Family Trust Services LLC v. Walker
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00859

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 13, 2019 at 11:25 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Billy Gregory, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leader, Bulso & Nolan, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene N. Bulso, Jr. +1 615 780 4110 +1 615 780 4118 gbulso@leaderbulso.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Krog +1 615 780 4115 +1 615 780 4132 pkrog@leaderbulso.com
No Logo Carl Chambers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leader, Bulso & Nolan, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene N. Bulso, Jr. +1 615 780 4110 +1 615 780 4118 gbulso@leaderbulso.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Krog +1 615 780 4115 +1 615 780 4132 pkrog@leaderbulso.com
No Logo Family Trust Services LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leader, Bulso & Nolan, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene N. Bulso, Jr. +1 615 780 4110 +1 615 780 4118 gbulso@leaderbulso.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Krog +1 615 780 4115 +1 615 780 4132 pkrog@leaderbulso.com
No Logo John Sherrod, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leader, Bulso & Nolan, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene N. Bulso, Jr. +1 615 780 4110 +1 615 780 4118 gbulso@leaderbulso.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Krog +1 615 780 4115 +1 615 780 4132 pkrog@leaderbulso.com
No Logo Mr. Steven Reigle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leader, Bulso & Nolan, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene N. Bulso, Jr. +1 615 780 4110 +1 615 780 4118 gbulso@leaderbulso.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Krog +1 615 780 4115 +1 615 780 4132 pkrog@leaderbulso.com
No Logo Regal Homes Co., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leader, Bulso & Nolan, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene N. Bulso, Jr. +1 615 780 4110 +1 615 780 4118 gbulso@leaderbulso.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Krog +1 615 780 4115 +1 615 780 4132 pkrog@leaderbulso.com
v.
No Logo Charles E. Walker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WOODBINE LEGAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. Walker +1 615 367 5111 +1 615 383 1154 charles@woodbinelegal.com
No Logo Jon Paul Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jon Paul Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Paul Johnson
No Logo Julie Coone, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 206

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Redman Laser, III +1 615 669 5468 rob@laserlawfirm.com
No Logo Merdan Ibrahim, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 206

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Redman Laser, III +1 615 669 5468 rob@laserlawfirm.com
No Logo Nationwide Investments, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Bruno +1 615 251 9500 +1 615 345 4188 paul@brunonewsom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by brunonewsom.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick B. Newsom +1 615 251 9500 +1 615 345 4188 patrick@brunonewsom.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1452
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Strike
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Remand to State Court
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MEMORANDUM in Support of 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Charles E. Walker . (Walker, Charles) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Show Cause
                        MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Charles E. Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A - Motion to Add Defendants State Court Proceedings)(Walker, Charles)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charles E. Walker from Davidson County Chancery Court, case number 15-00780-BC. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-2751787) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Motion to Add Defendants State Court Proceedings, # 2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?