United States v. Collins
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00567-VSB-1

Tags
Last Updated March 29, 2021 at 9:39 AM DT (5.8 months ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Wood Allen +1 212 637 2216 robert.allen@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Andrew Hartman +1 212 637 2357 +1 212 637 2527 scott.hartman@usdoj.gov
Space Max Clement Nicholas +1 212 637 1565 max.nicholas@usdoj.gov
Space A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Christopher Collins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan R. Barr +1 202 861 1534 +1 202 861 1783 jbarr@bakerlaw.com
Space Jonathan Adam Forman +1 212 847 2855 jforman@bakerlaw.com
Space Jonathan B. New +1 212 589 4650 +1 212 589 4201 jnew@bakerlaw.com
Space Kendall Eugene Wangsgard +1 202 861 1751 kwangsgard@bakerlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Christopher Collins (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/7/2018
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F WIRE FRAUD
Count 11
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
181001.F FALSE STATEMENTS
Count 2-8
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
1578J.F SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 9
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (153) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Letter - Sentencing
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Remark
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None extension of time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Judgment
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Letter - Sentencing
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Indictment
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 104 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 103 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 99 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 97 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 91 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 88 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 87 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 85 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 84 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 81 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 79 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 78 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Brady Materials
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 63 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Bill of Particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 56 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Christopher Collins. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/11/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Christopher Collins re: Conference held on 10/11/18 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita Trombetta, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky. For the reasons stated on the record at the October 11, 2018 status conference, it is hereby: ORDERED that jury selection in this matter is scheduled to begin on February 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., with jury trial to begin thereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a final pretrial conference in this matter will be held on January 23, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pretrial motions are due on or before May 10, 2019, with the governments response due on or before July 19, 2019, and defendants' replies, if any, due on or before August 23, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any in limine motions be filed on or before January 6, 2020, with responses due on or before January 13, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any proposed voir dire questions, jury instructions, verdict forms or trial memoranda shall be filed on or before January 23, 2020. Two courtesy copies should be delivered to Chambers that same day. In addition, each party shall email those documents as Word documents to BroderickNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a conference regarding the status of discovery will be held on December 18, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. One week prior to the conference, the parties shall file a joint letter outlining any outstanding discovery disputes between the parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/17/2018)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [26] Motion for Jonathan R. Barr to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Collins (1). (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/11/2018) (Broderick, Vernon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Status Conference as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky held on 10/11/2018. AUSA Scott Hartman, Max Nicholas, and Damian Williams present for the government. Defendants appearance waived by cousel. Attorney Jonathan Barr, Jonathan New, and Kendall Wangsgard present for Christopher Collins. Attorney Thomas Hanusik, Rebecca Ricigliano, and Patrick Brown present for Cameron Collins. Attorney Amanda Bassen, and Mauro Wolfe present for Stephen Zarsky. Court Reporter present. Next Status conference scheduled for 12/18/2018 at 2:30 p.m. Jury trial scheduled for February 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Speedy trial time is excluded in the interest of justice between October 11, 2018 and December 18, 2018. (Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 10:00 AM, Status Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky.. The status conference in this matter will be held in Courtroom 110, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/11/2018)(msa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER COLLINS' WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FOR OCTOBER 11, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE as to Christopher Collins. Pursuant to Rule 43 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Defendant Christopher Collins waives his right to be present in open court for the October 11, 2018 Status Conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/5/18) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memo Endorsement granting [36] LETTER MOTION as to Christopher Collins (1), Cameron Collins (2), Stephen Zarsky (3)...ENDORSEMENT: Counsel is directed to email a completed electronic order form to my chambers inbox for approval to bring in their electronics for the October 11 status conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/5/18) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018, Terminated: 10/5/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Jonathan R. Barr dated October 4, 2018 re: Defendants' Request to be Excused from Appearing at the Status Conference . Document filed by Christopher Collins as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky. (Attachments: # (1) Chris Collins - Waiver of Appearance, # (2) Cameron Collins - Waiver of Appearance, # (3) Stephen Zarsky - Waiver of Appearance)(Barr, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo endorsement granting [27] Motion for Extension of Time as to Christopher Collins (1), Cameron Collins (2), Stephen Zarsky (3)...Endorsement: Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/1/18) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Christopher Collins. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/8/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Christopher Collins re: Conference held on 8/8/18 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/23/2018) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [28] MOTION for Patrick Scribner Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15486067. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018, Terminated: 10/1/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Seek Bill of Particulars. Document filed by Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky. (New, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018, Terminated: 10/11/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Jonathan R. Barr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15459326. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Christopher Collins. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Jonathan R. Barr, # (2) Exhibit 1-Virginia Good Standing Certificate, # (3) Exhibit 2-District of Columbia Good Standing Certificate, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [26] MOTION for Jonathan R. Barr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15459326. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan Brian New appearing for Christopher Collins. Appearance Type: Retained. (New, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSAs Scott Hartman, Max Nicholas, Damian Williams dated 8/10/2018 re: response to the Court's August 8 order Document filed by USA. (Hartman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appearance Bond Entered as to (18-Cr-567-01) Christopher Collins in amount of $500,000.00. $500,000.00 PRB; co-signed by 2 FRP's; travel limits include the Continental U.S.; travel documents are to be surrendered to Pretrial Services, except as set forth below; Defendant is to surrender his Diplomatic Passport to defense counsel for safekeeping until further notice; surrender of any firearms to local law enforcement for safekeeping; Defendant is to be released upon own signature; Defendant has 14 days to meet the conditions specified subject to extension upon application to the court. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 8/8/2018 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vernon S. Broderick: Arraignment as to Christopher Collins (1) Count 1, 2-8, 9, 10, 11. Defendant Christopher Collins present with Attorney Jonathan Barr, AUSA Max Nicholas present for the Government. Defendant enters a plea of not guilty. $500,000.00 PRB; CO-SIGNED BY 2 FRPS; TRAVEL LIMITS INCLUDE THE CONTINENTAL U.S.; TRAVEL DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE SURRENDERED TO PRETRIAL SERVICES; EXCEPT AS SET FORTH BELOW; DEFENDANT IS TO SURRENDER HIS DIPLOMATIC PASSPORT TO DEFENSE COUNSEL FOR SAFEKEEPING UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE; SURRENDER OF ANY FIREARMS TO LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMENT FOR SAFEKEEPING; DEFENDANT IS TO BE RELEASED UPON OWN SIGNATURE; DEFENDANT HAS 14 DAYS TO MEET THE CONDITIONS SPECIFIED SUBJECT TO EXTENSION UPON APPLICATION TO THE COURT. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kendall Eugene Wangsgard appearing for Christopher Collins. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan R. Barr appearing for Christopher Collins. [*** Oral motion for Pro Hac Vice appearance to be made at initial appearance. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan Adam Forman appearing for Christopher Collins. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3. Upon the application of the United States, by the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Geoffrey S. Berman, by Assistant United States Attorney Max Nicholas; It is found that the Indictment in the above-captioned case is currently sealed and that the United States Attorney's Office has applied to have the Indictment unsealed, and it is therefore: ORDERED that the Indictment in the above-captioned case be unsealed and remain unsealed pending further order of the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 8/8/2018)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky: Status Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (msa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearings as to Christopher Collins: The Arraignment in this matter has been scheduled for 8/8/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 318, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (msa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Designated ECF as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case as to Christopher Collins, Cameron Collins, Stephen Zarsky ASSIGNED to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?