CITY OF PORTLAND v. PURDUE PHARMA LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maine District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00282

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2019 at 5:45 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CITY OF PORTLAND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LIPMAN & KATZ, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/02/2018 SUMNER H. LIPMAN +1 207 622 3711 slipman@lipmankatz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/02/2018 STEPHEN C. SMITH +1 800 660 3713 ssmith@lipmankatz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph L. Ciaccio +1 844 230 7676
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul Napoli +1 212 397 1000 +1 646 843 7603 pnapoli@napolilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY SHAYNA E. SACKS ssacks@napolilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK +1 212 397 1000 +1 646 843 7603 hunter@napolilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by P. O. Box 470

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JAMES E. BELLEAU +1 207 784 4531 jbelleau@tmbf-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY ADAM R. LEE +1 207 784 4531 alee@tmbf-law.com
v.
No Logo Actavis, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY DONNA WELCH +1 312 862 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Stacey Anne Mahoney +1 212 705 7273 +1 212 508 1450 stacey.mahoney@morganlewis.com
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Stacey Anne Mahoney +1 212 705 7273 +1 212 508 1450 stacey.mahoney@morganlewis.com
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY DONNA WELCH +1 312 862 2000
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Atwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua D. Dunlap +1 207 791 1100 jdunlap@pierceatwood.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle M. Noonan +1 207 791 1182 knoonan@pierceatwood.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY LOUIS W. SCHACK +1 215 851 8100 +1 215 851 1420 lschack@reedsmith.com
No Logo Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Devine, Millimet & Branch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher D. Hawkins +1 603 669 1000 chawkins@devinemillimet.com
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Stacey Anne Mahoney +1 212 705 7273 +1 212 508 1450 stacey.mahoney@morganlewis.com
CVS Pharmacy, Inc. CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach Hewitt Ruprecht Sanchez & Bischoff, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CLIFFORD RUPRECHT +1 207 747 4870 cruprecht@rhrsb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Geraldine G. Sanchez +1 207 747 4870 gsanchez@roachhewitt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Conor Brendan O'Croinin +1 410 959 1160 +1 410 659 0436 cocroinin@zuckerman.com
No Logo DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAMBERT COFFIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY MAUREEN M. STURTEVANT +1 207 370 3011 msturtevant@lambertcoffin.com
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY RYAN ZANE WATTS +1 202 942 5000 Ryan.Watts@arnoldporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Verrill & Dana, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY KAREN FRINK WOLF +1 207 253 4484 +1 207 253 4485 kwolf@verrilldana.com
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY RYAN ZANE WATTS +1 202 942 5000 Ryan.Watts@arnoldporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Verrill & Dana, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY KAREN FRINK WOLF +1 207 253 4484 +1 207 253 4485 kwolf@verrilldana.com
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katharine S. Perry +1 617 482 0600 kperry@apslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Matthew Donohue +1 503 243 2300 +1 503 241 8014 matt.donohue@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOSEPH L. FRANCO +1 503 243 2300 +1 503 241 8014 Joe.Franco@hklaw.com
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles C Lifland +1 213 669 6000 +1 213 430 6407 clifland@omm.com
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles C Lifland +1 213 669 6000 +1 213 430 6407 clifland@omm.com
No Logo JOHNSON & JOHNSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles C Lifland +1 213 669 6000 +1 213 430 6407 clifland@omm.com
No Logo LYNN WEBSTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY SANDRA JIMENEZ +1 212 269 5500
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eaton Peabody Bradford & Veague

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK +1 207 947 0111 twoodcock@eatonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
No Logo MARK E CIENIAWSKI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Neil Austin +1 617 832 1000 +1 617 832 7000 naustin@foleyhoag.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Geiger +1 617 832 1124 +1 617 832 7000 dgeiger@foleyhoag.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY TTAB Attorney Placeholder mrodriguez@foleyhoag.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NORMAN, HANSON & DETROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOSHUA D. HADIARIS +1 207 774 7000 jhadiaris@nhdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY MARK G. LAVOIE mlavoie@nhdlaw.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Megan L. Rodgers +1 202 662 5240 +1 202 778 5240 mrodgers@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Neil K Roman +1 202 662 5695 +1 202 778 5695 nroman@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sulloway & Hollis, P.L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa M. Hanlon +1 603 223 2888 mhanlon@sulloway.com
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles C Lifland +1 213 669 6000 +1 213 430 6407 clifland@omm.com
