Shahram Sodeifi v. Tesla Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-05899-EMC
District Judge Edward M. Chen, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 27, 2018 at 5:29 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FNY Investment Advisers, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc M. Seltzer +1 310 789 3100 +1 310 789 3150 mseltzer@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Shahram Sodeifi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Y Lazo +1 855 471 1110 +1 855 471 1110 marclazo@cox.net
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon R. Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
Space Mara Rachelle Ludmer +1 415 875 2000 +1 415 281 1350 mludmer@fenwick.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Corinne Bretan +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 jbretan@fenwick.com
Space Dean S. Kristy +1 415 875 2324 +1 415 281 1350 dkristy@fenwick.com
Space Mara Rachelle Ludmer +1 415 875 2000 +1 415 281 1350 mludmer@fenwick.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 9/26/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 5
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 2:18-cv-07575[California Central]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag RELATE
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
      Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [17] Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
        Certificate of Interested Entities by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
          CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [19] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Arthur V. Nealon by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
            CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [19] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Andrew J. Entwistle by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
              CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [19] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for attorney Robert N. Cappucci by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Certificate of counsel
                CERTIFICATE of Counsel re [19] MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Marc M. Seltzer on behalf of FNY Investment Advisers, LLC (Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead CounselCourt Filing
                  MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by FNY Investment Advisers, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marc Seltzer In Support of Motion for Appointment, # (2) Proposed Order)(Seltzer, Marc) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                    Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018, Terminated: 10/17/2018 stipulation
                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [16] Order Relating Case, [1] Complaint, [15] INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC Class Action,, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time For Defendants To Respond To Complaint And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by Elon R. Musk, Tesla Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                        RELATED CASE ORDER. Related to 18-cv-4865-EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/2/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order SEC Class Action
                          INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 10/17/2018. Case Management Statement due by 12/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/27/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 case transferred in - district transfer
                            Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-07575. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 9/27/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Order Transferring CaseCourt Filing
                              MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE REQUEST TO TRANSFER CASE TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The parties filed a joint stipulation to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California so that it may be related to a prior-filed class action, Isaacs v. Tesla, Inc. et al., No. 3:18-cv-4865-EMC [11]. The Court, having reviewed and considered the stipulation consenting to transfer of this action, does hereby Order that this action be transferred from the United States District Court for the Central District of California to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division. The Court directs the Clerk for the United States District Court for the Central District of California to effect the transfer and forward all filings in this action to the Clerk for the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division. Case electronically transferred. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entryCourt Filing
                                ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07575 DMG(JPRx). (rn)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018, Terminated: 9/24/2018 Motion to transfer case
                                  REQUEST to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Francisco Division Stipulation To Transfer Venue; [Proposed] Order filed by Defendants Elon R. Musk, Tesla Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Bretan, Jennifer)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Notice - other
                                    CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Bretan, Jennifer)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Notice of Need for Mediation
                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer C Bretan counsel for Defendants Elon R. Musk, Tesla Inc. Adding Jennifer C. Bretan as counsel of record for Tesla Inc. and Elon Musk for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Tesla Inc. and Elon Musk. (Attorney Jennifer C Bretan added to party Elon R. Musk(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer C Bretan added to party Tesla Inc(pty:dft))(Bretan, Jennifer)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
                                        Certificate Pursuant to Federal Securities Law filed by Plaintiff Shahram Sodeifi (Attachments: # (1) Schedule A)(Lazo, Marc)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Summons issued
                                          21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] as to Defendants Elon R. Musk, Tesla Inc. (car)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 ADR Clerk's Notice
                                            NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Notice - other
                                                Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Shahram Sodeifi. (Lazo, Marc)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Notice - other
                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shahram Sodeifi, (Lazo, Marc)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shahram Sodeifi. (Lazo, Marc)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22341261 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Shahram Sodeifi. (Attorney Marc Y Lazo added to party Shahram Sodeifi(pty:pla))(Lazo, Marc)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?