St. Tammany Parish Government v. Purdue Pharma LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-08687

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2019 at 11:21 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo St. Tammany Parish Government, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berrigan, Litchfield, Schonekas, Mann & Traina, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. John Litchfield +1 504 568 0541 jlitchfield@berriganlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Huber, Slack, Thomas & Marcelle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Christopher Zainey, Jr. +1 504 274 2500 chris@huberslack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Leger & Shaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigid E. Collins +1 504 588 9043 bcollins@legershaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Landry +1 504 588 9043 mlandry@legershaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Walter John Leger, Jr. +1 504 588 9043 +1 504 588 9980 wleger@legershaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter John Leger, Jr. +1 504 588 9043 +1 504 588 9980 wleger@legershaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Franklin G. Shaw +1 985 809 6625 fshaw@legershaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 301

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross Forrest Lagarde +1 985 605 0527 +1 985 605 0526 ross@rlagardelaw.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by gamb.law Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel E. Masur +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 smasur@gamb.law
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul B. Simon +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 psimon@gamb.law
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blanchard Walker et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W Michael Adams +1 318 221 6858 +1 318 227 2967 MAdams@bwor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. Mims +1 504 596 6136 mmims@bradleyfirm.com
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas MacDougall Womack +1 225 381 0239 +1 225 215 8734 mac.womack@taylorporter.com
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Munice Crump +1 601 696 4272 rcrump@maronmarvel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Dille +1 504 321 9331 rdille@maronmarvel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley K. Napolitano +1 504 684 5100 +1 504 527 5056 snapolitano@maronmarvel.com
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by foillaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Franklin J. Foil +1 225 382 3264 +1 225 382 3268 ffoil@foillaw.com
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard S. Crisler +1 504 596 6300 rcrisler@bradleyfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. Mims +1 504 596 6136 mmims@bradleyfirm.com
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Douglas Fauvre +1 202 942 5000 David.Fauvre@arnoldporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel John Dysart +1 504 566 5206 +1 504 696 3906 ddysart@bakerdonelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kerry J. Miller +1 504 566 8646 kjmiller@bakerdonelson.com
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Douglas Fauvre +1 202 942 5000 David.Fauvre@arnoldporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel John Dysart +1 504 566 5206 +1 504 696 3906 ddysart@bakerdonelson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kerry J. Miller +1 504 566 8646 kjmiller@bakerdonelson.com
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James B. Irwin, V +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 jirwin@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly G Juneau +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 kjuneau@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. Moore +1 504 310 2100 +3102 310 310 2101 dmoore@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Wayne O'Quinn +1 504 310 2100 doquinn@irwinllc.com
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James B. Irwin, V +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 jirwin@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly G Juneau +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 kjuneau@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. Moore +1 504 310 2100 +3102 310 310 2101 dmoore@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Wayne O'Quinn +1 504 310 2100 doquinn@irwinllc.com
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James B. Irwin, V +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 jirwin@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly G Juneau +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 kjuneau@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. Moore +1 504 310 2100 +3102 310 310 2101 dmoore@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Wayne O'Quinn +1 504 310 2100 doquinn@irwinllc.com
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blanchard Walker et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W Michael Adams +1 318 221 6858 +1 318 227 2967 MAdams@bwor.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacey Denise Williams +1 318 221 6858 swilliams@bwor.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott R Wolf +1 318 934 0228 +1 318 227 2967 swolf@bwor.com
No Logo Morris & Dickson Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiener, Weiss, Madison & Howell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Franklin H Spruiell, Jr. +1 318 226 9100 +1 318 424 5128 fspruiell@wwmlaw.com
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Cari K. Dawson +1 404 881 7000 cari.dawson@alston.com
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James B. Irwin, V +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 jirwin@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly G Juneau +1 504 310 2100 +1 504 310 2101 kjuneau@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. Moore +1 504 310 2100 +3102 310 310 2101 dmoore@irwinllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Wayne O'Quinn +1 504 310 2100 doquinn@irwinllc.com
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by gamb.law Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel E. Masur +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 smasur@gamb.law
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul B. Simon +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 psimon@gamb.law
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by gamb.law Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel E. Masur +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 smasur@gamb.law
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul B. Simon +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 psimon@gamb.law
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by gamb.law Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel E. Masur +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 smasur@gamb.law
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul B. Simon +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 psimon@gamb.law
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard S. Crisler +1 504 596 6300 rcrisler@bradleyfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. Mims +1 504 596 6136 mmims@bradleyfirm.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard S. Crisler +1 504 596 6300 rcrisler@bradleyfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. Mims +1 504 596 6136 mmims@bradleyfirm.com
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by gamb.law Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel E. Masur +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 smasur@gamb.law
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul B. Simon +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 psimon@gamb.law
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by gamb.law Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel E. Masur +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 smasur@gamb.law
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul B. Simon +1 337 237 0132 +1 337 237 3451 psimon@gamb.law
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Receipt
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Order of MDL Transfer
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Continue
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Request/Statement of Oral Argument
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Remand to State Court
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Answer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Statement of Corporate Disclosure
                                Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ivax Corporation, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Crisler, Richard)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Notice of Related Cases
                                  Notice of Related Case(s) Notice of Collateral Proceedings:2:17-cv-01585, 2:17-cv- 17722, 2:18-cv-00002, 2:18-00053, 2:18-cv-00055, 2:18-cv-04828, 2:18-cv-02717, 2:18-cv-03457, 2:18-cv-04789, 2:18-cv-05620, 2:18-cv-04165 by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(Crisler, Richard) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (am).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Amendment/Supplement to Document
                                    Amendment/Supplement to Document by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JPML Order, # 2 Exhibit Petition for Damages)(Crisler, Richard)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Statement of Corporate Disclosure
                                      Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Adams, W.)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cc) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 notice of removal
                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, St. Tammany Parish,, case number 2018-13660 "I" (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7119630) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 State Court Pleadings, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney W. Michael Adams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Adams, W.) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/20/2018) (am). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: # 3 List of Parties and Attorneys) (am).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?