United States v. Chow
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cr-00667

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 27, 2021 at 1:09 PM DT (4.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Andrew Hartman +1 212 637 2357 +1 212 637 2527 scott.hartman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elisha Jonathan Kobre +1 212 637 2599 +1 212 637 2937 elisha.kobre@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Kay Kramer +1 212 637 2478 +1 212 637 2527 amanda.kramer@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Clement Nicholas +1 212 637 1565 max.nicholas@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Benjamin Chow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kane+Kimball LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miranda Kane +1 510 704 1400 mkane@kanekimball.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY George S. Canellos +1 212 530 5174 +1 212 822 5174 gcanellos@milbank.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Adam Joshua Fee +1 212 530 5101 +1 212 822 5101 afee@milbank.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Katherine R. Goldstein +1 212 530 5138 +1 212 822 5138 kgoldstein@milbank.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (191) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/2/2019, Entered: None Amended Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support (non-motion)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Reply (non-motion)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition (non-motion)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support (non-motion)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Amended Judgment
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Letter - Sentencing
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Sentencing Submission
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Acquittal
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER. The Court directs the parties and Dr. Chow to appear for a conference at 8:50 a.m. on April 23, 2018. The Court wishes to discuss the possible presentation of supplemental instructions to the jury before they begin their deliberations that morning at 9:00 a.m. The Court does not require that all counsel for each of the parties appear for this conference. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on April 21, 2018)(Woods, Gregory) (Entered: 04/21/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated April 18, 2018 re: the Court's draft jury charge (Fee, Adam) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Adam Fee dated 04/18/2018 re: matters raised during today's proceedings (Fee, Adam) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSA Scott Hartman dated 4/16/2018 re: Letter in Further Support of Motion to Preclude Document filed by USA. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from George S. Canellos dated April 14, 2018 re: 103 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Scott Hartman, and Max Nicholas dated 4/13/2018 re: Motion to Preclude .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Canellos, George) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Roman E. Darmer dated 4/13/2018 re: I write to advise the court that Mr. Hibbard has not been authorized to give any testimony that would constitute a waiver of Canyon Bridges attorney-client privilege and is prohibited from doing so under the applicable ethical rules. (ft) Modified on 4/16/2018 (ft). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSA Scott Hartman dated 4/15/2018 re: 104 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated 4/15/2018 .. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSA Scott Hartman dated 4/15/2018 re: Reply in Support of Motion to Preclude Yin Declaration Document filed by USA. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated 4/15/2018 . Document filed by Benjamin Chow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 04/15/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Scott Hartman, and Max Nicholas dated 4/13/2018 re: Motion to Preclude . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine To Admit the Yin Declaration. Document filed by Benjamin Chow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fee, Adam) Modified on 4/16/2018 (ka). (Entered: 04/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elisha J. Kobre/Scott Hartman/Max Nicholas dated April 9, 2018 re: Motion to Preclude Certain Defense Exhibits Document filed by USA. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Benjamin Chow: The Court has received and reviewed the Government's motion in limine dated April 7, 2018, Dkt. No. 97, and Mr. Chow's letter, also dated April 7, 2018, Dkt. No. 98. The Court declines to order the Government to file a reply by 11:00 p.m. on April 8, 2018, although the Government may submit a reply. If time permits, the Court will hear argument on the motion in limine prior to the empanelment of the jury on April 9, 2018. However, the parties should not expect a ruling on the motion prior to the empanelment of the jury. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/7/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated April 8, 2018 re: 97 MOTION in Limine to preclude the defendant from offering inadmissible hearsay and unnoticed expert testimony.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit I)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 04/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated April 7, 2018 re: 97 MOTION in Limine to preclude the defendant from offering inadmissible hearsay and unnoticed expert testimony.. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 04/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine to preclude the defendant from offering inadmissible hearsay and unnoticed expert testimony. Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Hartman, Scott) Modified on 4/9/2018 (ka). (Entered: 04/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated April 2, 2018 re: Mr. Chow's April 1, 2018 Letter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated April 1, 2018 re: 92 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elisha Kobre/Scott Hartman/Max Nicholas dated March 23, 2018 re: Admissibility of Email .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 04/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Benjamin Chow. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/16/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Benjamin Chow re: Conference held on 3/16/18 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elisha Kobre/Scott Hartman/Max Nicholas dated March 23, 2018 re: Admissibility of Email . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elisha Kobre/Scott Hartman/Max Nicholas dated March 20, 2018 re: Withdrawal of March 19 Application Document filed by USA. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elisha Kobre/Scott Hartman/Max Nicholas dated March 20, 2018 re: March 19, 2018 Application relating to Hong John Kao Document filed by USA. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elisha Kobre/Scott Hartman/Max Nicholas dated March 19, 2018 re: Issuance of Subpoena and Authorization to Serve Process via Email and Service on Counsel . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application for Issuance of Subpoena and Alternative Service, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Subpoena)(Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Benjamin Chow. The parties are directed to promptly submit Word versions of their proposed charges by email to the Court's Chambers email account (WoodsNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/19/2018)(bw) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein, dated 3/9/2018, re: Counsel writes to request that the Court excuse Mr. Chow from being present on March 16 for the reason set forth in this letter.ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Mr. Chow is excused from appearing at the final pretrial conference scheduled for March 16, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/12/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Benjamin Chow re: 72 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Max Nicholas dated March 2, 2018 re: Admissibility of Evidence of Certain Communications and Trades . . (Nicholas, Max) Modified on 3/12/2018 (ka). (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated March 9, 2018 re: 72 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Max Nicholas dated March 2, 2018 re: Admissibility of Evidence of Certain Communications and Trades .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Benjamin Chow. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/9/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Benjamin Chow re: Conference held on 2/9/18 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Scott Hartman, Max Nicholas dated 3/9/2018 re: Response to defendant's supplemental request to charge Document filed by USA. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Elisha Kobre dated March 7, 2018 re: Response to Defendant's Letter Dated March 4, 2018 . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Kobre, Elisha) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Scott Hartman, Max Nicholas dated 3/5/2018 re: Goverment's proposed jury instructions Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from George S. Canellos dated 3/5/2018 re: proposed Joint Requests To Charge (Canellos, George) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from George S. Canellos dated 3/5/2018 re: proposed Joint Requests To Charge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Canellos, George) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Request To Charge by Benjamin Chow. (Canellos, George) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Benjamin Chow on 73 LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Adam Fee dated March 2, 2018 re: briefing schedule for the government's supplemental motion in limine. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendant's opposition may be filed no later than March 9, 2018. The Government's reply, if any, is due no later than March 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/2/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated March 4, 2018 re 62 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated 02/23/2018 .. (Fee, Adam) (Entered: 03/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Scott Hartman, and Max Nicholas dated 3/2/2018 re: 62 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated 02/23/2018 .. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Adam Fee dated March 2, 2018 re: briefing schedule for the government's supplemental motion in limine 72 (Fee, Adam) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Max Nicholas dated March 2, 2018 re: Admissibility of Evidence of Certain Communications and Trades . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bill of Particulars)(Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Max Nicholas dated March 1, 2018 re: Proposed Language for Preliminary Remarks to Jury Document filed by USA. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Benjamin Chow. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/9/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Benjamin Chow re: Conference held on 2/9/18 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/22/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Max Nicholas dated February 28, 2018 re: Brief Overview of Case and Applicable Law Document filed by USA. