Vernon Unsworth v. Elon Musk
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-08048-SVW-JC
District Judge Stephen V. Wilson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Last Updated July 28, 2021 at 12:42 PM DT (1.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Unsworth, Vernon, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Vernon Unsworth"

Toggle Switch Represented by Chatham Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Chatham chris@chathamfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by L. Lin Wood, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan David Grunberg +1 404 822 2285 jgrunberg@linwoodlaw.com
Space Nicole Jennings Wade +1 404 891 1403 +1 404 572 6999 nwade@linwoodlaw.com
Space G. Taylor Wilson +1 404 891 1402 twilson@linwoodlaw.com
Space L. Lin Wood, Jr. +1 404 891 1402 +1 404 506 9111 lwood@linwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weisbart Springer Hayes, LLP.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matt C. Wood +1 512 652 5780 mwood@wshllp.com
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Hueston Henningan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/12/2019 John C Hueston +1 949 229 8640 +1 888 775 0898 jhueston@hueston.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2019 Moez M Kaba +1 213 788 4340 +1 888 755 0898 mkaba@hueston.com
TERMINATED: 06/12/2019 Sourabh Mishra +1 949 229 8640 smishra@hueston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Lifrak +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 michaellifrak@quinnemanuel.com
Space Robert M Schwartz +1 213 443 3675 +1 213 443 3100 robertschwartz@quinnemanuel.com
Space Alexander Benjamin Spiro +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 alexspiro@quinnemanuel.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (176) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 169 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: 12/30/2019 Transcript Order
    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jill Belack at jbelack@ktmc.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (lca)
      LREF
      Legal Document 168 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Transcript
      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/6/19 - Jury Charge and Plaintiff's closing. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Anne Kielwasser, phone number TO ORDER - FORM G120. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2020. (Kielwasser, Anne)
        LREF
        Legal Document 167 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Transcript
        TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/5/19 morning session only. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: anne kielwasser, phone number TO ORDER - FORM G120. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2020. (Kielwasser, Anne)
          LREF
          Legal Document 166 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Transcript
          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/4/19 Morning Session Only. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Anne Kielwasser, phone number TO ORDER - FORM G120. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2020. (Kielwasser, Anne)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final - optional html form
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 163 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Stipulation for Judgment
                Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order of Final Judgment)(Spiro, Alexander)
                LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Unredacted Document
                SEALED UNREDACTED Jury Note #1 [156] (es)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Unredacted Document
                  UNREDACTED VERDICT [155] (es)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 160 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 judgmentCourt Filing
                    JUDGMENT ON THE VERDICT FOR DEFENDANT(S) [154] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the plaintiff(s): Vernon Unsworthtake nothing; that the action be dismissed on the merits; and that the defendant(s): Elon Musk recover of the plaintiff(s) its costs of action, taxed in the sum of to be determined by motion.(MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 List of Exhibits and Witnesses (G-65)
                      LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (es)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 jury instructions given
                        COURT'S INSTRUCTIONS TO THE JURY (es)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 157 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Receipt for Release of Exhibits to Counsel upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial (G-38)
                          RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on Joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (es)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Jury Notes
                            REDACTED Jury Notes # 1 filed. (es)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 jury verdict
                              REDACTED VERDICT (es)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 154 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Jury Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held and completed before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Closing arguments made. Bailiff sworn. Jury retires to deliberate. Verdict reached. Jury FINDS: defendant. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser (AM); Laura Elias (PM). (mrgo)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Irrelevant Testimony of Jared Birchall [147]. The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Notice - other
                                    NOTICE of Defendant's Exceptions to Final Jury Instructions filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 149 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the basis of: FRCP Rule 50(a): Plaintiff's Evidence is Insufficient as a Matter of Law filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Jury Trial - Held and ContinuedCourt Filing
                                        MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 12/6/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Motion for Judgment/Directed Verdict by Defendant is DENIED. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser (AM); Laura Elias (PM). (mrgo)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 147 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion to strike
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Irrelevant Testimony of Jared Birchall filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 151 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Jury Trial - Held and ContinuedCourt Filing
                                            MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 12/5/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser; Laura Elias. (mrgo)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 148 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Jury Trial BegunCourt Filing
                                              MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Jury impaneled and sworn. Opening statements made. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 12/4/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (yl)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Witness Testimony Summaries
                                                AMENDED WITNESS TESTIMONY SUMMARIES filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wood, L)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Exhibit
                                                  Final Joint Amended Exhibit List filed by Defendant Elon Musk.. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Witness List *
                                                    Witness List filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth.. (Wood, L)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 143 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Bar Argument or Comments of Gamesmanship, Changing of a Claim, or Abandonment of Claims filed by plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.(Wood, L)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 142 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION IN LIMINE No. 5 to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Bernard J. Jansen filed by Defendant Elon Musk. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael T. Lifrak in Support of Renewed MIL No. 5)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Notice - other
                                                          NOTICE Defendant's Exceptions to Preliminary Jury Instructions filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 140 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for To Clarify or Modify the Pretrial Order filed by Defendant Elon Musk. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/29/2019, Entered: 11/29/2019 Jury instructions - Proposed
