Wei v. San Jose Sharks
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-05483

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2018 at 11:08 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Susan Wei, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Susan Wei

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Wei
v.
No Logo Logan Couture, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Michelle Protas +1 408 287 9501 +1 408 287 2583 jmp@hogefenton.com
No Logo San Jose Sharks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Michelle Protas +1 408 287 9501 +1 408 287 2583 jmp@hogefenton.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Remark
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/24/2018, Entered: None Order Remanding Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Auto docketing digital audio upload
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi denying as moot 45 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Remand
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Remand
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/29/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Permission for Electronic Case Filing
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                    Civil Cover Sheet by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks . (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks identifying Corporate Parent Sharks Minor Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent San Jose Arena Management LLC, Other Affiliate San Jose Sharks, Other Affiliate Sharks Ice, Other Affiliate San Jose Sports & Entertainment LLC, Other Affiliate SJS Enterprises Company, Other Affiliate National Hockey League Enterprises Canada, Inc., Other Affiliate NHL Enterprises Canada, L.P., Other Affiliate NHL Enterprises Inc., Other Affiliate NHL Enterprises LP, Other Affiliate National Hockey League for Logan Couture, San Jose Sharks. re 1 Notice of Removal (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jennifer M. Protas in Support of 1 Notice of Removal filed byLogan Couture, San Jose Sharks. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018 notice of removal
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CV328985. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12659785). Filed bySan Jose Sharks, Logan Couture. (Protas, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?