No Logo PERRY FINE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY SANDRA JIMENEZ +1 212 269 5500
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY MARK CHEFFO +1 212 698 3500
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY MARK CHEFFO +1 212 698 3500
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY MARK CHEFFO +1 212 698 3500
No Logo RITE AID OF MAINE INC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Petruccelli, Martin & Haddow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY GERALD F. PETRUCCELLI gpetruccelli@pmhlegal.com
No Logo SCOTT FISHMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY SANDRA JIMENEZ +1 212 269 5500
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Stacey Anne Mahoney +1 212 705 7273 +1 212 508 1450 stacey.mahoney@morganlewis.com
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Green Dot Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER LOVRIEN +1 213 243 2629 cjlovrien@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MARDEN, DUBORD, BERNIER & STEVENS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY +1 207 873 0186 dmawhinney@mardendubord.com
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartlit Beck LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY KASPAR STOFFELMAYR +1 312 494 4400

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHARDSON, WHITMAN, LARGE & BADGER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR. +1 207 553 5729 jcahoon@rwlb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOHN S. WHITMAN +1 207 774 7474 jwhitman@rwlb.com
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Stacey Anne Mahoney +1 212 705 7273 +1 212 508 1450 stacey.mahoney@morganlewis.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Order of Recusal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC. (HAWKINS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC. (PERRY, KATHARINE) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (WOLF, KAREN) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by CITY OF PORTLAND. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 7/25/2018 (BELLEAU, JAMES) Modified on 8/6/2018 to add text to indicate defendant served and date of service (mnw). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by CITY OF PORTLAND. Actavis LLC served on 7/31/2018 (BELLEAU, JAMES) Modified on 8/6/2018 to add text to indicate defendant served and date of service (mnw). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (No PDF document attached. See PDF document 7 ) filed by CITY OF PORTLAND. Reply due by 8/24/2018. (jwr) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                    PROCEDURAL ORDER granting 9 15 and 19 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer; 7 Motion to Remand is also a response to 24 Motion to Stay; Response to 7 Motion to Remand and Reply to 24 Motion to Stay due 8/24/18. No reply to be filed to 7 Motion to Remand By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: FTR) (MFS) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Supplement authority in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by CITY OF PORTLAND (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental authority: State of New Mexico ex rel. Balderas v. Purdue Pharma)(BELLEAU, JAMES) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC. (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brien T. O'Connor, Andrew J. O'Connor filed by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-1879250.) (Attachments: # 1 Second Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Andrew J. O'Connor)(WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER granting 46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lipman is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER granting 45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Smith is withdrawn as counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK on behalf of MALLINCKRODT ENTERPRISES LLC (WOODCOCK, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RITE AID OF MAINE INC. (PETRUCCELLI, GERALD) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (HANLON, MELISSA) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC. (WHITMAN, JOHN) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION by Attorney Sumner H. Lipman to Withdraw as Attorney by CITY OF PORTLAND Responses due by 8/23/2018. (LIPMAN, SUMNER) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION by Attorney Stephen C. Smith to Withdraw as Attorney by CITY OF PORTLAND Responses due by 8/23/2018. (SMITH, STEPHEN) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC. (MAHONEY, STACEY) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY ANNE MAHONEY on behalf of ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC (MAHONEY, STACEY) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph L. Franco filed by KATHARINE S. PERRY on behalf of INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1878544.) (PERRY, KATHARINE) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS PHARMACY INC. (RUPRECHT, CLIFFORD) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD RUPRECHT on behalf of CVS PHARMACY INC (RUPRECHT, CLIFFORD) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Donohue filed by KATHARINE S. PERRY on behalf of INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1878383.) (PERRY, KATHARINE) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by KATHARINE S. PERRY on behalf of INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC (PERRY, KATHARINE) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Louis W. Schack filed by JOSHUA D. DUNLAP on behalf of AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1878047.) (DUNLAP, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 8/2/2018 at 3:30 PM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The parties have been provided with the Court's conference number.