Romans v. Whitmire
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-03207

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 5:32 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Derek Romans, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek Romans
v.
No Logo Brian Collier, Respondent
No Logo Dale Wainwright, Respondent
No Logo J Vela, Respondent
No Logo John Waitmire, Respondent
No Logo Judge Ryan Patrick, Respondent
No Logo Ken Paxton, Respondent
No Logo Lee H Rosenthal, Respondent
No Logo S J Lee, Respondent
No Logo Silvia Garcia, Respondent
No Logo Ted Cruz, Respondent
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
            NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (nortiz, 5)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
              Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Brian Collier, Ted Cruz, Silvia Garcia, S J Lee, Ryan Patrick, Ken Paxton, Lee H Rosenthal, J Vela, Dale Wainwright, John Waitmire (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Derek Romans.(nortiz, 5)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?