Left v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-05463-VC
District Judge Vince Chhabria, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 27, 2018 at 4:27 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew E. Left, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Matthew Wagstaffe +1 415 371 8500 +1 415 371 0500 wagstaffe@kerrwagstaffe.com
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon R. Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 9/6/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Los Angeles
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,RELATE
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Counsel
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Decision
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are further related: 18-cv-4865-EMC, 18-cv-4912-CRB, 18-cv-4939-EMC, 18-cv-4948-HSG, 18-cv-5258-LHK, and 18-cv-5470-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of CasesCourt Filing
                                                  Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 18-cv-04865-EMC. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/12/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Andrew E. Left. Service waived by Elon R. Musk waiver sent on 9/7/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Andrew E. Left. Service waived by Tesla, Inc. waiver sent on 9/7/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                        REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on September 7, 2018. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Order of recusalCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/7/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Summons issued
                                                              Summons Issued as to Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Summons)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                  Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                                    Proposed Summons. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                                      Proposed Summons. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Complaint
                                                                        CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS (with jury demand) against Elon R. Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-12655235). Filed by Andrew E. Left. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/6/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 197 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?