Board of County Commissioners of McClain County, State of Oklahoma v. Purde Pharma LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Western District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-00857

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 20, 2019 at 3:18 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The Board of County Commissioners of McClain County, State of Oklahoma, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs Armstrong Borochoff Mullican & Hart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Gibbs +1 918 587 3939 +1 918 582 5504 ggibbs@gabmh.com
v.
No Logo Actavis Inc., Defendant
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowe & Dunlevy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Elizabeth Huntsman +1 918 592 9866 +1 918 599 6385 susan.huntsman@crowedunlevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Michael McBride, III +1 918 592 9824 +1 918 592 6317 michael.mcbride@crowedunlevy.com
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan A Ray +1 918 583 7571 +1 918 584 7846 rar@nwcjlaw.com
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Christopher Moses, Defendant
No Logo CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Insys Therapeutic Inc, Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Knight, Defendant
No Logo Joshua Livingston, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Webster, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart D Campbell +1 918 582 1211 +1 918 591 5360 scampbell@dsda.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kaylee P Davis-Maddy +1 405 319 3500 +1 405 319 3524 kmaddy@dsda.com
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Perry Fine, Defendant
No Logo Purde Pharma LP, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
No Logo Roger Kinney, Defendant
No Logo Scott Fishman, Defendant
No Logo Tamerlane Rozsa, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (70) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Conditional Transfer Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Stay Case
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - LLC
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Expedite
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Remand to State Court
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/7/2018. (mb)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corporation . (Campbell, Stuart)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/6/18. (jw)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Order of recusal
                                                                                                                  ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable David L. Russell recused.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/6/18. (jw)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Receipt
                                                                                                                    Receipt for Money Received from McKesson Corporation in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500069452 regarding 1 Notice of Removal. (nv)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                      ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                          ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                                                                            DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                              NOTICE (other) by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc re 1 Notice of Removal,,,, Supplemental Notice in Support of Notice of Removal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - MDL Transfer Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Petition and Service Papers, McClain Co.)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Notice of Related or Companion Case
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                    ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 notice of removal
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McClain County District Court, case number CJ-2018-128 filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- McClain Docket Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 2- Petition, # 3 Exhibit 3- Summonses, # 4 Exhibit 4- Order Granting Cardinal Extension, # 5 Exhibit 5- Cardinal's Entry of Appearance, # 6 Exhibit 6- McKesson's Special Appearance & Motion for Enlargement, # 7 Exhibit 7- Order Granting Enlargement of Time (McKesson), # 8 Exhibit 8- Entry of Appearance (AmeriSource), # 9 Exhibit 9- Motion for Extension (AmeriSource), # 10 Exhibit 10- CVS's Special Entry of Appearance (Sharpe), # 11 Exhibit 11- CVS Special Appearance & Motion for Enlargement, # 12 Exhibit 12- CVS Special Entry of Appearance (White), # 13 Exhibit 13- Order Granting Enlargement of Time (CVS), # 14 Exhibit 14- Order Granting Enlargement of Time (McKesson), # 15 Exhibit 15- Order Granting Extension of Time (AmeriSource), # 16 Exhibit 16- Stipulation between Plaintiff and Manufacturing Defendants, # 17 Exhibit 17- Unpublished decisions, # 18 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?