O'Neal v. Colon
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01519

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2019 at 7:27 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/13/2018. 2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee GRANTED. Case DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state claim. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Andre O'Neal)(cb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/20/2018. Plaintiff BARRED from visiting 2nd floor of US Courthouse. Plaintiff BARRED from filing/attempting to file transcript order form unless he's requesting transcript of formal, scheduled hearing in one of his cases that took place in courtroom, before a judge, with all parties present. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Andre O'Neal)(cb)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Request
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Pro Se
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?