Glaser v. Upright Citizens Brigade LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00971

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 1, 2020 at 5:05 PM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aaron Glaser, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by shirianpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Shirian +1 516 417 0201 +1 212 684 1428 mshirian@shirianpc.com
v.
No Logo 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryn Goodman +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0949 bgoodman@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Alex Sidtis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryn Goodman +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0949 bgoodman@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenwald Doherty, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2018, TERMINATED: 06/11/2018, TERMINATED: 06/11/2018 Zev Samuel Singer +1 845 589 9300 +1 845 638 2707 zs@greenwaldllp.com
No Logo Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryn Goodman +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0949 bgoodman@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenwald Doherty, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2018, TERMINATED: 06/11/2018, TERMINATED: 06/11/2018 Zev Samuel Singer +1 845 589 9300 +1 845 638 2707 zs@greenwaldllp.com
No Logo Susan Hale, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryn Goodman +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0949 bgoodman@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryn Goodman +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0949 bgoodman@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo UCBTLA, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryn Goodman +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0949 bgoodman@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryn Goodman +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0949 bgoodman@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenwald Doherty, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2018, TERMINATED: 06/11/2018, TERMINATED: 06/11/2018 Zev Samuel Singer +1 845 589 9300 +1 845 638 2707 zs@greenwaldllp.com
No Logo Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryn Goodman +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0949 bgoodman@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e-2sx
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/5/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Amended Summons Issued
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: denying 60 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 60) is DENIED on the basis of undue delay and prejudice to Defendants in the delayed adjudication of their jurisdictional objections to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may attach any documents relevant to Defendants' jurisdictional objections to his First Amended Complaint as exhibits to his opposition to Defendants' currently pending motions to dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 60. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/24/2018) (ama)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James M. Lemonedes dated September 18, 2018 re: 60 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Mark D. Shirian dated 9/14/2018. . Document filed by 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC. (Lemonedes, James)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                        FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Mark D. Shirian dated 9/14/2018. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Operating Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Article from January 2016)(Shirian, Mark)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 57 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS UPRIGHT CITIZENS BRIGADE, LLC, ALEX SIDTIS, AND SHANNON PATRICIA ONEILL'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO OCTOBER 1, 2018. THE COURT WILL ADDRESS ANY MOTION FROM PLAINTIFF SEEKING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED PLEADING IN A SEPARATE ORDER. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James M. Lemonedes dated September 13, 2018 re: 57 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 40 Declaration in Support of Motion, 39 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Mark D. . Document filed by 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC. (Lemonedes, James)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                              FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 40 Declaration in Support of Motion, 39 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Mark D. Shirian dated 9/13/2018. Document filed by Aaron Glaser.(Shirian, Mark)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 ~Util - Set Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO OPPOSE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the time for the Plaintiff, AARON GLASER, to respond to Defendants Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, UCB Inner Sanctum LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, and Susan Hale's ("Defendants") motion to dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint in its entirety filed on August 20, 2018, is hereby extended to October 1, 2018. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 10/1/2018), Motions terminated: 55 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 54 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 53 Declaration in Support of Motion, 52 MOTION to Dismiss. addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Mark D. filed by Aaron Glaser. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/05/2018) (ama)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 54 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 53 Declaration in Support of Motion, 52 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Mark D. Shirian dated 9/4/2018. Document filed by Aaron Glaser.(Shirian, Mark)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 52 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of James M. Lemonedes, Esq. in Support re: 52 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC.(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryn Goodman on behalf of 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC. (Goodman, Bryn) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. Lemonedes on behalf of 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Diane Richmond on behalf of 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC. (Richmond, Carolyn) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting 47 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS EXTENDED TO SEPTEMBER 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Mark D. Shirian dated 8/13/2018., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 Declaration in Support of Motion, 39 MOTION to Dismiss ., 41 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Mark D. Shirian dated 8/13/2018. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed So-Ordered Stipulation)(Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 39 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of James M. Lemonedes, Esq. in Support re: 39 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC.(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC waiver sent on 8/1/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. UCBTLA, LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Susan Hale served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. Service was accepted by Meghan Parks. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 31 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT MAY BE NO MORE THAN 40 PAGES. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James M. Lemonedes dated July 26, 2018. Document filed by Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC.(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that the time for defendants Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Alex Sidtis, and Shannon Patricia O'Neil ("Defendants") to respond to plaintiff Aaron Glaser's ("Plaintiff") First Amended Complaint, filed on June 27, 2018, is hereby extended up to and including August 1, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/03/2018). Set/Reset Deadlines: Shannon Patricia O'Neill answer due 8/1/2018; Alex Sidtis answer due 8/1/2018; Upright Citizens Brigade LLC answer due 8/1/2018. (ama) Modified on 7/5/2018 (ama). (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC. (vf) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 15 Motion to Dismiss. PLAINTIFF FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANTS SHANNON PATRICIA O'NEILL, ALEX SIDTIS, AND UPRIGHT CITIZENS BRIGADE LLC ON JUNE 27, 2018 (DKT. NO. 23). AS A RESULT, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT (DKT. NO. 15) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, and Susan Hale, re: 25 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, and Susan Hale, re: 25 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) Modified on 6/28/2018 (sj). (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 23 Amended Complaint,, against 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Aaron Glaser. Related document: 23 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Right to Sue, # 2 Exhibit B - Article)(Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, and Susan Hale, re: 23 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) Modified on 6/28/2018 (vf). (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale, Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Aaron Glaser. Related document: 1 Complaint,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Right to Sue Letter, # 2 Exhibit B - Article)(Shirian, Mark) Modified on 6/28/2018 (vf). (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: granting 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion of for Lev Samuel Singer to withdraw as attorney is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 21. SO ORDERED. Attorney Zev Samuel Singer terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/11/2018) (ama) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Zev Samuel Singer to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC.(Singer, Zev) Modified on 6/27/2018 (ldi). (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend ; granting 19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN OPPOSITION BRIEF OR AN AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN JUNE 27, 2018. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to AmendCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed So-Ordered Stipulation)(Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryn Goodman on behalf of Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (Goodman, Bryn) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of James M. Lemonedes, Esq. in Support re: 15 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC.(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 13 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. GRANTED. THE PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANTS' MOVING BRIEF AND FOR PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION BRIEF IS EXTENDED TO THIRTY PAGES. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from James M. Lemonedes, Esq. dated May 17, 2018. Document filed by Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC.(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER: The time for defendants Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Alex Sidtis, and Shannon Patricia ONeill ("Defendants") to respond to plaintiff Aaron Glaser's ("Plaintiff") Complaint, filed on February 4, 2018, is hereby extended to May 23, 2018. Shannon Patricia O'Neill answer due 5/23/2018; Alex Sidtis answer due 5/23/2018; Upright Citizens Brigade LLC answer due 5/23/2018. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/11/2018) (mml) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Shannon Patricia O'Neill served on 2/9/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. Service was accepted by Karen Thide - Suitable person of age and discretion. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Alex Sidtis served on 2/9/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. Service was accepted by Karen Thide - Suitable person of age and discretion. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Upright Citizens Brigade LLC served on 2/9/2018, answer due 4/23/2018. Service was accepted by Karen Thide. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that the time for defendants Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Alex Sidtis, and Shannon Patricia O'Neill ("Defendants") to respond to plaintiff Aaron Glaser's ("Plaintiff") Complaint, filed on February 4, 2018, is hereby extended to April 23, 2018. (Shannon Patricia O'Neill answer due 4/23/2018; Alex Sidtis answer due 4/23/2018; Upright Citizens Brigade LLC answer due 4/23/2018.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/20/2018) (ras) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zev Samuel Singer on behalf of Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (Singer, Zev) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. Lemonedes on behalf of Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Diane Richmond on behalf of Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (Richmond, Carolyn) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (sj) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Alex Sidtis, Shannon O'Neill, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 02/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14658966)Document filed by Aaron Glaser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Right to Sue, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Shirian, Mark) (Entered: 02/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Shannon Patricia O'Neill answer due 8/1/2018; Alex Sidtis answer due 8/1/2018; Upright Citizens Brigade LLC answer due 8/1/2018. (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mark Shirian to RE-FILE Document No. 23 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mark Shirian to RE-FILE Document No. 24 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mark Shirian to RE-FILE Document No. 26 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Amended summonses are issued to defendants previously issued one. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Shannon Patricia O'Neill, Alex Sidtis, Upright Citizens Brigade LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center, LLC, Upright Citizens Brigade Training Center LA, LLC, UCB Inner Sanctum, LLC, UCBTLA, LLC, 5419 Sunset Properties, LLC, Susan Hale added. Party added pursuant to 1 Complaint,.Document filed by Aaron Glaser. Related document: 1 Complaint,.(Shirian, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Mark Shirian. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Designated ECF. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?