Enriquez v. City Of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-04293

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 23, 2020 at 7:07 PM ST (6.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Diangelo Enriquez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael L Spiegel +1 212 587 8558 +1 212 571 7767 mikespieg@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Bruce Rankin +1 212 490 0400 +1 212 277 5880 DRankin@BLHNY.com
v.
No Logo Barbara Sampson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Michigan Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Joseph T. Froehlich +1 517 373 6434 +1 517 373 2454 froehlichj@michigan.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thor Y. Inouye +1 517 373 6434 +1 517 373 2454 AG-PEET@michigan.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Margaret A. Nelson +1 517 373 6434 nelsonm9@michigan.gov
, John L. Thurber +1 517 335 7021 thurberj@michigan.gov
No Logo Charles Hirsch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Does 1-4, Defendant
No Logo P.O. John Does 1-3, Defendant
No Logo City Of New York, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joshua Joseph Lax +1 212 442 6831 +1 212 788 9776 joshua_lax@hotmail.com
, , , Jorge M. Marquez-San Martin +1 787 525 8895 +1 212 356 3509 jorge.marquez.sm@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by 99 Park Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Ryan Michael Cleary +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 rcleary@hpmb.com
, , , , , , , , Austa Starr Devlin +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 adevlin@hpmb.com
Space Tucker Christian Kramer +1 212 286 8585 +1 212 490 8966 tkramer@hpmb.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daryl Paxson +1 914 522 2068 +1 914 949 1160 dpaxson@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jordan Michael Smith +1 212 880 3800 +1 212 880 8965 jordan.smith@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Peter John Fogarty +1 212 356 3514 pfogarty@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Bilal Husain Haider +1 212 356 3549 +1 212 356 3509 bhaider@law.nyc.gov
Space Evan Michael Piercey +1 212 356 2428 epiercey@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Beth Jenifer Hoffman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Beth Jenifer Hoffman

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dara Lynn Weiss +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 DAWEISS@LAW.NYC.GOV

Toggle Switch Represented by Corporation Counsel Office City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Rhiana L. Swartz +1 212 356 2382 +1 212 356 3509 rswartz@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Epstein Becker & Green, P.C.(NY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joshua Adam Stein +1 212 351 4660 +1 212 878 8600 JStein@ebglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell Pittoni Murphy & Bach, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Alejandra Rosa Gil +1 914 559 3100 agil@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heidell, Pittoni, Murphy & Bach, LLP (WP)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Daniel Gerard May +1 212 471 4653 +1 212 490 8966 dmay@hpmb.com
, , , , , , , , Ana Maria Vizzo +1 212 471 4661 +1 212 883 7929 avizzo@hpmb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joshua Mathew Friedman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joshua Mathew Friedman

