Licea v. Pompeo
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01057

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 17, 2020 at 2:37 PM DT (10.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cindy Licea, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by adguentherlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony D. Guenther +1 702 589 5170 +1 702 944 7100 adg@adguentherlaw.com
No Logo Eduardo Romero Flores, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by adguentherlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony D. Guenther +1 702 589 5170 +1 702 944 7100 adg@adguentherlaw.com
v.
No Logo Daria L. Darnell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ann M Welhaf +1 202 307 8514 ann.welhaf@usdoj.gov
No Logo David T. Donahue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ann M Welhaf +1 202 307 8514 ann.welhaf@usdoj.gov
No Logo Edward J. Ramotowski, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ann M Welhaf +1 202 307 8514 ann.welhaf@usdoj.gov
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Secretary of St Michael Pompeo"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ann M Welhaf +1 202 307 8514 ann.welhaf@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten TimeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 9 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 8 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/8/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ann M Welhaf on behalf of Defendants Daria L. Darnell, David T. Donahue, Michael Pompeo, Edward J. Ramotowski. Ann M. Welhaf (Welhaf, Ann) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Eduardo Romero Flores. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to Edward J. Ramotowski, # 2 Summons to David T. Donahue, # 3 Summons to Daria L. Darnell)(Guenther, Anthony) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/13/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eduardo Romero Flores, Cindy Licea. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (JM) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5118811) by Cindy Licea. Proof of service due by 9/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Guenther, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?