G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Fombona-Rios
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-07863

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 11, 2020 at 9:23 PM DT (11.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Costs
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff to show cause in writing no laterDecember 17, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alterna tive to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this OSC on or before the above date: Plaintiff filing a Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)) as to Eri c Fombona-Rios individually doing business as Pizza Mia and Yojana Karolina Fombona doing business as Pizza Mia. It is plaintiff's responsibility to respond promptly to all Orders and to prosecute the action diligently, including filing proofs of service and stipulations extending time to respond. See order for further details. (shb)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?