BUSTAMANTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02068

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 10:28 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BRIENNA L. BUSTAMANTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HACKING LAW PRACTICE, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Hacking, III +1 314 961 8200 +1 314 961 8201 jim@hackinglawpractice.com
No Logo MOHAMMED SOGHAR, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HACKING LAW PRACTICE, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James O. Hacking, III +1 314 961 8200 +1 314 961 8201 jim@hackinglawpractice.com
v.
No Logo JENNIFER RASAMIMANA, Defendant
Nielsen, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kirstjen, Defendant
Officially listed as "KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN"
No Logo L. FRANCIS CISSNA, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL POMPEO"
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES"
No Logo US CONSULATE, Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE"
Citation Section 08 U.S.C. § 1329
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/3/2018, Entered: 9/3/2018 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5669183) filed by MOHAMMED SOGHAR, BRIENNA L BUSTAMANTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons)(Hacking, James)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 6 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?