United States v. Blaszczak
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cr-00357

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2021 at 10:31 AM DT (6.3 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella +1 212 637 2477 +1 212 637 2443 brooke.cucinella@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ian Patrick McGinley +1 212 637 2257 patrick.mcginley@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Arditi Naftalis +1 212 637 2310 +1 212 637 2527 joshua.naftalis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Theodore Huber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/12/2017 Jonathan Paul Bach +1 212 479 6470 +1 212 208 2634 jbach@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry H Berke +1 212 715 9100 bberke@kramerlevin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dani R. James +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 djames@kramerlevin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nolan James Robinson +1 212 715 9356

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (153) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None judgment
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Acquittal
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/20/17 CONFERENCE CORRECTED CONFERENCE has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Conference held on 12/20/17 CONFERENCE CORRECTED CONFERENCE before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Defendant Robert Olan moves (1) to dismiss Count 3, (2) for an order requiring the government to review information in the possession of the SEC to comply with its Brady obligations, (3) for a bill of particulars, and ( 4) to sever Counts 17 and 18 from the balance of the case. Insofar as the motion [DI 78] seeks dismissal of Count 3 and to sever Counts 17 and 18, it is denied. Insofar as it seeks a bill of particulars, the motion is disposed of as set forth on the record in open court on December 20, 2017. Insofar as it seeks an order requiring the government to review information in the possession of the SEC, the motion remains under consideration. A written memorandum or opinion may follow with respect to points (1), (2) and (4). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017)(ft) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Defendant David Blaszczak moves ( 1) for discovery and other relief to address alleged violations of grand jury secrecy, (2) to dismiss Counts 17 and 18 or, in the alternative, for a bill of particulars and sever those counts pursuant to Rule 8(b), and (3) to strike paragraph 39 of the indictment. Insofar as the motion [DI 73] seeks dismissal of Counts 17 and 18 and to strike paragraph 39 of the indictment, it is denied. Insofar as it seeks a bill of particulars, the motion is disposed of as set forth on the record in open court on December 20, 2017. Insofar as it seeks discovery and other relief with respect to alleged violations of grand jury secrecy, the motion remains under consideration. A written memorandum or opinion may follow with respect to points (1) and (2). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017)(ft) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. The motion of defendant Christopher Worrall for a bill of particulars [DI 74] is denied for the reasons indicated in open Court December 20, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017)(ft) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Defendant David Blaszczak moves (1) for discovery and other relief to addressalleged violations of grand jury secrecy, (2) to dismiss Counts 17 and 18 or, in the alternative, for a bill of particulars and sever those counts pursuant to Rule 8(b), and (3) to strike paragraph 39 of the indictment. Insofar as the motion [DI 73] seeks dismissal of Counts 17 and 18 and to strike paragraph 39 of the indictment, it is denied. Insofar as it seeks a bill of particulars, the motion is disposed of as set forth on the record in open court on December 20, 2017. Insofar as it seeks discovery and other relief with respect to alleged violations of grand jury secrecy, the motion remains under consideration. A written memorandum or opinion may follow with respect to points (1) and (2). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017)(ft) Modified on 12/22/2017 (ft). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 103 Motion for Disclosure as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017) (ft) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury testimony . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (McGinley, Ian) Modified on 1/2/2018 (ka). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 100 LETTER MOTION as to Theodore Huber (2). On consent of the Government, application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/8/2017) (ft) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated December 7, 2017 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Theodore Huber re: 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment. /Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant Theodore Huber's Pretrial Motion to Dismiss the Indictment. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re 73 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery to Address Grand Jury Leaks, for Bill of Particulars and Severance, to Strike Surplusage, and Other Relief., 78 MOTION to Dismiss and for Production of Brady Materials, for a Bill of Particulars, and to Sever Certain Counts., 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment., 74 MOTION for Bill of Particulars .. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 11/13/17 re: Travel Request . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella appearing for USA. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Theodore Huber re 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment.. /Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Theodore Huber's Pretrail Motion to Dismiss the Indictment (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Dani R. James in Support as to Theodore Huber re: 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Indictment, # 2 Exhibit B- Letter from Marilyn Tavenner to Senator Charles E. Grassley, dated January 11, 2012, # 3 Exhibit C- Transcript of a January 29, 2015 conference in United States v. Conradt, # 4 Exhibit D- Transcript of a June 21, 2012 conference in United States v. Whitman, # 5 Exhibit E- Order in United States v. Cunniffe (Stewart), # 6 Exhibit F- Nolle Prosequi in United States v. Conradt, # 7 Exhibit G-Memorandum, dated September 7, 2010)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment. Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 62 LETTER MOTION as to Theodore Huber (2). ENDORSEMENT: Application granted on consent. (Signed by Part I Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/4/2017) (ft) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated August 2, 2017 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated July 25, 2017 re: Request for Modifications of Bail Conditions . Document filed by Robert Olan as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/12/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Conference held on 6/12/17 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 56 LETTER MOTION extension of time as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/10/2017) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from AUSAs Joshua A. Naftalis, Damian Williams, & Ian McGinley dated 7/7/17 re: Extension of Time to Produce Visium-related Discovery . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Visium-related Discovery. Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Naftalis, Joshua) Modified on 7/10/2017 (ka). (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. On the motion of the United States of America, by Joon H. Kim, Acting United States Attorney, through his counsel, Damian Williams, Ian McGinley and Joshua A. Naftalis, Assistant United States Attorneys ("the Government"), pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d), on consent of the defendant David Blaszczak, through his counsel, Sabrina P. Shroff, Esq. and David E. Patton, Esq., the defendant Theodore Huber, through his counsel, Barry Berke, Esq. and Dani R. James, Esq., the defendant Robert Olan, through his counsel, David C. Esseks, Esq. and Eugene E. Ingoglia, Esq., and the defendant Christopher Worrall, through his counsel, Stephen R. Fishbein, Esq. and John A. Nathanson, Esq., (the "defendants"), and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. With the exception of otherwise publicly available documents and information, all materials, including documents and the information contained therein, electronic data, and other audio or visual materials that are provided by the Government to the defendants in this action pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Title 18, United States Code, Section 3500; Brady v. Maryland; or United States v. Giglio, are considered "Confidential Information." 2.Confidential Information disclosed to the defendants or to their counsel in this case during the course of proceedings in this action: a.Shall be used by the defendants and their counsel only for purposes of defending this criminal action, except that the defendants may use Confidential Information in S.E.C. v. Blaszczak et al., provided that such use is consistent with the provisions of this Order as set forth below;...[See this Protective Order]... 7.The provisions of this Order shall not be construed as preventing the disclosure of any information in any motion, hearing or trial held in this action or to any district or magistrate judge of this Court for purposes of this action. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/27/2017)(bw) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 51 LETTER MOTION filed by Theodore Huber (2), addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Attorney Barry H. Berke dated 6/23/17 re: Travel. We write on behalf of Theodore Huber to respectfully request that Mr. Huber be permitted to travel with his family to East Dennis, Massachusetts from June 30, 2017 to July 8, 2017, and to Manchester, Vermont from July 13, 2017 to July 16, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/27/2017) (bw) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 23, 2017 re: Proposed Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Williams, A.) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 6/23/17 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated June 20, 2017 re: Defendant Christopher Worrall's Request of Modification of Bail Conditions . Document filed by Christopher Worrall as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. The Assignment Committee, having considered the submissions of the parties and pursuant to the authority delegated to it under Local Rule 2 for the Division of Business Among Judges, unanimously concludes that the Indictment docketed as (S-1) 17 CR 0308 does not supersede the information styled United States v. Jordan Fogel, 17-CR-308. THEREFORE, the Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Indictment as a new criminal action with a new docket number and randomly assign the case in accordance with Local Rule 6(b). SO ORDERED. (By Judge Colleen McMahon, Judge William H. Pauley, Judge Vincent L. Briccetti, Judge Valerie Caproni on 6/8/2017)(bw) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Barry H. Berke and David Esseks dated June 5, 2017 re: Responding to the Government's Letter dated June 2, 2017 (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 2, 2017 re: Exclusion of Time Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 2, 2017 re: Superseding Indictment Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nolan James Robinson appearing for Theodore Huber. Appearance Type: Retained. (Robinson, Nolan) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jonathan Bach dated 5/30/2017 re: on behalf of The New York Council of Defense Lawyers as amicus curiae to address issues concerning matters of judicial assignments which requires Judicial Review . Document filed by Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Bach, Jonathan) Modified on 9/25/2017 (ft). (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Barry H. Berke and David Esseks dated May 30, 2017 re: Requesting case be placed in the wheel for random reassignment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Transcript)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dani R. James appearing for Theodore Huber. Appearance Type: Retained. (James, Dani) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Initial Appearance as to Theodore Huber held on 5/24/2017. Defendant Theodore Huber present with Attorney Barry Burke, AUSA Joshua Naftalis present for the Government. Agreed conditions of release: $10M PRB; 2FRP; Secured by $2M cash/property: either; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/DCT; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Pretrial supervision; Regular; Def. to be released on own signature; remaining conditions to be met by 6-7-17. Conference before D.J. on 5-31-17 11am. Speedy trial time excluded under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7) until 5-31-17. (ft) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barry H Berke appearing for Theodore Huber. (ft) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise Cote from AUSA Damian Williams dated 05/25/2017 re: request for exclusion of time under the Speedy Trial Act. ENDORSEMENT: The Court finds that in the interests of justice to exclude time to 5/31/17 to allow the Government to pursue discovery and to allow defendants to travel to this district. These interests are in the interests of justice and outweigh the interests of the defendants and public in a speedy trial. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest for Judge Denise Cote on 5/25/2017)(hm). (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                S(1) INDICTMENT FILED as to David Blaszczak (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, Theodore Huber (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, Robert Olan (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, Christopher Worrall (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16. (Attachments: # 1 indi part 2, # 2 indi part3) (jm)(Filed under seal on 5/23/17) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2017: # 1 indictment, # 2 indictment, # 3 indictment, # 4 indictment) (jm). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Status Conference as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 12/20/2017. Motion argument before District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan held. Defendant David Blaszczak (01) present with attorney David Patton. Defendant Theodore Huber (02) present with attorneys Barry H. Berke, Dani R. James and Nolan James Robinson. Defendant Robert Olan (03) present with attorneys David C. Esseks, Tobias J. Fischer, and Eugene Edward Ingoglia. Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) present with attorneys Stephen Robert Fishbein and John A. Nathanson. AUSA A. Damian Williams present. Court reporter Steve Greenblum present. Argument on pending motions held. Decision Reserved. All defendants remained released on bail. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall: Notice to Attorney Joshua Arditi Naftalis to RE-FILE Document 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Visium-related Discovery. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Pretrial Conference as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 6/12/2017, as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall( Motions due by 10/27/2017., Replies due by 12/6/2017., Government Responses due by 11/17/2017, Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan., Oral Argument set for 12/20/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan., Status Conference set for 12/20/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) Defendant David Blaszczak (01) not present but attorney Sabrina P. Shroffpresent.Defendant Theodore Huber (02) present with attorneys Barry H. Berke and NolanJames Robinson.Defendant Robert Olan (03) present with attorneys David C. Esseks and EugeneEdward Ingoglia.Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) present with attorneys Stephen RobertFishbein and John A. Nathanson.AUSA A. Damian Williams present. Court reporter Andrew Walker present.The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate attorney Jonathan Paul Bach ascounsel to all four defendants in this case. Discovery regarding Deerfield shall be made by 6/23/17 and discovery regardingVisium shall be made by 7/7/17. Defendants motions due by 10/27/17;Government opposition due by 11/17/17; defendants reply brief due by 12/6/17;oral argument or a status conference to be held on 12/20/17 at 2:00pm. Trial isexpected to last 2-3 weeks. Trial scheduled to begin 4/9/18 at 9:30am. Time from today through 4/9/18 is excluded from speedy trial calculations in the interests of justice. All defendants remained released on bail (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Attorney Jonathan Paul Bach terminated. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall ASSIGNED to Judge Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Designated ECF as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Plea entered by David Blaszczak (2) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16,17,18 and Theodore Huber (3) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Robert Olan (4) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Christopher Worrall (5) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16 Not Guilty. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote:Arraignment as to David Blaszczak (2) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16,17,18 and Theodore Huber (3) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Robert Olan (4) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Christopher Worrall (5) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16 held on 5/31/2017. Defendant David Blaszczak present with counsel Sabrina Schroff, Esq. (Federal Defenders). Defendant Theodore Huber present with counsels Barry Berke, Esq. and Dani James, Esq. (Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP). Defendant Robert Olan present with counsels David C. Esseks, Esq., Tobias Jacob Fischer, Esq., and Eugene Edward Ingoglia, Esq. (Allen & Overy, LLP). Defendant Christopher Worrall present with counsel Xavier Donaldson, Esq. AUSAs A. Damian Williams, Ian Patrick McGinley, and Joshua Naftalis present. Pretrial Services Lisa Chan present. Court Reporter Vincent Bologna present. The Court temporarily assigns Ms. Schroff and Mr. Patton as counsel for Mr. Blaszczak. The Court alsotemporarily assigns Mr. Donaldson as counsel for Mr. Worrall. The Court request a letter from counsel for Blaszczak and Worrall. All defendants plea not guilty. Govt to submit by this Friday at noon, their response to Mr. Berke letter. Bail set for Mr. Blaszczak and Mr. Worrall. In the interest of justice, time is excluded from today to 6/14/17 pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(1)(a). (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Theodore Huber: Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?