Jodi Kanowitz v. New Garden Of Palms LLC
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. BC714738

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 4, 2018 at 12:15 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Does 1-50, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo New Garden Of Palms Llc, Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Pacific Crest Retirement - [doe 1], Defendant/Respondent
No Logo Garden Of Palms, Defendant/Respondent's DBA
No Logo Kanowitz Jodi, Plaintiff/Petitioner

Represented by Jay S Rothman and Associates

Type Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Partial Dismissal
w/o Prejudice) (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO NEW GARDEN OF PALMS, LLC ONLY
    Blank 5 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Amendment to Complaint
    NAMING DOE 1 AS: PACIFIC CREST RETIREMENT, INC dba GARDEN OF PALMS
      Blank 4 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Proof-Service/Summons
        Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
          Blank 2 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: 7/23/2018 Notice-Case Management Conference
            Blank 1 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Complaint

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 398 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?