Song v. Kind LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-04982

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 14, 2019 at 1:10 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cassandra Song, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheehan & Associates, Plc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer I. Sheehan +1 347 635 4160 +1 516 234 7800 spencer@spencersheehan.com
v.
No Logo Kind Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kind LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassandra Song. Kind INC. waiver sent on 12/2/2018, answer due 1/31/2019. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassandra Song. Kind LLC waiver sent on 12/2/2018, answer due 1/31/2019. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to Kind INC., Kind LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10698716 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Cassandra Song. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Kind LLC, # 3 Proposed Summons Kind INC.) (Sheehan, Spencer)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 5 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?