St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System v. Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00988

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2021 at 10:36 AM EDT (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrett Johnson Martin & Garrison, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald E. Martin +1 615 244 2202 +1 615 252 3798 jmartin@barrettjohnston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Myers +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 danim@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Conrad Walton +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 davew@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Martin Wood +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 cwood@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by VanOverbeke Michaud & Timmony, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Michaud +1 313 578 1200 +1 313 578 1201 tmichaud@vmtlaw.com
v.
No Logo Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Bugni +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 lbugni@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Perry Corley +1 404 572 4717 jpcorley@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek S. Hammond +1 404 572 4600 dhammond@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Riley Warnock & Jacobson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Milton S. McGee, III tmcgee@rwjplc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Allen Riley +1 615 320 3700 +1 615 320 3737 sriley@rwjplc.com
No Logo Brent Turner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Bugni +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 lbugni@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Perry Corley +1 404 572 4717 jpcorley@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek S. Hammond +1 404 572 4600 dhammond@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Riley Warnock & Jacobson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Milton S. McGee, III tmcgee@rwjplc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Allen Riley +1 615 320 3700 +1 615 320 3737 sriley@rwjplc.com
No Logo David Duckworth, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Bugni +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 lbugni@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Perry Corley +1 404 572 4717 jpcorley@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek S. Hammond +1 404 572 4600 dhammond@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Riley Warnock & Jacobson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Milton S. McGee, III tmcgee@rwjplc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Allen Riley +1 615 320 3700 +1 615 320 3737 sriley@rwjplc.com
No Logo Joey A. Jacobs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Bugni +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 lbugni@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Perry Corley +1 404 572 4717 jpcorley@kslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek S. Hammond +1 404 572 4600 dhammond@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Riley Warnock & Jacobson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Milton S. McGee, III tmcgee@rwjplc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Allen Riley +1 615 320 3700 +1 615 320 3737 sriley@rwjplc.com
No Logo AMALGAMATED BANK, TRUSTEE, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Kent Bramlett +1 615 248 2828 +1 866 816 4116 pknashlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Hamilton Burt +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 burt@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Regina Marie Calcaterra +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 686 0114 calcaterra@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Donovan +1 212 545 4600 donovan@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo BOSTON RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Kent Bramlett +1 615 248 2828 +1 866 816 4116 pknashlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Hamilton Burt +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 burt@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Regina Marie Calcaterra +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 686 0114 calcaterra@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Donovan +1 212 545 4600 donovan@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo PLYMOUTH COUNTY RETIREMENT ASSOC, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Kent Bramlett +1 615 248 2828 +1 866 816 4116 pknashlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Hamilton Burt +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 burt@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Regina Marie Calcaterra +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 686 0114 calcaterra@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Donovan +1 212 545 4600 donovan@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Chicago Laborers' Pension Fund, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrett Johnson Martin & Garrison, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald E. Martin +1 615 244 2202 +1 615 252 3798 jmartin@barrettjohnston.com
No Logo New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Pension Fund, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrett Johnson Martin & Garrison, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald E. Martin +1 615 244 2202 +1 615 252 3798 jmartin@barrettjohnston.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/29/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/27/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/30/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Hearing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Certify Class
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Case for Trial
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Case Management Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion of the Court
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Order of Recusal
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/6/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ORDER granting 33 Motion for Thomas H. Burt, Regina M. Calcaterra, Patrick Donovan, and Matthew M. Guiney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 1/8/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            MOTION for attorney(s) Thomas Burt, Regina Calcaterra, Patrick Donovan, Matt Guiney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2822002) by AMALGAMATED BANK, TRUSTEE, BOSTON RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PLYMOUTH COUNTY RETIREMENT ASSOC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Pro Hac Declaration-Burt, # 2 Exhibit A-Cert of Good Standing-Burt, # 3 Attachment Pro Hac Declaration-Calcaterra, # 4 Exhibit A-Cert of Good Standing-Calcaterra, # 5 Attachment Pro Hac Declaration-Donovan, # 6 Exhibit A-Cert of Good Standing-Donovan, # 7 Attachment Pro Hac Declaration-Guiney, # 8 Exhibit A-Cert of Good Standing-Guiney)(Bramlett, Paul)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              DECLARATION of Jerry E. Martin in Support filed by Chicago Laborers' Pension Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Pension Fund re: 30 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Novo Nordisk Opp. Brief, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Novo Nordisk Reply Brief, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of PTC Therapeutics Opp. Brief, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of PTC Therapeutics Reply Brief, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Immucor Opp. Brief, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of Immucor Reply Brief, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Nighthawk Radiology Holdings Reply Brief, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Bridgestone Settlement Notice, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Healthways Settlement Notice, # 10 Exhibit 10 - HCA Settlement Notice, # 11 Exhibit 11 - BancorpSouth Settlement Notice, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Ruby Tuesday Settlement Notice, # 13 Exhibit 13 - BancorpSouth 14 Settlement Notice)(Martin, Jerry) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by AMALGAMATED BANK, TRUSTEE, BOSTON RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PLYMOUTH COUNTY RETIREMENT