Santoro v. County of Collin, Texas
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00660

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 2, 2020 at 6:42 PM DT (11.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Matthew Stephen Santoro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew Stephen Santoro

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Stephen Santoro +1 972 442 6237
v.
No Logo 380th Judicial District Court, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frank A. King +1 512 463 2120 +1 512 320 0667 frank.king@oag.state.tx.us
No Logo Benjamin N. Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frank A. King +1 512 463 2120 +1 512 320 0667 frank.king@oag.state.tx.us
No Logo Brian Binggeli, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Abernathy, Roeder, Boyd & Joplin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Mercer Abernathy +1 214 544 4000 +1 214 544 4040 rabernathy@abernathy-law.com
No Logo Collin County CCD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Abernathy, Roeder, Boyd & Joplin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Mercer Abernathy +1 214 544 4000 +1 214 544 4040 rabernathy@abernathy-law.com
No Logo Collin County Central Appraisal District, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 210

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul MacNeal Davis +1 214 919 3555 +1 214 615 9019 paul@saunderswalsh.com
No Logo Collin County Constable's Office, Defendant
No Logo Collin County Tax Assessor/Collector, Defendant
No Logo County of Collin, Texas, Defendant
No Logo David McCall, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Abernathy, Roeder, Boyd & Joplin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Mercer Abernathy +1 214 544 4000 +1 214 544 4040 rabernathy@abernathy-law.com
No Logo Eugene Daffin, Defendant
No Logo Keith Self, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews Stein Shiels Pearce Knott Eden & Davis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Jacob Davis +1 972 234 3400 +1 972 234 1750 bdavis@mssattorneys.com
No Logo Kenneth L. Maun, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews Stein Shiels Pearce Knott Eden & Davis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Jacob Davis +1 972 234 3400 +1 972 234 1750 bdavis@mssattorneys.com
No Logo Neil Matkin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Abernathy, Roeder, Boyd & Joplin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Mercer Abernathy +1 214 544 4000 +1 214 544 4040 rabernathy@abernathy-law.com
No Logo Plano Independent School District, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Abernathy, Roeder, Boyd & Joplin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Mercer Abernathy +1 214 544 4000 +1 214 544 4040 rabernathy@abernathy-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Joseph Crawford +1 214 544 4000 +1 214 544 4040 ccrawford@abernathy-law.com
No Logo Shane Williams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthews Stein Shiels Pearce Knott Eden & Davis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Jacob Davis +1 972 234 3400 +1 972 234 1750 bdavis@mssattorneys.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (115) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Affidavit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/15/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/20/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/13/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default by Clerk
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Remark
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default by Clerk
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay re 39 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Terminate Motions,, by Brian Binggeli, Collin County CCD, Neil Matkin, David McCall, Plano Independent School District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Richard)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/2/2018, Entered: 12/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Amended MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Kenneth L. Maun, Keith Self, Shane Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION to Stay Scheduling Conference and Discovery by Collin County Central Appraisal District, Eugene Daffin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Paul)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: 11/29/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION to Stay Scheduling Conference and Discovery by 380th Judicial District Court, Benjamin N. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Brian Binggeli, Collin County CCD, Neil Matkin, David McCall, Plano Independent School District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Richard)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by 380th Judicial District Court, Benjamin N. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Scot Macdonald Graydon on behalf of 380th Judicial District Court, Benjamin N. Smith (Graydon, Scot)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                Second MOTION to Dismiss by Collin County Central Appraisal District, Eugene Daffin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Paul)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/25/2018, Entered: 11/25/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Kenneth L. Maun, Keith Self, Shane Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order of Sale, # 2 Exhibit Notice of Sale, # 3 Exhibit Officer's Return, # 4 Exhibit Constable Deed, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Matthew Stephen Santoro as to 39 Order. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying as moot 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 380th Judicial District Court, Benjamin N. Smith, 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Keith Self, Shane Williams, Kenneth L. Maun, 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David McCall, 29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Collin County CCD, Neil Matkin, and without prejudice to refiling as to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/19/2018. (daj, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(rpc, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Collin County Central Appraisal District, Eugene Daffin (Davis, Paul)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss, 34 Joint MOTION To Reconsider and Rescind Order Governing Proceedings. The Court ABATES the deadline to exchange initial disclosures, and EXTENDS the remaining deadlines set forth in the Order Governing Proceedings as follows. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: December 3, 2018. File joint report of attorney conference: December 10, 2018. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference December 17, 2018 at 2:00pm. in the United States Courthouse Annex, 200 N. Travis, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/13/2018. (daj, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by 380th Judicial District Court, Benjamin N. Smith Initial Disclosures to Plaintiff (King, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brian Binggeli, Collin County CCD, Neil Matkin, David McCall, Plano Independent School District (Crawford, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Kenneth L. Maun, Keith Self, Shane Williams (Davis, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Matthew Stephen Santoro as to 13 Order. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION To Reconsider and Rescind Order Governing Proceedings re 13 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by Kenneth L. Maun, Keith Self, Shane Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Expedited Joint Motion)(Davis, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Matthew Stephen Santoro as to 17 Order. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by David McCall. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abernathy, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Stay
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Kenneth L. Maun, Keith Self, Shane Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by Kenneth L. Maun, Keith Self, Shane Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order of Sale, # 2 Exhibit Notice of Sale, # 3 Exhibit Amended Officers Return, # 4 Exhibit Constable's Deed, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss by Collin County CCD, Neil Matkin. (Abernathy, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. Shane Williams served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. Kenneth L. Maun served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. Keith Self served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. Neil Matkin served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. Eugene Daffin served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. David McCall served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. Brian Binggeli served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. Benjamin N. Smith served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Mercer Abernathy on behalf of Brian Binggeli, Plano Independent School District (Abernathy, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul MacNeal Davis on behalf of Collin County Central Appraisal District (Davis, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by 380th Judicial District Court, Benjamin N. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(King, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before November 16, 2018. ORDERED that Defendants Plano Independent School District (PISD) and Brian Bingelli's 12 Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Defendants Collin County Central Appraisal District ("CCAD") and Eugene "Bo" Daffin's 14 Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) are each hereby DENIED without prejudice, as moot, and subject to reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/16/2018. (daj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            ***PLEASE DISREGARD - PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS A STAND ALONE DOCUMENT***Proposed Pretrial Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss by Collin County Central Appraisal District. (Davis, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2018 (baf, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Settlement Papers & Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                              ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY TO MOTION 14 ***SETTLEMENT Papers & MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Collin County Central Appraisal District. (Davis, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2018 (baf, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Settlement Papers & Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                SETTLEMENT Papers & MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss by Collin County Central Appraisal District. (Davis, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: October 30, 2018. File joint report of attorney conference: November 13, 2018. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference November 28, 2018 at2:00pm. in the United States Courthouse Annex, 200 N. Travis, Sherman, Texas75090. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/9/2018. (daj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Plano Independent School District's and Brian Bingelli's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Plano Independent School District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crawford, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Jacob Davis on behalf of Kenneth L. Maun, Keith Self, Shane Williams (Davis, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Shane Williams. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to Neil Matkin. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Keith Self. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Kenneth L. Maun. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Eugene Daffin. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to David McCall. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Brian Binggeli. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Benjamin N. Smith. (rpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against 380th Judicial District Court, Brian Binggeli, Collin County CCD, Collin County Central Appraisal District, Collin County Constable's Office, Collin County Tax Assessor/Collector, County of Collin, Texas, Eugene Daffin, Neil Matkin, Kenneth L. Maun, David McCall, Plano Independent School District, Keith Self, Benjamin N. Smith, Shane Williams, filed by Matthew Stephen Santoro. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kls, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***PLEASE DISREGARD - CLERK ERROR*** Notice of Deficiency regarding Document 31
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY TO MOTION 14 *** Document # 15, MOTION TO DISMISS. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR - PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS A STAND ALONE DOCUMENT. Document # 16, PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-43731. (mjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Pro Se Guidelines and Consent Form provided to Plaintiff. (kls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filing Fee Paid MO $400.00 (kls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?