Silcox v. Rodgers
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-02339

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 21, 2019 at 11:46 AM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Drt Ventures, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Venerable Law LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason C. Sampson +1 813 284 4727 +1 813 284 4764 jsampson@venerablelawfirm.com
No Logo Frank Silcox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Venerable Law LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason C. Sampson +1 813 284 4727 +1 813 284 4764 jsampson@venerablelawfirm.com
v.
No Logo 700 Island Way Capital Ventures, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Anand Shah, Defendant
No Logo Aydava, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Bayview Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bruce Rodgers, Defendant
No Logo Business Law Group, PA, Defendant
No Logo Carol L. Gould, Defendant
No Logo Convergence 53, Corp., Defendant
No Logo Esplanade Equity, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Boldiga, Defendant
No Logo KAZ 1, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Palm Insurance Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo PHP Management Services, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Precedent Hospitality & Property Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Sean Galaris, Defendant
No Logo Sean Galaris RE, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stella T. Galaris, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Attorney Fees
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Extend Time
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Compliance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Case management and scheduling order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Case Management Report
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 9/25/2018. (AD)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to Palm Insurance Management, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS issued as to KAZ 1, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS issued as to Aydava, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS issued as to Bayview Management Services, Inc. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to Convergence 53, Corp. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS issued as to 700 Island Way Capital Ventures, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS issued as to Sean Galaris RE, Inc. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS issued as to Esplanade Equity, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to PHP Management Services, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS issued as to Precedent Hospitality & Property Management, LLC. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS issued as to Stella T. Galaris. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS issued as to Joseph Boldiga. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to Anand Shah. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS issued as to Sean Galaris. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS issued as to Business Law Group, PA. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS issued as to Carol L. Gould. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to Bruce Rodgers. (BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against 700 Island Way Capital Ventures, LLC, Aydava, LLC, Bayview Management Services, Inc., Joseph Boldiga, Business Law Group, PA, Convergence 53, Corp., Esplanade Equity, LLC, Sean Galaris, Stella T. Galaris, Carol L. Gould, KAZ 1, LLC, PHP Management Services, LLC, Palm Insurance Management, LLC, Precedent Hospitality & Property Management, LLC, Bruce Rodgers, Sean Galaris RE, Inc., Anand Shah with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number tpa 053262) filed by Frank Silcox, DRT Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(BSN) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?