Cohen v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-07660

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 22, 2019 at 5:47 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael T Cohen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CALO AGOSTINO, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANK AGOSTINO +1 201 488 5400 fagostino@caloagostino.com
No Logo Michael T. Cohen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CALO AGOSTINO, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANK AGOSTINO +1 201 488 5400 fagostino@caloagostino.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Max Aronoff +1 212 637 2697 +1 212 637 2686 peter.aronoff@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Stay
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Standing Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Rule 26 Disclosure
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. DEF'T'S TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE IS EXTENDED TO 4-9-18. (United States of America answer due 4/9/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 3/9/2018) (ras) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Peter Aronoff dated 3/8/2018. Document filed by United States of America.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE IS EXTENDED TO 3-8-18. (United States of America answer due 3/8/2018.)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/7/2018) (ras) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Peter Aronoff dated 2/6/2018. Document filed by United States of America.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (United States of America answer due 2/8/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 1/5/2018) (anc) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Peter Aronoff dated 1/3/2018. Document filed by United States of America.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States of America served on 11/7/2017, answer due 1/8/2018. Service was accepted by Israel Minaya, Clerk. Document filed by Michael T Cohen; Michael T. Cohen. (Agostino, Frank) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/2/2017) (anc) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America. (pc) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T Cohen, Michael T. Cohen. (Agostino, Frank) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Agostino, Frank) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T Cohen, Michael T. Cohen Estate of Arielle Hart Cohen. (Agostino, Frank) Modified on 10/10/2017 (kl). (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        COMPLAINT against Uniited States of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14216010)Document filed by Michael T Cohen, Michael T. Cohen Estate of Arielle Hart Cohen.(Agostino, Frank) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Frank Agostino. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Executor Michael T. Cohen Estate of Arielle Hart Cohen, Michael T Cohen, Uniited States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (kl)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (kl)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (kl)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (kl)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Frank Agostino to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): PARTY JOON H. KIM IS INCORRECT. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (kl)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Frank Agostino. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (kl)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?