Mansolillo v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-06015

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 15, 2019 at 9:41 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Linda Mansolillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cutter Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Margot P. Cutter +1 916 290 9440 +1 916 588 9330 mcutter@cutterlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd Alan Walburg +1 510 281 5881 +1 510 488 1175 twalburg@cutterlaw.com
v.
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com
Bayer Healthcare LLC Bayer Healthcare LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Transcript Designation Form
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Receipt
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Remand
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Linda Mansolillo.. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                        AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. re 10 Notice of Change of Address (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 10/8/2018) Modified on 10/9/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: 10/8/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Rodney Michael Hudson (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 10/8/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer HealthCare LLC (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Corporation (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer Corporation, Corporate Parent Shering Berlin Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer World Investments B.V., Corporate Parent Bayer US Holding LP, Corporate Parent Bayer Solution B.V., Corporate Parent Bayer HealthCare Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Bayer HealthCare LLC identifying Corporate Parent Schering Berlin Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer Corporation, Corporate Parent Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer World Investments B.V., Corporate Parent Bayer Solution B.V., Corporate Parent Bayer HealthCare Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Bayer Pharmaceuticals AG, Corporate Parent Bayer Medical Care Inc., Corporate Parent NippoNex Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer West Coast Corporation, Corporate Parent Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Dr. Scholl's LLC, Corporate Parent Coppertone LLC, Corporate Parent MiraLAX LLC, Corporate Parent Bayer HealthCare US Funding LLC, Corporate Parent Bayer East Coast LLC, Corporate Parent Bayer Essure, Inc., Corporate Parent Bayer US Holdings LP, Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer HealthCare LLC. (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Bayer Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bayer World Investments B.V., Corporate Parent Bayer Solution B.V., Corporate Parent Bayer US Holding L.P., Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Corporation. (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568581. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12726770). Filed byBayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?