Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians v. McKesson Corporation
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-op-46017

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 12, 2019 at 5:44 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Beggs & Lane, RLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES NIXON DANIEL +1 850 469 3306 +1 850 469 3330 jnd@beggslane.com
v.
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC Allergan Finance, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Allergan PLC fka Actavis PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo CVS Health, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc."
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo John Does 1 - 100, Defendant
No Logo Johnson and Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
No Logo Mallinckrodt plc d/b/a Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Defendant
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Allergan Finance, LLC waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Purdue Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Actavis, LLC waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018 filed on behalf of Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians (Daniel, J.) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Complaint
                                  Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8887234.. Filed by Battle Mountain Band of the Te-Moak Tribe of Western Shoshone Indians. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Daniel, J.)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?