Martino v. Crawford and Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-06003

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 7:16 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Martino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Martino hemitman@aol.com
v.
No Logo Crawford & Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ellis Legal P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Ellis +1 312 976 7629 jellis@ellislegal.com
No Logo United Parcel Service, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ellis Legal P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Ellis +1 312 976 7629 jellis@ellislegal.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REMAND with certified copy of the Minute Entry dated 10/10/2018 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (jh, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None order on motion to remand
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None order on motion to remand
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing and ruling on motion hearing held on 10/10/2018. Motion to remand 5 is granted. Case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Cook County forthwith. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY by Anthony Martino to memorandum in opposition to motion 14 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Notice Of Filing-Reply In Support Of Motion To Remand)(Martino, Anthony) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM by Crawford and Company, United Parcel Service, Inc. in Opposition to motion to remand 5 (Ellis, John) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 order on motion to set a briefing schedule
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 9/13/2018. Defendants' response to motion to remand 5 to be filed by 9/27/2018; plaintiff's reply to be filed by 10/4/2018. Status hearing and ruling on motion to remand 5 set for 10/10/2018 at 9:30 a.m. The Court defers ruling and enters and continues motion to vacate 9 . Mailed notice. (pjg, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the motion hearing set for 9/13/2018 is moved to 10:30 AM on that date. (mk) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE by Anthony Martinoin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Crawford and Company, United Parcel Service, Inc. to set a briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, to Vacate State Court Order of Default and to Extend Their Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead 9 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Martino, Anthony) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Motion by John C. Ellis for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule, 9 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/13/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Ellis, John) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Briefing Schedule
                    MOTION by Defendants Crawford and Company, United Parcel Service, Inc. to set a briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, to Vacate State Court Order of Default and to Extend Their Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ellis, John)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE by Anthony Martino (Martino, Anthony) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        STATE Court Record by Anthony Martino (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8-31-18 State Court Order Of Entry Of Default)(Martino, Anthony) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Motion by Anthony Martino for presentment of motion to remand 5 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/13/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Martino, Anthony) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Remand*
                            MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Martino to remand (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Notice Of Filing-Motion To Remand)(Martino, Anthony)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Crawford and Company, United Parcel Service, Inc. by John C. Ellis (Ellis, John) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Crawford and Company, United Parcel Service, Inc. (Ellis, John) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ellis, John) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018 M3 5922) filed by Crawford and Company, United Parcel Service, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14899956. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ellis, John) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (ec, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?