G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Bozin
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-05533

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 25, 2019 at 6:36 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Abstract Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Association of Counsel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/10/2018. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?