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Benjamin Chow: The Court has not received (1) a proposed brief description of the case, to be read to the venire; (2) a brief, mutually acceptable overview of the applicable law, to be read to the jury as part of the Courts initial instructions prior to opening statements; or (3) notification that the parties are unable to agree on the language of such a short overview. These materials were due on February 16, 2018, in accordance with the Court's order dated November 8, 2017, Dkt. No. 9. See also Dkt. No. 45 ("Except as expressly modified by this order, the Court's November 8, 2017 order, Dkt. No. 9, remains in effect."). The parties are directed to submit the materials described above forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/27/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Benjamin Chow (1) on 62 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated 02/23/2018. ENDORSEMENT: The Government is directed to submit its opposition to Mr.Chow's letter motion, Dkt. No. 62, no later than March 2, 2018.Mr. Chow's reply, if any, is due no later than March 4, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/27/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Benjamin Chow re: 55 FIRST MOTION in Limine . . (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Benjamin Chow re: 49 MOTION in Limine . . (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated 02/23/2018 re: Government's Proposed Voir Dire (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated 02/23/2018 . Document filed by Benjamin Chow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Katherine R. Goldstein in Support as to Benjamin Chow re: 60 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Benjamin Chow re 55 FIRST MOTION in Limine .. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BILL OF PARTICULARS by USA as to Benjamin Chow . (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Benjamin Chow re 49 MOTION in Limine .. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Scott Hartman, Max Nicholas dated 2/22/2018 re: Elements of Section 1348 Document filed by USA. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Max Clement Nicholas appearing for USA. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Benjamin Chow. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated February 16, 2018 re: Permission to File Under Seal . Document filed by Benjamin Chow. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Katherine R. Goldstein in Support as to Benjamin Chow re: 49 MOTION in Limine .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Benjamin Chow re 49 MOTION in Limine .. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Benjamin Chow re 49 MOTION in Limine .. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine . Document filed by Benjamin Chow. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre / Scott Hartman, dated February 14, 2018 re: The Government writes on behalf of both parties to respectfully request a one-week extension of the deadlines for requests to charge in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Government's time to submit its proposed charge to Mr. Chow is extended to February 22, 2018. Mr. Chow's time to respond is extended to February 28, 2018. The parties' time to submit the complete set of proposed requests to charge, and their letter briefs, is extended to March 5, 2018. Except as expressly modified herein, the Court's February 12, 2018 order, Dkt. No. 45, remains in effect. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 46. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/14/2018)(bw) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSA Scott Hartman dated February 14, 2018 re: Joint motion to adjust deadlines for request to charge . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Benjamin Chow. For the reasons set forth on the record at the conference held on February 9, 2018, Defendant's motion to quash, Dkt. No. 28, is denied. Defendant's motion for a bill of particulars, Dkt. No. 32, is granted in part and denied in part. The Government is directed to submit a bill of particulars with respect to: (i) the identity of known co-conspirators; and (ii) the trades it contends are unlawful. The Government shall file its bill of particulars no later than February 23, 2018. The parties are reminded that the proposed verdict forms, proposed voir dire questions, and any motions in limine, are due no later than February 16, 2018. If any motions in limine are filed, opposition papers are due no later than seven days after the date of service of the motion. Reply papers, if any, are due no later than four days after the date of service of the opposition. Courtesy copies of motions in limine should be submitted when the motions are fully briefed. The Court understands that the Government will provide its proposed requests to charge to Mr. Chow no later than February 15, 2018, and Mr. Chow will provide his proposed modifications to the requests to charge to the Government no later than February 21, 2018. The parties must submit the complete set of proposed requests to charge, together with letter briefs setting forth their views on any disagreements, no later than February 26, 2018. Further, as discussed at the February 9, 2018 conference, the Government will produce its exhibits and witness list to Mr. Chow no later than March 12, 2018. The Government will produce its draft summary charts to Mr. Chow no later than March 19, 2018. Mr. Chow will produce his Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16 and 26.2 materials to the Government no later than March 26, 2018, and will produce his witness list and any objections to the Government's draft translations no later than April 2, 2018. Except as expressly modified by this order, the Court's November 8, 2017 order, Dkt. No. 9, remains in effect. