ama) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                MOTION for Carrie Y. Flaxman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15296986. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Carrie Flaxman, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Flaxman, Carrie) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 19 Motion for Richard Muniz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/03/2018) (ama) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                    MOTION for Richard Muniz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15279669. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Richard Muniz, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York on 6/28/2017. Service was accepted by Haojun Lee, Civil Clerk. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General Jeff Sessions on 6/27/18. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service as to USA
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. Valerie Huber served on 6/27/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service as to USA
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. Alex Michael Azar, II served on 6/27/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service as to USA
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 6/27/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Valerie Huber. (dnh) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex Michael Azar, II. (dnh) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Valerie Huber, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alex Michael Azar II, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Valerie Huber, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) Modified on 6/26/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alex Michael Azar II, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) Modified on 6/26/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (jgo) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc..(Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Valerie Huber, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) Modified on 6/25/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alex Michael Azar II, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) Modified on 6/25/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc.. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Alex Michael Azar, II, Valerie Huber, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15235654)Document filed by Planned Parenthood of New York City, Inc..(Asner, Marcus) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk. Transmitted re: 55 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,, to the Orders and Judgments Clerk. (ama)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 40 MOTION for Micah Fergenson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15394872. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 41 MOTION for Natalie Gabrenya to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15395155. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 27 MOTION for Drew Harker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15344597. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 21 MOTION for Carrie Y. Flaxman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15296986. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 19 MOTION for Richard Muniz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15279669. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marcus Aaron Asner to RE-FILE Document No. 8 Request for Issuance of Summons, 9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the request for issuance of summons must directly correspond to the caption on the pleading. You may list the leading defendant followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marcus Aaron Asner to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name on pdf 'To' section must include 'care of c/o';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marcus Aaron Asner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:702; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 05:551; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?