O'Neal v. Milwaukee Wisconsin US Department of Justices
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01522

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2019 at 12:11 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/17/2018. 2 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee GRANTED. Case DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state claim. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Andre O'Neal)(cb)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Request
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Pro Se
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?