Holley v. A&E Television Networks, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00312

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 23, 2019 at 3:06 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 553
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs Complaint be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. ยง 1915(e)(2); and 2. The case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 12/10/2018. (srb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 9 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?