G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Margarita Ascencio Reyes
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-01607

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 17, 2019 at 12:55 AM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Costs
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Default Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff to show cause in writing no later December 26, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As a n alternative to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this OSC on or before the above date: Plaintiff filing a Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)) as to Margarita Ascencio Reyes, individually and on d/b/a Mariscos Puerto Marquez, Guadalupe Salasbarron, individually and on d/b/a Mariscos Puerto Marquez. It is plaintiff's responsibility to respond promptly to all Orders and to prosecute the action diligently, including filing proofs of service and stipulations extending time to respond. (shb)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?