ASSOC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of Thomas Burt, # 2 Exhibit A to Burt Declaration, # 3 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Bramlett, Paul) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Chicago Laborers' Pension Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Blitz v. AgFeed Industries, # 2 Attachment Cambridge Ret. Sys. v. Mednax, # 3 Attachment City of Hollywood Firefighters' Pension Fund v. TransDigm Group, # 4 Attachment Darwin v. Taylor, # 5 Attachment Elstein v. Net1 UEPS, # 6 Attachment Garden City Emps. Ret. Sys v. Psychiatric Sols., # 7 Attachment Hall v. Medicis Pharm., # 8 Attachment Horowitz v. Sunedison, # 9 Attachment In re Am. Serv. Grp., # 10 Attachment In re Bally Total Fitness, # 11 Attachment In re Goodyear Tire & Rubber, # 12 Attachment Lax v. First Merchants Acceptance, # 13 Attachment McKenna v. Dick's Sporting Goods, # 14 Attachment Nicolow v. Hewlett Packard, # 15 Attachment Norfolk Cty. Ret. Sys. v. Community Health (adopted order), # 16 Attachment Norfolk Cty. Ret. Sys. v. Community Health, # 17 Attachment Pace v. Quintanilla, # 18 Attachment Pio v. GM, # 19 Attachment Police and Fire Ret. Sys. v. SafeNet, # 20 Attachment Reinschmidt v. Zillow, # 21 Attachment Sapir v. Averback, # 22 Attachment Vladimir v. Bioenvision)(Martin, Jerry) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Intervene AND APPOINT LEAD COUNSEL AND LEAD PLAINTIFF filed by Chicago Laborers' Pension Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Bhojwani v. Pistiolis, # 2 Attachment Blitz v. AgFeed Industries, # 3 Attachment City of Marysville Gen. Emps. Ret. Sys. v. Nighthawk Radiology Holdings)(Martin, Jerry) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 23 MOTION to Intervene AND APPOINT LEAD COUNSEL AND LEAD PLAINTIFF filed by AMALGAMATED BANK, TRUSTEE, BOSTON RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PLYMOUTH COUNTY RETIREMENT ASSOC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Cambridge v Mednax-Report & Recommendation, # 2 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Bramlett, Paul) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER: Each of these two Motions (Doc. Nos. 23 and 24) is referred to the Magistrate Judge for decision. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Jerry E. Martin in Support filed by Chicago Laborers' Pension Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Pension Fund re: 24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, # 2 Exhibit B - Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, # 4 Exhibit D - Joint Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume)(Martin, Jerry) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              BRIEF filed by Chicago Laborers' Pension Fund, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Pension Fund re 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel,. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Blitz v. AgFeed, # 2 Attachment Burges v. Bancorpsouth, # 3 Attachment Garden City Emps. Ret. Sys. v. Psychiatric Sols. (2010), # 4 Attachment Garden City Emps. Ret. Sys. v. Psychiatric Sols. (2012))(Martin, Jerry) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Pension Fund, Chicago Laborers' Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Jerry) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene AND APPOINT LEAD COUNSEL AND LEAD PLAINTIFF by AMALGAMATED BANK, TRUSTEE, PLYMOUTH COUNTY RETIREMENT ASSOC, BOSTON RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment MEMORANDUM OF LAW, # 2 Attachment NESPOLE DECLARATION, # 3 Exhibit 1-NOTICE, # 4 Exhibit 2-AMALGAMATED DECLARATION, # 5 Exhibit 3-PLYMOUTH DECLARATION, # 6 Exhibit 4-BOSTON RETIREMENT DECLARATION, # 7 Exhibit 5-WOLF HALDENSTEIN RESUME, # 8 Exhibit 6-PROPOSED ORDER, # 9 Attachment JOINT DECLARATION OF INTERVENORS, # 10 Attachment CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Bramlett, Paul)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Appear - Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 16 Motion for Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/5/2018. (jw)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner. (Riley, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Derek S. Hammond filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner re: 16 MOTION for attorney(s) Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni, and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2788485). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Lisa R. Bugni filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner re: 16 MOTION for attorney(s) Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni, and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2788485). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jessica P. Corley filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner re: 16 MOTION for attorney(s) Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni, and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2788485). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  MOTION for attorney(s) Jessica P. Corley, Lisa R. Bugni, and Derek S. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $300 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2788485) by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner. (Riley, Steven)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner. (Riley, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Allen Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Milton S. McGee, III on behalf of All Defendants (McGee, Milton) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. Joey A. Jacobs waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Wood, Christopher) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. David Duckworth waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Wood, Christopher) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. Brent Turner waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Wood, Christopher) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018. (Wood, Christopher) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/22/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Appear - Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 6 Motion for Danielle S. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/16/2018. (jw)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney(s) Danielle S. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2774591) by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. (Wood, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/4/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Summons issued as to Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., David Duckworth, Joey A. Jacobs, Brent Turner and mailed to Christopher M. Wood for service. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Jacobs Issued Summons, # 2 Attachment Turner Issued Summons, # 3 Attachment Duckworth Issued Summons)(af) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (af) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System. (af) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed by St. Clair County Employees' Retirement System (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2765532) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(af) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NY State Bar status verified as active for Matthew M. Guiney, Thomas H. Burt, Regina M. Calcaterra, Patrick Donovan. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    TN State Bar status verified as active for Paul Kent Bramlett. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    TN State Bar status verified as active for Milton S. McGee, III, Steven Allen Riley. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      GA State Bar status verified as active for Jessica Perry Corley, Lisa R. Bugni; DC Bar status verified as active for Derek S. Hammond. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        CA State Bar status verified as active for Danielle S. Myers. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO COUNSEL David C. Walton, Danielle S. Myers, Thomas C. Michaud: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/22/2018. (af)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher M. Wood & Jerry E. Martin; CA State Bar status verified as active for David C. Walton & Danielle S. Myers; MI State Bar status verified as active for Thomas C. Michaud. (af)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?