Toromanova v. First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01482

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2020 at 6:24 PM DT (8.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/4/2020, Entered: None Minute Order Klingele
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Minute Order Klingele
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissal Rule 4m
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Minute Order Klingele
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Minute Order Klingele
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Minute Order Klingele
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                              ORDER denying 35 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER denying 27 Motion; Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Minute Order Klingele
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Minute Order Klingele
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?