United States v. Sharma
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00340

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 7, 2021 at 4:42 PM EST (1.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samson Aaron Enzer +1 212 637 2342 +1 212 637 2443 samson.enzer@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Negar Tekeei +1 212 637 2482 +1 212 637 2527 negar.tekeei@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Raymond Trapani, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 12/7/2021, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 12/7/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 11/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 11/24/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 9/28/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/20/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Consent to Proceed on Felony Plea Allocution
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Information - Felony
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None transcript
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Negar Tekeei / Samson Enzer dated October 29, 2018 re: Bail Revocation for Defendant Sohrab Sharma . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Tekeei, Negar) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 74 LETTER MOTION as to Raymond Trapani (2). Application Granted. Defendant Raymond Trapani's conditions of bail are hereby modified impose a curfew from 11:00 pm to 5:00 am with the use of location monitoring during curfew hours. All other condition of bail shall remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 74. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/17/2018) (ft)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated October 16, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release to Facilitate Employment (Unopposed). Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER as to Raymond Trapani (2) granting 70 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy dated October 3, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release from Home Detention to a Curfew (Unopposed). Application Granted. Defendant Raymond Trapani's conditions of bail are hereby modified to: (i) remove the condition of home detention; and (ii) impose a curfew from 11:00 pm to 7:00 am with the use of location monitoring during curfew hours. All other condition of bail shall remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 70. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/10/2018) (ap) Modified on 10/11/2018 (ap).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy dated October 3, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release from Home Detention to a Curfew (Unopposed). Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Negar Tekeei / Samson Enzer dated September 14, 2018 re: Curcio Hearing . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Tekeei, Negar) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma (1), Raymond Trapani (2), Robert Farkas (3) granting 64 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Request to Exclude Speedy Trial Time through December 11, 2018. Application Granted. For the reasons stated above, the Court finds that the ends of justice served by excluding the time between today and December 11, 2018 outweigh the best interests of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial as provided in 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). It is hereby ORDERED that the time between today and December 11, 2018 is excluded. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 64. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/11/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Request to Exclude Speedy Trial Time through December 11, 2018 . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for September 11, 2018, shall be adjourned to December 11, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/10/2018)(bw) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Raymond Trapani, Robert Farkas addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Negar Tekeei dated September 4, 2018 re: Discovery Status Update Document filed by USA. (Tekeei, Negar) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER as to Raymond Trapani (2) granting 53 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated August 17, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release. Application Granted. Defendant Trapani's conditions of bail are modified to allow him to reside at his grandmother's residence in the Eastern District of New York. All other conditions of bail shall remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 53. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/17/2018) (ap) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated August 17, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Discovery Status Update . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Robert Farkas (3) granting 49 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel J. Horwitz dated July 24, 2018 re: bail modification. Application Granted. Defendant Robert Farkas' conditions of bail are hereby modified to: (i) permit the use of computers, smartphones and the internet; (ii) remove the condition of home detention; and (iii) impose a curfew from 11:00 pm to 7:00 am with the use of location monitoring during curfew hours. All other condition of bail shall remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 49. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/31/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None ~Util _ Terminate MotionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/24/2018) (ap) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel J. Horwitz dated July 24, 2018 re: bail modification . Document filed by Robert Farkas as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Horwitz, Daniel) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Raymond Trapani. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Initial Appearance proceeding held on 7/19/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (ft) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Raymond Trapani re: Initial Appearance held on 5/30/2018 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2018. (ft) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Request for Entry of Proposed Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Raymond Trapani, Robert Farkas addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Discovery Status Update Letter Document filed by USA. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER as to Robert Farkas (3) denying 38 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release; denying 40 LETTER MOTION to Modify Conditions. Application DENIED in deference to the objection of Pretrial Services and cited policy grounds. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket numbers 38 and 40. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/22/2018) (ap) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel J. Horwitz dated June 21, 2018 re: bail modification . Document filed by Robert Farkas as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Horwitz, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release . Document filed by Robert Farkas as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Horwitz, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Raymond Trapani (2) granting 35 LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated June 15, 2018 re: Modification of Bond and enlargement of time to satisfy modification. The request is GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/15/2018) (ap) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated June 15, 2018 re: Modification of Bond and enlargement of time to satisfy modification . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated June 13, 2018 re: Modification of Bond and enlargement of time to satisfy modification . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma (1), Raymond Trapani (2), Robert Farkas (3) granting 31 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Discovery Proposal as to Certain Centra Tech Materials Provided to the FBI. Application Granted. By June 29, 2018, the Government shall (i) produce a complete copy of the Hard Copy Documents to all Defendants; and (ii) produce any forensic images of the Selected Devices that have/will be created to all Defendants. The parties shall file joint status letters regarding the status of discovery on July 2, 2018, August 1, 2018, and September 3, 2018. The schedule as set forth in the Court's May 23, 2018 Order will remain unchanged. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 31. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/5/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Discovery Proposal as to Certain Centra Tech Materials Provided to the FBI . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 29 LETTER MOTION To allow him to reside with his mother under home confinement with electronic monitoring in the Eastern District of Virginia, with leave to attend relevant substance abuse treatment, employment and educational appointments as to Raymond Trapani...ENDORSEMENT...Application GRANTED. The conditions of defendant's release are modified to remove any curfew condition. Home detention remains a condition of his release. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/31/18) (jw) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Joseph Aaron Bondy dated May 30, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn:Initial Appearance on disposition sheet as to Raymond Trapani held on 5/30/2018. Deft present with atty Raymond Trapani. AUSA Samson Enzer present. $2.5 Million PRB, Three FRP, Secured by $750,000 Cash/Property: Cash or property. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/ED Virginia and points in between for travel. Surrender travel documents (& No new applications), Pretrial supervision: Strict, Drug testing/treatment as directed by PTS); Mental health eval/treatment as directed by PTS, Home detention, Curfew, Electronic monitoring, Deft to continue or seek employment, Deft to continue or start education program, Deft not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon, Deft to be released on own signature, remaining conditions to be met by 6/13/18. Deft will reside with his mother at 2000 Meredith Avenue Virginia Beach, VA. He must report to ED Va. Pretrial within 48 Hours of arrival in the District. Participation of a drug program. Deft prohibited from using alcohol in excess. Deft is allowed to use the Internet but his use is to be monitored by Pretrial, including through any device or random search. Curfew to be set by E.D. Va PTS Officer. (jw) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated May 24, 2018 re: Modification of Bond, to Allow Defendant to Reside with his Mother in the EDVA . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani ( Motions due by 10/15/2018., Replies due by 11/19/2018., Responses due by 11/5/2018, Status Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.), Time excluded from 5/23/18 until 9/11/18. It is hereby ORDERED that the stipulated dates are approved as follows: By June 1, 2018, the parties shall file a joint letter with a proposed schedule for the treatment and production of the referenced Centra Tech materials; By June 29, 2019, the parties shall produce Rule 16 discovery, except the referenced Centra Tech materials; On September 11, 2018, at 11:00 a.m., the parties shall appear for a status conference; No later than October 15, 2018, Defendants shall file any motions. The Government shall file a response by November 5, 2018. Defendants shall file a reply by November 19, 2018. It is further, ORDERED that for the reasons stated in the parties May 18, 2018 letter, the Court finds that the ends of justice served by excluding the time between today and September 11, 2018, outweigh the best interests of the public and the Defendants in a speedy trial as provided in 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). The time between today and September 11, 2018, is hereby excluded. The parties are warned that any discussions regarding the possible disposition of this matter will not stay the above schedule. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/23/18)(jw) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Leave to File ., LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Motion to Approve Proposed Schedule and Speedy Trial Exclusion . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) Modified on 5/21/2018 (ka). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties shall file by Friday, May 18, 2018, a joint letter via CM/ECF proposing a schedule for discovery, the filing of motions, and three proposed dates for a status conference. The parties also should state whether the parties seek to have the Court exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act between the filing of the order and the pretrial conference, and the basis for the exclusion (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/16/18)(jw) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order to Continue - Speedy TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Samson Enzer and Negar Tekeei re: The Government respectfully submits this letter for two purposes: (a) to advise Your Honor that the defendants in this case are scheduled to appear in Magistrates Court on Monday May 21, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. to be arraigned on the above-referenced Indictment, which was returned yesterday against them; and (b) to respectfully request, with the consent of the defendants through their respective counsel, that time under the Speedy Trial Act be excluded until May 21, 2018....ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated above, the Court finds that the ends of justice served by excluding the time between today and May 21, 2018 outweigh the best interests of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial as provided in 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). It is hereby ORDERED that the time between today and May 21, 2018 is excluded. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 15 ( Arraignment set for 5/21/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) Time excluded from 5/16/18 until 5/21/18. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/16/18)(jw) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph Aaron Bondy appearing for Raymond Trapani. Appearance Type: Retained. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Request for Speedy Trial Exclusion through Arraignment . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None indictment
                                                                                                                                                    INDICTMENT FILED as to Sohrab Sharma (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Raymond Trapani (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Robert Farkas (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (bw) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                      Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Raymond Trapani from the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (dif) [1:18-mj-03271-UA] (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to Raymond Trapani (1). In Violation of 15 U.S.C. 78j (B), 78ff; 17 C.F.R. 240.10b-5; 18 U.S.C. 371, 1349, 1343 and 2 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron) (dif) [1:18-mj-03271-UA] (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 56 AMENDED MOTION for Gennaro Cariglio Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani to RE-FILE Document No. 55 MOTION for Gennaro Cariglio Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Sohrab Sharma. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15475913. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn:Arraignment on disposition sheet as to Raymond Trapani (2) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 5/30/2018., Not Guilty Plea entered by Raymond Trapani (2) Count 1,2,3,4. Deft present with atty Joseph Bondy. AUSA Samson Enzer present. Deft arraigned and pleads not guilty. Next conference set before District Judge on 9/11/18. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani: Notice to Attorney Enzer, Samson to RE-FILE Document 19 MOTION for Leave to File. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Motion to Approve Proposed Schedule and Speedy Trial Exclusion. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Case Designated ECF as to Sohrab Sharma, Raymond Trapani, Robert Farkas. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest of Raymond Trapani in the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (dif) [1:18-mj-03271-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORAL ORDER as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/18/2018)(dif) [1:18-mj-03271-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?