                                                              PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Second Supplemental set) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth.. (Wood, L)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 138 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement
                                                                MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Shirish Gupta: Mediation held on November 21, 2019. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: MediationParticipantSurvey(Gupta, Shirish)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 137 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Order on Motion in Limine to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: granting in part and denying in part [95] Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting [96] Motion in Limine to Exclude; granting [97] Motion in Limine to Exclude; denying [98] Motion in Limine to Exclude; denying in part [101] Motion in Limine to Exclude. The parties are ORDERED to strictly adhere to the instructions above, as well as the Court's Civil Trial Preparation Order, Dkt. 46, and any further admonitions from the Court. Regarding opening statements, the parties are further ORDERED as follows: (see document for details). The jury trial will begin on December 3, 2019 at 9 a.m., with a final pretrial conference at 2:30 p.m. on December 2, 2019. To fully, efficiently, and fairly conduct the trial, the Court orders as follows: (see document for details). (mrgo)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 136 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Pretrial Conference - InterimCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; [95] MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence filed by Plaintiff; [96] MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Unrelated tweets and SEC settlement filed by Defendant; [97] MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Cell Phone Replacement filed by Defendant; [98] MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Press Leaks filed by Defendant; [101] MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Bernard J. Jansen filed by Defendant; [118] MOTION to Enforce Trial Subpoena To Vernon Unsworth filed by Defendant; [126] MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena for Elon Musk filed by Defendant held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Attorneys state their appearances. Further argument was heard. Order to issue. A final pretrial conference is ordered for December 2, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (mrgo)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 134 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Trial Brief
                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Musk Tweet)(Wood, L)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 135 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Pretrial Conference - InterimCourt Filing
                                                                      MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; [95] MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence filed by Plaintiff; [96] MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Unrelated tweets and SECsettlement filed by Defendant; [97] MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Cell PhoneReplacement filed by Defendant; [98] MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Press Leaks filed byDefendant; [101] MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr.Bernard J. Jansen filed by Defendant; [118] MOTION to Enforce Trial Subpoena To Vernon Unsworth filed byDefendant; [126] MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena for Elon Musk filed by Defendant held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson Wilson. Attorneys state their appearances. Oral argument was heard. The parties are ordered to return November 26, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. for further argument. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (mrgo)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 133 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Jury instructions - Proposed
                                                                        PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Supplemental set) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth.. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 132 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 reply
                                                                          REPLY filed by Defendant Elon Musk to Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law[114] filed by Plaintiff (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 131 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                            OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena for Elon Musk [126] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 130 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Voir Dire Questions (Proposed)
                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth.. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 129 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Jury instructions - Proposed
                                                                                PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth.. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 128 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Voir Dire Questions (Proposed)
                                                                                  Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant Elon Musk.. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 127 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                    REPLY In Support Of MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Bernard J. Jansen [101] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael T. Lifrak In Support of MIL No. 5 (Part 1), # (2) Declaration of Michael T. Lifrak In Support of MIL No. 5 (Part 2))(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 126 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 Motion to Quash Trial SubpoenaCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena for Elon Musk filed by Defendant Elon Musk. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Lifrak in support of Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena to Elon Musk, # (2) Proposed Order on Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena to Elon Musk) (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 125 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                        NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ellyde Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24790641)[112]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 124 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: DENYING [58] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation. For the reasons discussed above, the Court DENIES Defendants motion for summary judgment. Dkt. 58. The jury trial remains scheduled for December 3, 2019 at 9:00 a.m., with pretrial on November25, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (shb)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 123 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: GRANTING [112] Non-Resident Attorney Ellyde Thompson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk, designating Michael Lifrak as local counsel. (shb)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 122 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                              REPLY Support MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence [95] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Matt C. Wood)(Wood, L)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 121 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                REPLY In Support Of MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Press Leaks [98] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 120 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                  REPLY In Support Of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Unrelated tweets and SEC settlement [96] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Lifrak)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 119 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 118 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019, Terminated: 12/6/2019 motion to enforceCourt Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Trial Subpoena To Vernon Unsworth filed by Defendant Elon Musk. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Lifrak in support of Motion to Enforce Trial Subpoena, # (2) Declaration of Michael Lifrak in support of Motion to Enforce Trial Subpoena, # (3) Declaration of Michael Lifrak in support of Motion to Enforce Trial Subpoena, # (4) Proposed Order to Enforce Trial Subpoena) (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Witness List *
