J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Paucar
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-05358

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2018 at 2:54 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo J&J Sports Productions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas Peter Riley +1 626 799 9797 +1 626 799 9795 tprlaw@att.net
Space Thomas Peter Riley +1 626 799 9797 +1 626 799 9795 tprlaw@att.net
v.
No Logo Julio Paucar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Julio Paucar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julio Paucar
Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Judgment-Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Having considered Plaintiffs timely objections, I adopt Magistrate Judge Scanlon's Recommendation and deny the motion for default judgment. As observed by Judge Scanlon, the complaint is legally flawed a nd, in any event, without specific factual allegations to warrant a judgment against Mr. Paucar. I see no reason to disturb Magistrate Judge Scanlon's Report and accordingly deny the motion and direct the Clerk to dismiss the complaint. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 9/19/2018. (Ramesar, Thameera)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      OBJECTION to 18 Report and Recommendations filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Strike 7 Answer to Complaint and Application for Default Judgment by the Court filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, this Court respectfully recommends that J & J's motion for a default judgment be denied. Chambers will mail a copy of this Report and Recommendation to Julio Paucar, 1668 Bath Ave., Apartment 3, Brooklyn, NY 11214. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/16/2018. (Pearce, Jessica) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re 16 MOTION to Strike 7 Answer to Complaint and Application for Default Judgment by the Court by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to Strike 7 Answer to Complaint and Application for Default Judgment by the Court by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel) (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: As discussed during the 2/6/2018 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), Plaintiff appeared by telephone. Defendant failed to appear despite the Court's mailing of notices to the Defendant. Defendant has thus defaulted with regard to his need to appear. Defendant will move within thirty days to strike the answer and have the Court consider Plaintiff's motion for a default judgment. Defendant is again informed that his failure to participate in the litigation may result in a judgment against him. Defendant must contact Plaintiff's counsel and the Court to explain his nonappearance and non participation. C/M to pro se Defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/6/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Initial Conference by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Riley on behalf of J&J Sports Productions, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Proposed Scheduling Order by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. re 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julio Paucar. (Ramesar, Thameera) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 12/15/2017 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 12/7/2017. C/M to pro se Defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/28/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Julio Paucar. (Ramesar, Thameera) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. Julio Paucar served on 10/28/2017, answer due 11/20/2017. (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9953506. by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Counsel in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificates of Good Standing Supreme Court of PA, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court of CA, # 4 Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court of NJ) (Riley, Thomas) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Summons Issued as to Julio Paucar. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          COMPLAINT against Julio Paucar Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?