Salgado v. Harrell
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-03066

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 3, 2021 at 6:46 PM DT (2.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jessie Christian Salgado, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roberto M. Hinojosa +1 713 665 5060 attorneyrmh@yahoo.com
No Logo Kathe L. Harrell, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R. Pompeo"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Objections
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Response
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Continuance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Objections
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Continuance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Continuance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Setting/Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Continuance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/14/2021, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/21/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Continuance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Setting (noticing) - Civil
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None referring case to magistrate judge
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/22/2020, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Reassignment (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/8/2018, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Petition/Complaint for Writ of Mandamus
                                                                                              PETITION/COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20788180.) filed by Jessie Christian Salgado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Hinojosa, Roberto)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?