LaBranche v. Nestor I, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-08399

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 10, 2020 at 11:18 AM DT (9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jamie LaBranche, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jamie P. Labranche

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamie LaBranche +1 504 559 9586
v.
No Logo Dean Morris, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by creditorlawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ashley E. Morris +1 318 388 1440 amorris@creditorlawyers.com
No Logo Nestor I LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley Arnold +1 504 566 5257 aarnold@bakerdonelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Katie L. Dysart +1 504 566 8611 kdysart@bakerdonelson.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None USCA Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None USCA Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None USCA Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None 1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Recusal
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Statement of Corporate Disclosure
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Statement of Corporate Disclosure
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                          REPLY Memorandum in Further Support of 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nestor I LLC. (sbs)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/12/18. (sbs)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Leave to File Document
                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nestor I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Ashley) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (sbs).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jamie LaBranche re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(sbs) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jamie LaBranche re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order)(sbs)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Order
                                                                      PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Order
                                                                        NOTICE: Because R. Doc. 18 contains more than 50 pages, counsel shall deliver to chambers within 3 working days one hard copy of the submission in a binder as set forth in notice. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is'Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.' Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. Also, attachments have duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. **Exhibits A and H were imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the images.** (sbs) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Dismiss Case
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nestor I LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Submission)(Arnold, Ashley) Modified text on 11/5/2018 (sbs).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dean Morris, L.L.C. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Notice of Submission, # 12 Proposed Order)(Morris, Ashley) (Attachments 2, 9 replaced on 11/5/2018) (sbs). Modified text on 11/5/2018 (sbs).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint as to Nestor I LLC answer due 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/16/18. (sbs)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint as to Dean Morris, L.L.C. answer due 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/11/18. (sbs) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **Motion should have been linked to the Complaint by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking the motion to the Complaint.**(sbs) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint by Nestor I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Attorney Ashley Arnold added to party Nestor I LLC(pty:dft).(Arnold, Ashley) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (sbs).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.' Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (sbs) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint by Dean Morris, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Attorney Ashley E. Morris added to party Dean Morris, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Morris, Ashley) Modified event on 10/10/2018 (sbs).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed; Dean Morris, L.L.C. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018; Nestor I LLC served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Original Deficient Return on Nestor I LLC, # 2 Original Deficient Return on Dean Morris, LLC)(jls)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Dean Morris, L.L.C., Nestor I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Mailed to Plaintiff w/ cc Pauper order & Pauper Letter)(jls)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Request for Summons Issued
                                                                                                    Request to Re-Issue Summons as to Dean Morris, L.L.C., Nestor I LLC filed by Jamie LaBranche re 1 Complaint. (jls)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re 7 Summons Returned. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 10/17/2018. (jls)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                        **DEFICIENT** Summons Returned as to Dean Morris, L.L.C., Nestor I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(jls)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 RICO Case Statement
                                                                                                          RICO Case Statement by Jamie LaBranche (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(jls)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Dean Morris, L.L.C. and Nestor I LLC. (sent to Plaintiff via USPS w/ cc Pauper order & Pauper Letter) (mp) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER: ORDERED that the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on September 10, 2018. (Attachments: # 1 Pauper Letter) (mp)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Rico Standing Order
                                                                                                                Rico Standing Order. Signed by Clerk. (bwn)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie LaBranche. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jeg) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT with jury demand against Dean Morris, L.L.C., Nestor I LLC filed by Jamie LaBranche. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(jeg) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?