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions pending at Dkt. Nos. 28 and 32. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/12/2018)(bw) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSA Amanda Kramer dated February 2, 2018 Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kramer, Amanda) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Benjamin Chow. The Government is directed to submit, no later than February 2, 2018, affidavits attesting to the facts underlying the ex parte letters dated November 27, 2017 and December 29, 2017. The Government may file any such affidavits ex parte and under seal in the first instance, together with a cover letter setting forth the justification for submitting the materials under seal. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 1/29/18)(jw) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Katherine R. Goldstein in Support as to Benjamin Chow re: 32 MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Production of Exculpatory and Impeachment Material.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Benjamin Chow re: 32 MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Production of Exculpatory and Impeachment Material. . (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Miranda Kane appearing for Benjamin Chow. Appearance Type: Retained. (Kane, Miranda) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Benjamin Chow re 32 MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Production of Exculpatory and Impeachment Material.. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Scott Andrew Hartman appearing for USA. (Hartman, Scott) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Benjamin Chow re: 28 MOTION to Quash and Preclude Use of Evidence Obtained Through Improper Use of Grand Jury Subpoena. . (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 01/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Benjamin Chow re 28 MOTION to Quash and Preclude Use of Evidence Obtained Through Improper Use of Grand Jury Subpoena.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kramer, Amanda) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Benjamin Chow ( Replies due by 1/19/2018., Government Responses due by 1/12/2018) The Court has received Mr. Chows motion for a bill of particulars. Dkt. No. 32. The Governments opposition is due no later than January 12, 2018. Mr. Chows reply, if any, is due no later than January 19, 2018. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/29/17)(jw) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Katherine R. Goldstein in Support as to Benjamin Chow re: 32 MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Production of Exculpatory and Impeachment Material.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Benjamin Chow re 32 MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Production of Exculpatory and Impeachment Material.. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Bill of Particulars and Production of Exculpatory and Impeachment Material. Document filed by Benjamin Chow. Return Date set for 2/9/2018 at 11:00 AM. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Benjamin Chow (Deft Replies due by 1/2/2018., Government Responses due by 12/29/2017) The Court has received Mr. Chows motion to quash. Dkt. No. 28. The Governments opposition is due no later than December 29, 2017. Mr. Chows reply, if any, is due no later than January 2, 2018. The Court declines to adjourn the return date of the subpoena issued to Partner - 1 pending the resolution of Mr. Chows motion because the Court only received Mr. Chows motion on December 19, 2017, and because, in the event that the Court finds a violation after full consideration of the motion, alternative means are available to cure it. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/20/17)(jw) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Roman E. Darmer in Support as to Benjamin Chow re: 28 MOTION to Quash and Preclude Use of Evidence Obtained Through Improper Use of Grand Jury Subpoena.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by Benjamin Chow re 28 MOTION to Quash and Preclude Use of Evidence Obtained Through Improper Use of Grand Jury Subpoena.. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash and Preclude Use of Evidence Obtained Through Improper Use of Grand Jury Subpoena. Document filed by Benjamin Chow. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Benjamin Chow (1)granting 26 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated December 7, 2017 re: Motion to Modify Bail Conditions, On Consent. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Mr. Chow's conditions of pre-trial release are amended to permit Mr. Chow to travel to any judicial district located within the continental United States. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the letter motion pending at Dkt. No. 25. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/11/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated December 7, 2017 re: Motion to Modify Bail Conditions, On Consent . Document filed by Benjamin Chow. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Bond Modification, On Consent of the Government and Pretrial Services. Document filed by Benjamin Chow. (Goldstein, Katherine) Modified on 12/8/2017 (ka). (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Benjamin Chow. On the motion of the United States of America, by Joon H. Kim, Acting United States Attorney, through his counsel, Elisha J. Kobre and Amanda Kramer, Assistant United States Attorneys (the "Government"), pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d), for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. With the exception of otherwise publicly available documents and information, all materials, including documents and the information contained therein, that are provided by the Government to the defendant in this action pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure; Title 18, United States Code, Section 3500; Brady v. Maryland; or Giglio v. United States, are considered "Confidential Information." 2. Confidential Information disclosed to the defendant or to his counsel in this case during the course of proceedings in this action: (a) Shall be used by the defendant and his counsel only for purposes of defending this criminal action;...[See this Protective Order]... 7. The terms of this Order shall not apply to documents, data, or information received by the defendants from a source other than Confidential Information. To the extent that the Government's discovery contains documents that are also publicly available (without fault of the defendants), nothing in this Order shall restrict the use of such publicly available documents. 8. Nothing in this Protective Order shall preclude defense counsel from entering into an agreement with the Government, and/or seeking an order from this Court, excluding certain specified discovery materials from the scope of this Protective Order. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/7/2017)(bw) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Benjamin Chow on 17 LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated November 27, 2017 re: opposing the ex parte nature of the government's submission dated November 27, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. The ex parte communication presented to the Court contains information regarding ongoing criminal investigation. Because disclosure of that information would reasonably be expected to have an adverse effect on ongoing criminal investigation, the Court finds that the presumption of public access to judicial records is overcome, and that the Government's submission may be filed under seal. For the avoidance of doubt, this determination does not relieve the United States of any obligation it might otherwise have to disclose any of the underlying information to defendant under Rule 16, Brady, Giglio, or otherwise. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/30/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Benjamin Chow. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/8/17 CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Benjamin Chow re: Conference held on 11/8/17 CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Benjamin Chow. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/8/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Benjamin Chow re: Conference held on 11/8/17 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated November 27, 2017 re: opposing the ex parte nature of the government's submission dated November 27, 2017 (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre/Amanda Kramer, dated November 17, 2017 re: The Government respectfully writes in very brief response to the defendant's November 16, 2017 letter in support of defendant's proposed protective order. ENDORSEMENT: If the Government wishes to present additional factual information that would inform the Court's evaluation of its proposed protective order, it may do so no later than November 27, 2017. The Government may file any such information ex parte and under seal in the first instance, together with a cover letter setting forth the justification for submitting the materials under seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket No. 15. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/20/2017)(bw) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre and Amanda Kramer dated November 17, 2017 re: Response to Defendant's November 16, 2017 Letter re: Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Kobre, Elisha) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated November 16, 2017 re: Reply in Support of Mr. Chow's Proposed Protective Order (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Benjamin Chow. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/8/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Benjamin Chow re: Conference held on 11/8/17 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre and Amanda Kramer dated November 13, 2017 re: Entry of Government's Proposed Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Kobre, Elisha) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Benjamin Chow addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Katherine R. Goldstein dated November 11, 2017 re: Proposed Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 11/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Benjamin Chow. As stated on the record during the initial conference held on November 8, 2017, trial in this matter will commence on April 9, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. The trial will take place in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007.The deadline for the Government to complete its production is November 17, 2017.Pretrial motions by Defendant are due no later than December 22, 2017. The Governments oppositions to any defense motions are due no later than January 12, 2018. Defendants replies, if any, are due no later than January 19, 2018. The Court will hold a hearing on any defense motions necessitating a hearing on February 9, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. The pretrial materials