(MFS) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (WOLF, KAREN) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Watts filed by KAREN FRINK WOLF on behalf of ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877901.) (WOLF, KAREN) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES INC. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Lovrien filed by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WAL-MART STORES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877863.) (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY on behalf of WAL-MART STORES INC (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neil K. Roman, Esq. filed by MELISSA M. HANLON on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877592.) (HANLON, MELISSA) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Megan L. Rodgers, Esq. filed by MELISSA M. HANLON on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877584.) (HANLON, MELISSA) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stacey Anne Mahoney filed by JEFF GOLDMAN on behalf of ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA INC, CEPHALON INC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, WATSON LABORATORIES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1877557.) (GOLDMAN, JEFF) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN C. SMITH on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND (SMITH, STEPHEN) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by SUMNER H. LIPMAN on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND (LIPMAN, SUMNER) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ORDER granting 13 Motion for Conference of Counsel. The Court will schedule a telephonic conference to discuss the future course of the case. Pending the conference, the deadlines for the parties' responses to Plaintiff's complaint and the pending motions are stayed. Until the Court has conducted the telephonic conference, the parties shall file no further pleadings without leave of court. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION Responses due by 8/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order I, # 2 Exhibit B - Order Lac Courte Oreilles, # 3 Exhibit C - Order Rancheria, # 4 Exhibit D - Order Kentucky, # 5 Exhibit E - Transfer Order II)(DUNLAP, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Request for Expedited Conference by CITY OF PORTLAND (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order on Remand - Spartanburg SC, # 2 Exhibit Order on Remand - Greenville SC)(BELLEAU, JAMES) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin filed by GERALDINE G. SANCHEZ on behalf of CVS PHARMACY INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875665.) (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE M. NOONAN on behalf of AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (NOONAN, KYLE) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Order of recusal
                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL by MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON for all further referral proceedings. (mnw) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CVS PHARMACY INC, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC, WAL-MART STORES INC & RITE AID OF MAINE INC. Responses due by 8/15/2018. (SANCHEZ, GERALDINE) Modified on 7/26/2018 to add filers Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc and Rite Aid of Maine (mnw). (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Hunter Shkolnik, Shayna Sacks, Joseph Ciaccio filed by JAMES E. BELLEAU on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1875217.) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certification for Admission PHV Shayna E. Sacks, # 2 Affidavit Certification for Admission PHV Joseph Ciaccio)(BELLEAU, JAMES) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Madeleine K. Rodriguez filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875212.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Napoli filed by JAMES E. BELLEAU on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875209.) (BELLEAU, JAMES) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC & MCKESSON CORPORATION. Responses due by 8/15/2018. (DUNLAP, JOSHUA) Modified on 7/26/2018 to add filers Cardinal Health 110 LLC & McKesson Corporation (mnw). (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Geiger filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875203.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for Conference of Counsel by CITY OF PORTLAND Responses due by 8/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of Telephonic Proceedings in re Nat'l Prescription Opiate Litigation #1:17-cv-2804, # 2 Exhibit Order Regarding Remands, #1:17-MD-2804)(BELLEAU, JAMES) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of K. Neil Austin filed by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1875165.) (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CITY OF PORTLAND. (BELLEAU, JAMES) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MARK E CIENIAWSKI, MD (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by DOUGLAS J JORGENSEN, DO Responses due by 8/15/2018. (STURTEVANT, MAUREEN) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Remand to State Court by CITY OF PORTLAND (BELLEAU, JAMES) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum by CITY OF PORTLAND Responses due by 8/14/2018. (BELLEAU, JAMES) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re 5 State Court Record. Main Document: Summons Returned Executed as to Douglas J. Jorgensen, D.O.