Armando Fernandez v. Schenker, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-01931

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 1:13 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Jobs
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE (In Chambers) ORDER CONSOLIDATING ALL CASES by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On 11/1/2018, the court CONSOLIDATED the first three above-referenced case for all purposes 22 . (18-1551 Doc. 30). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). The Clerk is directed to administratively close all but the lowest case number referenced above. The parties are directed to make all their filings on the docket of the lead case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Response
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?