required by Rule 6 of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Criminal Cases, including motions in limine, are due no later than February 16, 2018. If any motions in limine are filed, opposition papers are due no later than seven days after the date of service of the motion. Reply papers, if any, are due no later than four days after the date of service of the opposition. Courtesy copies of motions in limine should be submitted when the motions are fully briefed. The Court will hold a final pretrial conference in this matter on March 16, 2018 at 2:00 p.m.The parties are further directed to submit (1) a proposed brief description of the case, to be read to the venire and (2) a brief, mutually acceptable overview of the applicable law, to be read to the jury as part of the Courts initial instructions prior to opening statements, no later than February 16, 2018. If the parties are unable to agree on the language of such a short overview, they are directed to notify the Court of that fact by the same date. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/22/2017, Replies due by 1/19/2018, Responses due by 1/12/2018, Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods, Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods, Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/8/2017)(ft) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Amanda Kay Kramer appearing for USA. (Kramer, Amanda) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Adam Fee appearing for Benjamin Chow. Appearance Type: Retained. (Fee, Adam) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Katherine Rachel Goldstein appearing for Benjamin Chow. Appearance Type: Retained. (Goldstein, Katherine) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: George S. Canellos appearing for Benjamin Chow. Appearance Type: Retained. (Canellos, George) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Benjamin Chow ( Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) Time excluded from 11/1/17 until 11/8/17. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the time from the date of this order through November 8, 2017 is hereby excluded under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A). (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/1/2017)(jw) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from AUSAs Elisha Kobre and Amanda Kramer dated November 1, 2017 re: Exclusion of Time Under the Speedy Trial Act . Document filed by USA as to Benjamin Chow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kobre, Elisha) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT FILED as to Benjamin Chow (1) count(s) 1, 2-13, 14. (jm) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to Benjamin Chow (1). In Violation of 15 U.S.C. 78j (b) & 78ff; 17 C.F.R. 240.10b-5; 18 U.S.C. 1348, 371 & 2 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox) (dif) [1:17-mj-06668-UA] (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Jury Trial as to Benjamin Chow held on 4/19/2018. Defendant Benjamin Chow present with retained counsel Katherine Goldstein, George Canellos and Adam Fee, Esqs. AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Max Nicholas, and Scott Hartman present. Court Reporters Alena Lynch and Mike McDaniel present. Jury trial continued. Evidence entered. The defense rests. A charge conference was held. Court is adjourned until Friday April 19, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Jury Trial as to Benjamin Chow held on 4/18/2018. Defendant Benjamin Chow present with retained counsel Katherine Goldstein, George Canellos and Adam Fee, Esqs. AUSAs Max Nicholas, Elisha Kobre and Scott Hartman present. Court Reporters Alena Lynch and Mike McDaniel present. Jury Trial continued. Evidence entered. The Government rests. The defendant's motions for a judgment of acquittal are denied. The defense case began. Evidence entered. Trial is adjourned to Thursday April 19, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Bail continued (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Jury Trial as to Benjamin Chow held on 4/17/2018. Defendant Benjamin Chow present with retained counsel Katherine Goldstein, Adam Fee and George Canellos, Esqs. AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Max Nicholas and Scott Hartman present. Court Reporters Alena Lynch and Mike McDaniel present. Jury Trial continued. Evidence entered. Trial is adjourned until Wednesday April 18, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Benjamin Chow : Notice to Attorney Hartman, Scott) to RE-FILE Document 102 MOTION in Limine To Admit the Yin Declaration.. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Jury Trial as to Benjamin Chow held on 4/16/2018. Defendant Benjamin Chow present with George Canellos, Katherine Goldstein and Adam Fee, Esqs. AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Scott Hartman and Max Nicholas present. Court Reporters Alena Lynch and Mike McDaniel present. Trial continued. Evidence entered. Court is adjourned until April 17, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Jury Trial as to Benjamin Chow held on 4/11/2018. Defendant Benjamin Chow present with George Canellos, Katherine Goldstein and Adam Fee, Esqs. AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Scott Hartman and Max Nicholas present. Court Reporters Alena Lynch and Mike McDaniel present. Trial continued. Evidence entered. Court is adjourned to April 16, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Jury Trial as to Benjamin Chow held on 4/10/2018. Defendant Benjamin Chow present with retained counsel George Canellos, Katherine Goldstein and Adam Fee, Esqs. AUSAs Max Nicholas, Elisha Kobre, and Dan Hartman present. Court Reporters Elena Lynch and Mike McDaniel present. Jury trial continued. Opening statements held, evidence entered. Court is adjourned until April 11, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Benjamin Chow : Notice to Attorney Scott Andrew Hartman to RE-FILE Document 97 MOTION in Limine to preclude the defendant from offering inadmissible hearsay and unnoticed expert testimony. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Voir Dire held on 4/9/2018 as to Benjamin Chow. Defendant Benjamin Chow present with retained counsel George Canellos, Katherine Goldstein, and Adam Fee, Esqs. AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Dan Hartman, and Max Nicholas present. Court Reporters Alena Lynch and Mike McDaniel present. Jury trial began. Jury selection began and was completed. 14 jurors empaneled and sworn. Court is adjourned until April 10, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Jury Selection as to Benjamin Chow held on 4/9/2018 (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Jury Trial as to Benjamin Chow held on 4/9/2018 (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Benjamin Chow : Status Conference set for 4/12/2018 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Pretrial Conference as to Benjamin Chow held on 3/16/2018. Counsel for Defendant Benjamin Chow George Canellos, Katie Goldstein, and Adam Fee present.AUSAs Elisha Kobre, Scott Hartman, and Max Nicholas present. Court Reporter Steven Griffing present. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Benjamin Chow : Notice to Attorney Max Clement Nicholas to RE-FILE Document 86 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Benjamin Chow: Responses due by 3/9/2018. Replies due by 3/13/2018. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Benjamin Chow: Responses due by 3/2/2018. Replies due by 3/4/2018. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 56. "TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Benjamin Chow re: Sentence held on 2/2/18 before Judge Denise L. Cote." The document was incorrectly filed in this case. [*** NOTE: This document was originally docketed on 2/20/2018 by (McGuirk, Kelly). Court Reporters Office/SDNY requested the deletion of this docket entry on 2/20/2018. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 57. "NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Benjamin Chow." The document was incorrectly filed in this case. [*** NOTE: This document was originally docketed on 2/20/2018 by (McGuirk, Kelly). Court Reporters Office/SDNY requested the deletion of this docket entry on 2/20/2018. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Motion Hearing as to Benjamin Chow held on 2/9/2018. Defendant Benjamin Chow present with Katherine Goldstein, Adam Fee, and George Canellos, Esqs. AUSAs Scott Hartman and Amanda Kramer present. Court Reporter Alena Lynch present. Motion hearing began. The hearing on defense motions began but was adjourned to the afternoon at 2:00 p.m. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Motion Hearing as to Benjamin Chow held on 2/9/2018 re: Defendant Benjamin Chow present with retained counsel Katherine Goldstein, Adam Fee, Esqs. AUSA Scott Hartman present. Court Reporter Alena Lynch present. Hearing on defense motions continued. For oral opinion, see record of proceedings. Bail continued. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Benjamin Chow : Notice to Attorney Katherine Rachel Goldstein to RE-FILE Document 25 MOTION for Bond Modification, On Consent of the Government and Pretrial Services. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk: as to Benjamin Chow. Transmitted re: 16 Endorsed Letter, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing of document. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Initial Appearance as to Benjamin Chow held on 11/8/2017. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Pretrial Conference as to Benjamin Chow held on 11/8/2017 as to Benjamin Chow ( Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) The Court will hold a hearing on February 9, 2018 on any filed defense motions. The Court will issue a separate order establishing a briefing schedule on motions, deadlines for the filing of pretrial materials, motions in limine, and will set a date for the final pretrial conference in this matter. The time between now and February 9, 2018 is excluded from the Speedy Trial clock in the interest of justice. Bail continued (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods:Arraignment as to Benjamin Chow (1) Count 1,2-13,14. Not Guilty Plea entered by Benjamin Chow. Defendant Benjamin Chow present with retained counsel George Canellos, Katherine Goldstein and Adam Fee, Esqs. AUSA's Amanda Kramer and Elisha Kobre present. Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski present. The defendant waived the detailed reading and entered a plea of not guilty to Counts 1 through 14 of the indictment. The Court schedules a jury trial in this matter to begin on April 9, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will hold a hearing on February 9, 2018 on any filed defense motions. The Court will issue a separate order establishing a briefing schedule on motions, deadlines for the filing of pretrial materials, motions in limine, and will set a date for the final pretrial conference in this matter. The time between now and February 9, 2018 is excluded from the Speedy Trial clock in the interest of justice. Bail continued. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Designated ECF as to Benjamin Chow. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORAL ORDER as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 9/1/2017)(dif) [1:17-mj-06668-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?