Hankins v. Bosch
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02191

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 27, 2019 at 11:34 AM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dennis Hankins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dennis Hankins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis Hankins
No Logo Susan Hankins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Susan Hankins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Hankins
v.
No Logo Auto-Owners Insurance, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bahret and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Ayers +1 419 861 7800 +1 419 861 7808 aayers@bahret-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J. Bahret +1 419 861 7800 +1 419 861 7808 rbahret@bahret-law.com
No Logo Bosch Killman Vanderwal, P.C.,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reminger & Reminger Co., L.PA - CLEVELAND OH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura J. Avery +1 419 254 1311 +1 419 243 2630 lavery@reminger.com
No Logo Esq. Peter Bosch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reminger & Reminger Co., L.PA - CLEVELAND OH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura J. Avery +1 419 254 1311 +1 419 243 2630 lavery@reminger.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Conference/Hearing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Extension (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Extension (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Remand Case (other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Change/Transfer venue
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Attorney Appearance by Robert J. Bahret filed on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance. (Bahret, Robert) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Attorney Appearance by Andrew J. Ayers filed on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance. (Ayers, Andrew) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Peter Bosch, Bosch Killman Vanderwal, P.C.,. (Avery, Laura) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 notice of removal
                          Notice of Removal from Wood County Court of Common Pleas, Ohio, case number 2018 CV 0480 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8923250.. Filed by Peter Bosch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon, # 2 Exhibit B - Answer of Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company, # 3 Exhibit C - Notices of Deposition, # 4 Exhibit D - Amended Notice of Deposition, # 5 Exhibit E - Hankins' Motion with Supporting Memorandum for Summary Judgment, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Avery, Laura)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 3 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?