G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Andrea Gordon
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-07865

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2020 at 3:27 PM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Costs
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff to show cause in writing no laterDecember 26, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alter native to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this OSC on or before the above date: Plaintiff filing a Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)) as to A ndrea Gordon individually and doing business as El Tenampa. It is plaintiff's responsibility to respond promptly to all Orders and to prosecute the action diligently, including filing proofs of service and stipulations extending time to respond. See order for further details. (shb)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?