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@ahalelaw.com
, Elisa Lee +1 781 636 8967 +1 212 356 3582 ellee@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gary Moy +1 212 356 3522 +1 212 788 9776 gmoy@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Daniel H. Oliner +1 212 356 2329 +1 212 256 3509 doliner@law.nyc.gov
, Rachel Amy Seligman +1 212 788 0784 +1 212 788 9776 rseligma@law.nyc.gov
, , , Scott Craig Silverman +1 212 356 2450 ssilverm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Fayola Naila Alibey +1 212 356 2334 +1 212 356 3509 falibey@law.nyc.gov
, , , Joseph Anci +1 212 356 1106 +1 212 788 5650 janci@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Suzanne Emily Aribakan +1 212 232 1300 +1 212 232 1399 saribaka@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Christopher Gregory Arko +1 212 788 0303 carko@law.nyc.gov
, , , Karl Joseph Ashanti +1 212 227 0414 +1 212 788 9776 kashanti@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Richard Bahrenburg +1 212 356 2338 +1 212 356 3509 rbahrenb@law.nyc.gov
, , , Elizabeth Barrett Bardauskis +1 212 356 3159 +1 212 356 3509 ebardaus@law.nyc.gov
, , , Nikki Lynn Barker +1 212 676 0992 nbarker@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Zachary Russell Bergman +1 212 356 5051 zbergman@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Shira M. Blank +1 212 356 2475 +1 212 788 3770 sblank@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Cassandra Natasha Branch +1 212 356 4074 cbranch@law.nyc.gov
, , , Daniel Michael Braun +1 212 356 3548 +1 212 356 3509 dbraun@law.nyc.gov
, , , Cherie Nicole Brown +1 212 356 5054 chebrown@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Evan Brustein +1 212 356 2651 +1 212 356 3509 ebrustei@law.nyc.gov
, , , Katherine Abigail Byrns +1 212 356 3549 +1 212 356 3509 kbyrns@law.nyc.gov
Space John Corbin Carter +1 212 356 2078 jocarter@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Johana Castro +1 212 788 0976 +1 212 788 9776 jcastro@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Colin M. Ceriello +1 212 356 5052 +1 212 356 3509 cceriell@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacqueline Carolina Chavez +1 212 356 1000 jchavez@law.nyc.gov
, , , Megan Patricia Conger +1 212 356 3504 +1 212 356 3509 mconger@law.nyc.gov
, , , David Allen Cooper +1 212 356 3535 +1 212 356 3509 dcooper@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Alexandra Corsi +1 212 788 1090 +1 212 788 9776 acorsi@law.nyc.gov
, , , Theresa Jeanine D'Andrea +1 212 356 3187 +1 212 356 3509 tdandrea@law.nyc.gov
, , , Elizabeth M. Daitz +1 212 788 0775 +1 212 788 9776 edaitz@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Danielle Marie Dandrige +1 212 788 0889 +1 212 788 0877 Ddandrig@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Elizabeth Carolyn Degori +1 212 356 3586 edegori@law.nyc.gov
, Carolyn Kay Depoian +1 212 442 1048 +1 212 788 9776 cdepoian@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTI Anthony Matthew Disenso +1 212 442 6618 +1 212 788 9776 adisenso@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Hannah Victoria Faddis +1 212 356 2486 +1 212 356 1148 hfaddis@law.nyc.gov
, , , Courtney Patrice Fain +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 cfain@law.nyc.gov
, Kaitlin Elizabeth Fitzgibbon +1 212 356 5057 kfitzgib@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Michael Friel Fleming +1 212 356 2471 +1 212 788 3770 mfleming@law.nyc.gov
, , , Brian Christopher Francolla +1 212 788 0988 +1 212 788 9776 bfrancol@law.nyc.gov
, Philip Sebastian Frank +1 212 788 0893 +1 212 788 9776 pfrank@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A John L. Garcia +1 212 356 5053 +1 212 356 3509 johgarci@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ashley Rebecca Garman +1 212 768 4900 +1 212 768 3629 agarman@law.nyc.gov
, Holly Rachel Gerstenfeld +1 212 788 0710 +1 212 788 0937 hgersten@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/20/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/20/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/20/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Brachah Goykadosh +1 212 356 3523 +1 212 356 3509 bgoykado@law.nyc.gov
, , , Joseph Aaron Gutmann +1 212 356 2659 +1 212 356 3509 jgutmann@law.nyc.gov
Space John Paul Guyette +1 212 356 2455 +1 212 356 2089 jguyette@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Douglas William Heim +1 212 788 1298 +1 212 788 9776 dheim@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Maurice L Hudson +1 212 788 8684 +1 212 788 9776 mhudson@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Elissa Beth Jacobs +1 212 341 9892 +1 212 788 9776 ejacobs@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Paul Hasan Johnson +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 pajohnso@law.nyc.gov
, Christopher Michael Katsimagles +1 609 558 7656 ckatsima@law.nyc.gov
, Melissa Kim +1 310 985 1524 mkim@law.nyc.gov
, , , Elizabeth Norris Krasnow +1 212 335 3997 +1 212 335 4390 krasnowe@dany.nyc.gov
, , , , , Ben Kuruvilla +1 212 788 6405 +1 212 788 9776 bkuruvil@law.nyc.gov
, Ariel Shaun Lichterman +1 212 513 7927 +1 212 788 9776 alichter@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Jeffrey Loperfido +1 212 356 2384 +1 212 356 3509 jloperfido@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew W Manoff +1 212 356 3283 amanoff@law.nyc.gov
, Paul Frederick Marks +1 212 788 0884 +1 212 788 8877 pmarks@law.nyc.gov
, , , Heather Marie Martone +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 hmartone@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Joseph Anthony Marutollo +1 212 788 1300 +1 212 788 0367 jmarutol@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Max Oliver McCann +1 212 788 0861 +1 212 788 9776 mmccann@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanne Maureen McLaren +1 212 801 3197 +1 212 801 6400 jmclaren@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Linda Margareta Mindrutiu +1 212 788 1177 +1 212 788 9776 lmindrut@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alison Sue Mitchell +1 212 356 3514 amitchel@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrew Thomas Myerberg +1 212 788 0869 +1 212 788 9776 amyerber@law.nyc.gov
, Michael Nacchio +1 212 356 2726 mnacchio@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kathleen Erin Naughton +1 212 788 9567 +1 212 788 9776 knaughto@law.nyc.gov