                                                                                                        Witness List filed by Defendant Elon Musk.. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 116 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Exhibit
                                                                                                          Joint Exhibit List filed by Defendant Elon Musk.. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 115 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Witness List *
                                                                                                            Witness List filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth.. (Wood, L)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wood, L)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 113 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Joint Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Wood, L)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019, Terminated: 11/18/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                  APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ellyde Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24790641) filed by defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Bernard J. Jansen [101] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Nicole Jennings Wade)(Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ERIC ROSE AS AN EXPERT WITNESS re MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Eric W. Rose [100] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance[108]. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William C Price on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Attorney William C Price added to party Elon Musk(pty:dft))(Price, William)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 107 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: In light of plaintiff's filing of a Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's First and Second Motions to Compel this date, the previously scheduled November 12, 2019 hearing thereon is vacated. No appearance by counsel is necessary. [84], [86] (klg)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 106 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                              Opposition to re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence [95] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Lifrak in support of Opposition to Motions in Limine Part 1, # (2) Declaration of Michael Lifrak in support of Opposition to Motions in Limine Part 2, # (3) Declaration of Michael Lifrak in support of Opposition to Motions in Limine Part 3)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 105 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Press Leaks [98] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 104 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Non-Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Cell Phone Replacement [97] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Unrelated tweets and SEC settlement [96] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 102 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel, [84], Motion to Compel, [86] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wood, L)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019, Terminated: 11/27/2019 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Bernard J. Jansen filed by Defendant Elon Musk. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Lifrak part 1, # (2) Declaration of Michael Lifrak part 2, # (3) Proposed Order)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019, Terminated: 11/13/2019 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Eric W. Rose filed by Defendant Elon Musk. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Lifrak, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine No. 4)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 99 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Michael Lifrak in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Unrelated tweets and SEC settlement [96], MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Press Leaks [98], MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Cell Phone Replacement [97] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 11/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Press Leaks filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 97 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 11/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Cell Phone Replacement filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 11/27/2019 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Unrelated tweets and SEC settlement filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 11/27/2019 Motion in LimineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.(Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 94 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to (Non-party requester) for Court Reporter. Court will contact Thomas Davis at t_davis925@yahoo.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (ls)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/28/2019 1:30 p.m. re Transcript [92] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Hourigan, Terri) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Transcript (CV)
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/28/2019 1:30 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Terri Hourigan, phone number hourigan.terri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2020. (Hourigan, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 90 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents [86] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wood, L)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 89 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Relating to Defendant Investigation of Plaintiff [84] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wood, L)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 88 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kimmy Hart Bennett at khart@linwoodlaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Wood, L)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Transcript Order Form (G-120)
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Elon Musk for Court Reporter. Court will contact Mario Gutierrez at mariogutierrez@quinnemanuel.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 91 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF [58] MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation filed by Defendant Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Hearing held the motion is submitted. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Terri Hourigan. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 86 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019, Terminated: 11/12/2019 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND Second MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of G. Taylor Wilson, # (2) Declaration of Michael T. Lifrak)(Wood, L)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 85 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Michael Lifrak part 1, # (2) Declaration Declaration of Michael LIfrak part 2)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 84 Filed: 10/14/2019, Entered: 10/14/2019, Terminated: 11/12/2019 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses Relating to Defendant Investigation of Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of G. Taylor Wilson, # (2) Declaration of Michael T. Lifrak, # (3) Declaration of Jared Birchall)(Wood, L)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 83 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER AMENDINGSCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, having read and considered the Joint Stipulation to Request Amendments to the Scheduling Order, and good cause appearing therefore, GRANTS the Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Scheduling Order [Doc. 54 Ex A., Doc. 69] is amended as set forth in the attached Joint Stipulation to Request Amendments to the Scheduling Order, which is hereby made the Order of this Court. (yl)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 82 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of G. Taylor Wilson In opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] VOLUME 6 OF 6 filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 81 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of G. Taylor Wilson In opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] VOLUME 5 OF 6 filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 80 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of G. Taylor Wilson In opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] VOLUME 4 OF 6 filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of G. Taylor Wilson In opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] VOLUME 3 OF 6 filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 78 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of G. Taylor Wilson In opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] VOLUME 2 OF 6 filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 77 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of G. Taylor Wilson In opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] VOLUME 1 OF 6 filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 76 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of Genuine Facts in Support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 74 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motions in Limine Relating to Experts filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Amending Scheduling Order)(Wood, L)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 73 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Shirish Gupta has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 72 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING DEADLINES by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: [71] MOTION for Extension of Time to File. The Court, having read and considered the Motion, and good cause appearing therefore, GRANTS the Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth shall file his opposition to Defendant Elon Musk's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before October 7, 2019, and Defendant Elon Musk shall file his Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on or before October 17, 2019. The hearing date shall remain October 28, 2019. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 71 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019, Terminated: 9/30/2019 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                              First REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Regarding Extending Briefing Deadlines) (Wood, L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 70 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/26/2019 Order on Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ELON MUSK'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMANENTLY SEALING DECLARATION OF JARED BIRCHALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AT DKT 61 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Ex Parte Application [67] is GRANTED, and that the Declaration of Jared Birchall in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement or in the alternative Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 61) will be permanently maintained under seal. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Assigned) - (ADR-2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: Defamation. Filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth(Wood, L)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan [54]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Scheduling Order (Attachment A to Doc. 54) is amended as set forth in the attached Joint Stipulation to Request Amendments to the Scheduling Order, which is hereby made the Order of this Court. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 67 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019, Terminated: 9/25/2019 Motion for orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Case for Order Permanently Sealing Declaration of Jared Birchall in support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgement DKT 61 filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Lifrak in support of Ex Parte Application to Seal, # (2) Proposed Order to Permanently Seal DKT 61) (Spiro, Alexander) Modified on 9/26/2019 (gk).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 66 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019, Terminated: 9/17/2019 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Withdraw Jared Birchall Declaration (Motion related)[61] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 65 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Jared Birchall in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 64 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Stipulation for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Discovery as to Taking Depositions After Close of Discovery and in Excess of Limit filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wade, Nicole)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment)(Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 62 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael Lifrak in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Jared Birchall In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander) ** DOCUMENT SEALED PURSUANT TO THE ORDER OF 9/25/2019 [70] ** Modified on 9/26/2019 (gk).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Elon Musk In support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation [58] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019, Terminated: 11/18/2019 Motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim for Defamation filed by Defendant Elon Musk. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 57 Filed: 6/29/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019 Order on Request for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting [56] Request for Protective Order. (sbou)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019, Terminated: 6/29/2019 Request for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint REQUEST for Protective Order for Discovery filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Jury Trial inadvertently scheduled for 12/02/2019 at 9:00 AM has been rescheduled to 12/3/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Elon Musk.. (Spiro, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 53 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO RESCHEDULE TRIAL DATE [51] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The original trial date of October 22, 2019 scheduled for this action is vacated. 2. Anew trial date is set for December 2, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. 3. Pretrial Conference is continued to November 25, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [50] REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney Robert M Schwartz as attorney of record instead of Attorneys Sourabh Mishra; John C Hueston and Moez M Kaba for Elon Musk. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 Stipulation to Reschedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Trial Date filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Lifrak, # (2) Declaration of Alex Spiro, # (3) Proposed Order)(Lifrak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019, Terminated: 6/12/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST of John C. Hueston, Moez M. Kaba, Sourabh Mishra, & Michael H. Todisco of Hueston Hennigan LLP to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Kaba, Moez)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [48] Non-Resident Attorney Matt C Wood APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vernon Unsworth, designating R Christopher Chatham as local counsel. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019, Terminated: 5/16/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matt C. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23743887) filed by plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PROPOSED) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [44] Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B Spiro APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk, designating Robert M Schwartz as local counsel. (bm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: 5/14/2019 Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Defendant Elon Musk.(Schwartz, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019, Terminated: 5/14/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B. Spiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/8/2019, Receipt No. 097323699206) filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Schwartz, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Order Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [36] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant's deadline to file his Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to and including May 13, 2019. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [30] by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. For the reasons discussed above, the Court DENIES Defendant's motion. Dkt. [30]. The Court sets a jury trial on October 22, 2019 at 9 a.m. and a pre-trial conference on October 7, 2019 at 3 p.m. (lom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B. Spiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/8/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23699206)[40]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019, Terminated: 5/14/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B. Spiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 5/8/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23699206) filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) (Proposed) Order) (Schwartz, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B. Spiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23699206)[35]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Counsel failed to attach application to the proposed order. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael T Lifrak counsel for Defendant Elon Musk. Adding Michael T. Lifrak as counsel of record for Elon Musk for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attorney Michael T Lifrak added to party Elon Musk(pty:dft))(Lifrak, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert M Schwartz counsel for Defendant Elon Musk. Adding Robert M. Schwartz as counsel of record for Elon Musk for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Robert M. Schwartz. (Schwartz, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 13, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Kaba, Moez)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019, Terminated: 5/14/2019 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander B. Spiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23699206) filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attorney Robert M Schwartz added to party Elon Musk(pty:dft)) (Schwartz, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Defendant's motion to dismiss [30] is DENIED. A detailed order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: [30] MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Elon Musk - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing set for 4/1/2019 is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: 3/18/2019 Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [30] filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Kaba, Moez)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case [30] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: 12/26/2018, Terminated: 4/26/2019 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Elon Musk. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Moez M. Kaba and Exhibits, # (2) Proposed Order) (Mishra, Sourabh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Elon Musk. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Moez M. Kaba and Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order) (Mishra, Sourabh) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: 12/26/2018 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elon Musk, (Mishra, Sourabh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S FORTHCOMING MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF' S COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiff's opposition brief shall be filed on or before February 25, 2019. Defendant's reply brief shall be filed on or before March 18, 2019. The hearing date for the Motion shall be April 1, 2019 or, if unavailable, the first available motion hearing date after April 1, 2019. (yl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S FORTHCOMING MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF' S COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiff's opposition brief shall be filed on or before February 25, 2019. Defendant's reply brief shall be filed on or before March 18, 2019. The hearing date for the Motion shall be April 1, 2019 or, if unavailable, the first available motion hearing date after April 1, 2019. (yl) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Elon Musk answer now due 12/26/2018,, STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response and Defendant's Reply filed by Defendant Elon Musk. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Re Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Forthcoming Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Mishra, Sourabh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [17] Non-Resident Attorney G. Taylor Wilson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of PLAINTIFF VERNON UNSWORTH, designating R. CHRISTOPHER CHATHAM as local counsel. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [16] Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Grunberg APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of PLAINTIFF VERNON UNSWORTH, designating R. CHRISTOPHER CHATHAM as local counsel. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Order on Motion to Appoint CustodianCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [15] Non-Resident Attorney Nicole J. Wade APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of PLAINTIFF VERNON UNSWORTH, designating R. CHRISTOPHER CHATHAM as local counsel. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting [14] Non-Resident Attorney L. Lin Wood APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of PLAINTIFF VERNON UNSWORTH, designating R. CHRISTOPHER CHATHAM as local counsel. (mrgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sourabh Mishra on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Attorney Sourabh Mishra added to party Elon Musk(pty:dft))(Mishra, Sourabh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Moez M Kaba on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party Elon Musk(pty:dft))(Kaba, Moez)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John C Hueston on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (Attorney John C Hueston added to party Elon Musk(pty:dft))(Hueston, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. upon Elon Musk waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Moez M. Kaba, Hueston Hennigan LLP. (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018, Terminated: 10/26/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 9/17/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22430781) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018, Terminated: 10/26/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 9/17/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22430815) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018, Terminated: 10/26/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole J. Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 9/17/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22430750) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018, Terminated: 10/26/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 9/17/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22430667) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint [1] as to defendant Elon Musk. (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430781)[7], APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430815)[8], APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole J. Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430750)[6], APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430667)[5]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Other error(s) with document(s): Proposed orders are to be attached to PHV application not submitted as a separate lodged document.. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430781)[7], APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole J. Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430750)[6], APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430815)[8], APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430667)[5] (Attachments: # (1) proposed order PHV Application, # (2) proposed order PHV Application, # (3) proposed order PHV Application, # (4) proposed order PHV Application)(Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018, Terminated: 10/26/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Grunberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430815) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018, Terminated: 10/26/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney G. Taylor Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430781) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018, Terminated: 10/26/2018 Motion to Appoint Custodian
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appoint Custodian , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole J. Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430750) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018, Terminated: 10/26/2018 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney L. Lin Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22430667) filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Summons Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth, identifying Plaintiff and Elon Musk. (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22429928 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Vernon Unsworth. (Attorney R Christopher Chatham added to party Vernon Unsworth(pty:pla))(Chatham, R)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 6,374 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?