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Returned Executed as to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., # 2 Summons Returned Executed as to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., # 3 Sheriff's Return as to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., # 4 Summons Returned Executed as to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., # 5 Sheriff's Return as to Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., # 6 Summons Returned Executed as to Purdue Pharma L.P., # 7 Summons Returned Executed as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., # 8 Summons Returned Executed as to CVS Pharmacy, Inc., # 9 Summons Returned Executed as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, # 10 Summons Returned Executed as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., # 11 Summons Returned Executed as to Insys Therapeutics, Inc., # 12 Summons Returned Executed as to Walgreen Co., # 13 Summons Returned Executed as to Purdue Pharma Inc., # 14 Sheriff's Return as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., # 15 Summons Returned Executed as to Watson Laboratories, Inc., # 16 Sheriff's Return as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., # 17 Summons as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., # 18 Summons Returned Executed as to Rite Aid of Maine, Inc., # 19 Summons Returned Executed as to Cephalon, Inc., # 20 Summons Returned Executed as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., # 21 Summons Returned Executed as to Actavis LLC, # 22 Summons Returned Executed as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., # 23 Superior Court Order dated July 3, 2018, # 24 Motion to Extend Time to Answer by McKesson Corporation, # 25 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to McKesson Corporation, # 26 Superior Court Order dated June 27, 2018, # 27 Superior Court Order dated June 27, 2018, # 28 Motion to Extend Time to Answer by Cardinal Health Inc., # 29 Entry of Appearance for Cardinal Health, Inc., # 30 Superior Court Order dated June 25, 2018, # 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service, # 32 Amended Complaint, # 33 Motion to Correct Clerical Mistake in Motion to Extend Time, # 34 Email Correspondence, # 35 Superior Court Order dated May 29, 2018 re Pro Hac Vice Admission of Megan L. Rodgers, Esq., # 36 Superior Court Order dated May 29, 2018, # 37 Superior Court Order dated May 29, 2018 re Pro Hac Vice Certifications, # 38 Superior Court Order dated May 29, 2018 re Pro Hac Vice Certification of Neil K. Roman, Esq., # 39 Withdrawal of Motion, # 40 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission of Attorneys, # 41 Motion to Extend Time to Answer by McKesson Corporation, # 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Megan L. Rodgers, Esq., # 43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neil K. Roman, Esq., # 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission of Attorneys, # 45 Complaint)(mnw) Modified on 7/25/2018 to correct filer to be AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (mnw). (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            STATE COURT RECORD filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Cumberland County Superior Court Docket Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter from Joseph L. Cahoon, Esq. dated July 20, 2018, # 3 Cover Letter from James E. Belleau, Esq. dated July 17, 2018, # 4 Cover Letter by J.D. Hadiaris, Esq. dated July 13, 2018, # 5 Cover Letter by Maureen M. Sturtevant, Esq. dated July 9, 2018, # 6 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated July 5, 2018, # 7 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated June 29, 2018, # 8 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated June 26, 2018, # 9 Cover Letter by Melissa M. Hanlon, Esq. dated June 27, 2018, # 10 Cover Letter by Daniel E. Will, Esq. dated June 26, 2018, # 11 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated June 22, 2018, # 12 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated June 18, 2018, # 13 Cover Letter by Melissa M. Hanlon, Esq. dated May 31, 2018, # 14 Cover Letter by James E. Belleau, Esq. dated May 22, 2018, # 15 Cover Letter by Melissa M. Hanlon, Esq. dated May 9, 2018, # 16 Entry of Appearance of Melissa M. Hanlon, Esq., # 17 Cover Letter by Adam R. Lee, Esq. dated April 5, 2018, # 18 Entry of Appearance by John S. Whitman, Esq. and Joseph L. Cahoon, Esq., # 19 Summons Returned Executed as to Johnson & Johnson, # 20 Summons Returned Executed as to The Purdue Frederick Company, # 21 Summons Returned Executed as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., # 22 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to McKesson Corporation, # 23 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Mark Cieniawski, M.D., # 24 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, # 25 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Cardinal Health 110 LLC, # 26 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Lynn Webster, M.D., # 27 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Scott Fishman, M.D., # 28 Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Service as to Perry Fine, M.D., # 29 Superior Court Order dated July 17, 2018, # 30 Motion of Mark Cieniawski, M.D. to Extend Time to Answer, # 31 Superior Court Order dated July 13, 2018, # 32 Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Answer, # 33 Superior Court Order dated July 10, 2018, # 34 Entry of Appearance of Maureen M. Sturtevant, Esq., # 35 Motion to Extend Time to Answer by Douglas J. Jorgensen, D.O.)(mnw) Modified on 7/25/2018 to correct filer to be AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (mnw). (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (bfa) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-18-140. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 10/18/2018) Fee due by 7/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 docket record)(bfa) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?