, , , Alexander Macrae Noble +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 356 3509 anoble@law.nyc.gov
, , , Daniel Louis Passeser +1 212 227 6339 +1 212 788 9776 dpassese@law.nyc.gov
, , , Lucienne Pierre +1 212 356 2415 +1 212 356 3509 lpierre@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew James Rauchberg +1 212 788 0889 +1 212 788 0940 arauchbe@law.nyc.gov
Space Justin Warren Reiter +1 212 356 3580 jreiter@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Sean Robert Renaghan +1 212 356 2452 srenagha@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , Wilda Jacqueline Rodriguez +1 212 356 4361 +1 212 356 3508 wrodrigu@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Erin T. Ryan +1 212 365 5056 +1 212 356 3509 eryan@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Daniel G. Saavedra +1 212 356 0892 +1 212 356 3509 dsaavedr@law.nyc.gov
, , , Melanie Vogel Sadok +1 212 676 6051 +1 212 791 9714 msadok@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Suvarna S. Sampale +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 788 9776 ssampale@law.nyc.gov
, , , Nana Kwame Sarpong +1 212 356 0827 +1 212 356 3508 nsarpong@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Susan P. Scharfstein +1 212 227 4071 +1 212 788 9776 sscharfs@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Omar Javed Siddiqi +1 212 356 2381 osiddiqi@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Valerie Elizabeth Smith +1 212 356 2398 vsmith@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Melanie Mary Speight +1 212 788 0577 +1 212 788 9776 mspeight@law.nyc.gov
, , , Kathryn M Sprovieri +1 212 356 2383 +1 212 356 3509 ksprovie@law.nyc.gov
, Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov
, , , Matthew Stein +1 212 356 2105 +1 212 356 2105 mstein@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Pernell Michael Telfort +1 212 341 2652 +1 212 788 3824 ptelfort@law.nyc.gov
, Kavin Suresh Thadani +1 212 356 2351 +1 212 356 3509 kthadani@law.nyc.gov
, Omar Hani Tuffaha +1 212 356 0896 +1 212 788 0877 otuffaha@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Melissa Wachs +1 718 222 2332 +1 718 802 2540 mwachs@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Alan Weiner +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 1148 jweiner@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Angharad Wilson +1 212 356 2572 awilson@law.nyc.gov
, Lamar DeVaughn Winslow +1 212 356 2579 +1 212 356 3558 lwinslow@law.nyc.gov
, , , Christopher John Yee Coyne +1 212 356 1180 +1 212 356 2089 ccoyne@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph P. Zangrilli +1 212 356 2657 +1 212 356 1148 jzangril@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Law Dept.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Ryan Glenn Shaffer +1 212 788 1041 +1 212 788 9776 rshaffer@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Shlomit Aroubas +1 212 442 2715 +1 212 788 9776 saroubas@law.nyc.gov
, Tanya N Blocker +1 212 356 3177 +1 212 780 3770 tblocker@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Marie Breslow +1 212 788 1575 +1 212 788 9776 sbreslow@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Matthew Bridge +1 212 356 2347 +1 212 356 3509 mbridge@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Peter William Brocker +1 212 356 2332 +1 212 356 3509 pbrocker@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Elizabeth Colette Connelly +1 212 356 2547 +1 212 356 1148 econnell@law.nyc.gov
, , , Tavish Coryell Deatley +1 212 356 2409 tdeatley@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , Maria Fernanda DeCastro +1 212 356 2658 +1 212 356 3509 mdecastr@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Eviana Linnea Frances Englert +1 212 356 5055 eenglert@law.nyc.gov
, , , Aimee Kara Lulich +1 212 788 0725 +1 212 788 9776 alulich@law.nyc.gov
, Matthew William McQueen +1 212 356 2423 +1 212 356 3509 mmcqueen@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Suzanna Publicker Mettham +1 212 788 1103 +1 212 788 9776 smettham@law.nyc.gov
, , Okwede N Okoh +1 212 356 3271 +1 212 788 9776 ookoh@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Alan Howard Scheiner +1 212 788 0600 +1 212 788 0367 ascheine@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark David Zuckerman +1 212 442 8248 +1 212 788 9776 mzuckerm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , William Keaupuni Akina +1 212 356 2377 +1 212 356 3509 wakina@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO B Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kristen Monet McIntosh +1 212 356 2394 +1 212 356 3582 kmcintos@law.nyc.gov
, Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Andrea Mary O'Connor +1 212 676 2750 +1 212 788 8877 aoconnor@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Kathleen Deborah Reilly +1 212 356 2663 +1 212 356 2663 kareilly@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Max R. Sarinsky +1 212 356 4017 +1 212 356 2019 msarinsk@law.nyc.gov
, Qiana Charmaine Smith +1 212 788 1588 +1 212 788 9776 qwilliam@law.nyc.gov
, , , Emily Stitelman +1 212 356 2011 +1 212 356 2019 estitelm@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , David Ferrari +1 212 356 5058 dferrari@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Keith Gertzer +1 212 788 0786 +1 212 788 9776 mgertzer@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , Brian Guenther Maxey +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 bmaxey@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Corporation Counsel NYC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jeffrey Scott Dantowitz +1 212 788 0939 +1 212 788 8877 jdantowi@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Elissa Paulette Fudim +1 212 356 2425 +1 212 356 1148 efudim@law.nyc.gov
, Aviva Yocheved Horowitz +1 917 868 1122 ahorowit@law.nyc.gov
, , , Sumit Sud +1 212 788 1096 +1 212 788 0367 ssud@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The Corporation Counsel, Nyc Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amatullah Khaliha Booth +1 212 356 3534 +1 212 356 3509 abooth@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/03/2017, TERMINATED: 01/03/2017, TERMINATED: 01/03/2017 Amanda Shoffel +1 212 416 8576 +1 212 416 6009

