G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Egbert Brainard Sanchez
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-07891

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 1, 2021 at 6:38 PM DT (1.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None For Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Writ of Execution - Issued
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Costs
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Clerk to Enter Default
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than December 17, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to de fendant. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff, the Court will consider filing of one of the following as an appropriate response to this OSC on or before the above date: Answer to Complaint or Plaintiffs Application for Default (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a)).It is plaintiff's responsibility to respond promptly to all Orders and to prosecute the action diligently, including filing proofs of service and stipulations extending time to respond. See order for further details. (shb)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?