Toggle Switch Represented by Philip Rudolph DePaul

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Philip Rudolph DePaul

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kyle C. Bruno +1 732 674 3172 kbruno@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , Brendan Michael Horan +1 212 356 1174 +1 212 356 4360 brhoran@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , Evan F. Jaffe +1 212 356 2354 evjaffe@law.nyc.gov
, , , Issac Klepfish +1 212 788 0897 +1 212 788 8000 iklepfis@law.NYC.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nelson Leese +1 212 356 4361 nleese@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Jane Weall +1 212 356 1000 +1 212 356 3509 kweall@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Sadis & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Jennifer Amy Rossan +1 212 788 0867 +1 212 788 9776 jrossan@sglawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tzipora Esther Teichman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tzipora Esther Teichman
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Settlement Agreement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Discovery
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Seal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Discovery
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Case Management Plan
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Case Management Plan
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for conference
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Conference
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER: granting 14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. City Of New York answer due 9/5/2017; Charles Hirsch answer due 9/5/2017; Barbara Sampson answer due 9/5/2017. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/10/2017) (ap) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or move or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Arthur G.Larkin dated July 7, 2017. Document filed by City Of New York, Charles Hirsch, Barbara Sampson.(Larkin, Arthur) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Charles Hirsch served on 6/16/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Service Window Clerk. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Diangelo Enriquez. (Rankin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Barbara Sampson served on 6/16/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Service Window Clerk. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Diangelo Enriquez. (Rankin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City Of New York served on 6/16/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Service Window Clerk. Document filed by Diangelo Enriquez. (Rankin, David) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael L Spiegel on behalf of Diangelo Enriquez. (Spiegel, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rankin, David) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barbara Sampson. (jvs) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Charles Hirsch. (jvs) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. (jvs) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chief Medical Examiner Barbara Sampson, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Diangelo Enriquez. (Rankin, David) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Former Chief Medical Examiner Charles Hirsch, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Diangelo Enriquez. (Rankin, David) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Diangelo Enriquez. (Rankin, David) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rankin, David) Modified on 6/8/2017 (jvs). (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against City Of New York, John Does 1-3, Does 1-4, Charles Hirsch, Barbara Sampson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13756021)Document filed by Diangelo Enriquez.(Rankin, David) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?